OLIVER v. Commissioner of Soc. Sec. Admin.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00223 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/01/2018
Complaint
2
10/01/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
10/01/2018
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
4
10/01/2018
Unissued Summons
5
10/11/2018
Order
10/11/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
10/23/2018
Notice of Appearance
7
10/24/2018
Order
10/24/2018
Docket Annotation re Opening Brief (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
10/31/2018
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
9
11/24/2018
Notice of Appearance
10
12/17/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
11
12/17/2018
Order
12
01/14/2019
Answer to Complaint
13
01/14/2019
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security)
14
02/12/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
02/12/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
02/26/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
17
03/15/2019
Notice of Appearance
18
03/26/2019
Remand
19
03/27/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.