O'Hara Corporation v. Lopez et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00194 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/30/2018
Complaint
2
08/30/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
08/30/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
4
09/04/2018
Unissued Summons
09/04/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
09/11/2018
Order
09/17/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
11/13/2018
Entry of Default
8
11/13/2018
Memorandum
9
11/13/2018
Affidavit
10
11/15/2018
Clerks Entry of Default
11
11/28/2018
Default Judgment
12
11/28/2018
Memorandum
13
11/28/2018
Affidavit
12/07/2018
Order on Motion for Default Judgment (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
12/10/2018
Judgment - Default

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.