Ohio Casualty Insurance Company et al v. Grohe America, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00141 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
30
05/30/2018
Witness List
31
05/30/2018
Witness List
32
05/31/2018
Witness List
33
06/05/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
34
06/05/2018
Stipulation of Dismissal
35
06/08/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
06/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
08/01/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
38
08/02/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
40
09/11/2018
Scheduling Order
41
10/16/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
10/23/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
01/16/2019
Stipulation of Dismissal

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.