Nute v. Colvin
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00007 (akd)

CLERK'S NOTICE returning Administrative Record (Social Security) to USA.

UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF ALASKA KIM THERESE NUTE v. NANCY A. BERRYHILL LESLEY K. ALLEN, DISTRICT COURT EXECUTIVE/CLERK OF COURT DEPUTY CLERK CASE NO. 3:16-cv-00007-HRH Pam Richter PROCEEDINGS: CLERK'S NOTICE DATE: April 18, 2017 RETURN OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD The following Administrative Record, lodged on March 25, 2016 in the above referenced case, is hereby returned to the attorney of record for Nancy A. Berryhill. Said administrative record consists of one (1) bound volume. [ADMINRET.clk-rev. 9-10-15] Case 3:16-cv-00007-HRH Document 22 Filed 04/18/17 Page 1 of 1

NOTICE of Substitution by Nancy A. Berryhill

BRYAN SCHRODER Acting United States Attorney RICHARD L. POMEROY Assistant U.S. Attorney 222 West Seventh Avenue, #9 Anchorage, Alaska 99513-7567 Phone: (907) 271-5071 Fax: (907) 271-2344 E-mail: Richard.Pomeroy@usdoj.gov Attorney for Defendant IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF ALASKA THERESE NUTE, Case No. 3:16-cv-00007-HRH Plaintiff, v. NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION NANCY A. BERRYHILL, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, Defendant. COMES NOW the United States, by and through undersigned counsel, hereby gives notice that Assistant U. S. Attorney Richard L. Pomeroy, now appears as counsel for the United States of America in the above-entitled action. Nute v. Berryhill Case No. 3:16-cv-00007-HRH 1 Case 3:16-cv-00007-HRH Document 23 Filed 04/19/17 Page 1 of 2 All future correspondence in this matter should be sent to: RICHARD L. POMEROY Assistant U.S. Attorney Federal Building & U.S. Courthouse 222 West 7th Avenue, #9, Room 253 Anchorage, Alaska 99513-7567 Phone: (907)271-5071 Fax: (907)271-2344 Email: Richard.Pomeroy@usdoj.gov RESPECTFULLY SUBMITTED on April 19, 2017. BRYAN SCHRODER Acting United States Attorney s/Richard L. Pomeroy Assistant U.S. Attorney Attorney for the Defendant CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE I hereby certify that on April 19, 2017, a copy of the foregoing was served via U.S Mail on: Paul Eaglin, Esq. s/Richard L. Pomeroy Nute v. Berryhill Case No. 3:16-cv-00007-HRH 2 Case 3:16-cv-00007-HRH Document 23 Filed 04/19/17 Page 2 of 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 523 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
04/18/2017
Docket Annotation: Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, represented by Gary A. Guarino and Jeffrey E. Staples substituted for Carolyn W. Colvin (acting Commissioner of Social Security) pursuant to FRCvP 25(d)(1). (Text entry; no document attached.)
1
01/08/2016
COMPLAINT against Carolyn W. Colvin (Filing fee $400, Receipt No. ANC011414), filed by Kim Therese Nute.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
2
01/08/2016
Civil Cover Sheet.
3
01/08/2016
Unissued summons re Defendant C. Colvin
1
Unissued Summons re Defendant USAO
2
Unissued Summons re Defendant USAG
2 Attachments
01/08/2016
Summons Issued as to Carolyn W. Colvin, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
02/01/2016
NOTICE of Appearance by Gary M. Guarino on behalf of Carolyn W. Colvin
5
02/02/2016
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey E. Staples on behalf of Carolyn W. Colvin
6
02/08/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kim Therese Nute. Carolyn W. Colvin served on 2/1/2016, answer due 4/1/2016.
7
02/12/2016
SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 2/12/16. Modified on 4/28/2016 to create relationship to document #10.
02/12/2016
Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket 7, when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
03/28/2016
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Carolyn W. Colvin.
9
03/28/2016
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record
1
Certification Page
2
Court Transcript Index
3
Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable
4
Payment Documents and Decisions
5
Jurisdictional Documents and Notices
6
Non Disability Related Development
7
Disability Related Development
8
Medical Records
8 Attachments
03/28/2016
Administrative Record consisting of 1 volume received on 3/28/16 re 9. Administrative Record is available for review at the Clerk's Office. (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
04/27/2016
MOTION re 1 Complaint, 7 Scheduling Order Soc Sec disability appeal by Kim Therese Nute.
11
05/27/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 Scheduling Order Unopposed by Carolyn W. Colvin.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
12
05/27/2016
DECLARATION of Jeffrey E. Staples re 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 Scheduling Order Unopposed by Carolyn W. Colvin.
13
05/31/2016
ORDER granting 11 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order; Def's response to brfing on appeal due by 6/27/2016; Plf's reply due by 7/11/2016.
14
06/27/2016
RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 MOTION re 1 Complaint, 7 Scheduling Order Soc Sec disability appeal filed by Carolyn W. Colvin.
15
08/12/2016
ORDER that Commissioner's decision is reversed & matter remanded for further proceedings. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 8/12/16.
16
08/12/2016
JUDGMENT that Commissioner's decision is reversed & matter remanded for further proceedings. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 8/12/16. (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2016: # 1 Judgment w/atty fees, expenses and costs added)
17
09/27/2016
First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 by Kim Therese Nute.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
18
09/27/2016
DECLARATION of Paul B. Eaglin re 17 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 by Kim Therese Nute.
1
Attorney Affirmation in Support of Motion for EAJA Fees
2
Exhibit A All Professional Time
3
Exhibit B Attorney Time
4
Exhibit C Paralegal Time
5
Exhibit D Expense
6
Exhibit E Expense
7
Exhibit F Costs
8
Exhibit G Fee Agreement
9
Exhibit H Affirmation and Waiver of Direct Payment of EAJA Fees
10
Certificate of Service
10 Attachments
19
10/11/2016
RESPONSE in Opposition re 17 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 filed by Carolyn W. Colvin.
20
10/18/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re 17 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 filed by Kim Therese Nute.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
21
11/18/2016
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Attorney Fees; atty fees in the amount of $6,452.67 awarded plf. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 11/18/16.
04/18/2017
Docket Annotation: Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, represented by Gary A. Guarino and Jeffrey E. Staples substituted for Carolyn W. Colvin (acting Commissioner of Social Security) pursuant to FRCvP 25(d)(1). (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
04/18/2017
CLERK'S NOTICE returning Administrative Record (Social Security) to USA.
23
04/19/2017
NOTICE of Substitution by Nancy A. Berryhill
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.