Nye v. Viking Spirit, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2017-cv-00002 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
79
05/30/2018
Compel
80
05/30/2018
Declaration
81
06/01/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
06/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
83
06/01/2018
Witness List
84
06/01/2018
Witness List
87
06/05/2018
Witness List
88
06/13/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
89
06/13/2018
Declaration
90
06/19/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
06/20/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
91
06/19/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
100
06/26/2018
Notice of Appearance
101
06/26/2018
Order on Motion to Compel
102
07/16/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
103
08/10/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
08/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.