Old ivy Investors v. Maximillian, Inc., et al
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

3:1999-cv-00868 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 631 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/12/1999
ANSWER by Maximillian, Inc., Robert Wood, Zane Wood (Attorney Thomas J. Methvin) to amended complaint (State Court, Circuit Court of Lee County, Alabama)
2
08/12/1999
JOINDER by Maximillian, Inc. in [1-1] removal notice referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
3
08/30/1999
MOTION by Old Ivy Investors to Remand referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
4
08/31/1999
NOTICE of FILING NOTICE of REMOVAL to Lee County Circuit Clerk by Maximillian, Inc., Robert Wood, Zane Wood
5
09/02/1999
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why this motion to remand should not be granted: Response to Order to Show Cause due on 9/24/99 for Zane Wood, for Robert Wood, for Maximillian, Inc.; REQUESTING counsel for the parties to complete and send to the Clerk of the Court the attached consent form so that the form is received by the Clerk by 9/24/99 (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
09/24/1999
CASE reassigned to Judge Ira De Ment (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
09/24/1999
RESPONSE by Old Ivy Investors in opposition to [3-1] motion to Remand by Old Ivy Investors (Exhibits l-3 attached), referred to Judge Ira De Ment
7
09/27/1999
NOTICE of Filing of Original Affidavits by Maximillian, Inc., Robert Wood, Zane Wood (Original Affidavits attached), referred to Judge DeMent
8
09/28/1999
MOTION (REQUEST) by Maximillian, Inc., Robert Wood, Zane Wood for Referral to Bankruptcy Judge, referred to Judge Ira De Ment
9
10/01/1999
ORDER that Plaintiff's Response to Motion set to 10/15/99 for [8-1] motion for Referral to Bankruptcy Judge (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel.
10
10/15/1999
OBJECTION by Old Ivy Investors to [8-1] motion for Referral to Bankruptcy Judge by Zane Wood, Robert Wood, Maximillian, Inc. referred to Judge Ira De Ment
11
11/08/1999
MOTION by Maximillian, Inc. to Stay Proceedings, or in the alternative to transfer to Administrative Docket, referred to Judge Ira De Ment
12
11/09/1999
ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Stay Proceedings and [11-2] motion to transfer to Administrative Docket as follows: DISMISSING without prejudice and placing on the court's administrative Docket this action as further set out in the order (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel and Bankruptcy Court as Directed; furnished to RL.
11/09/1999
Case closed (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/14/2000
Case reopened (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
03/14/2000
ORDER transferring this case from the Administrative Docket to the active court docket; setting Advise Court of Settlement (joint stipulation of dismissal) deadline to 3/27/00 (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL.
14
03/24/2000
JOINT MOTION by Old Ivy Investors, Maximillian, Inc., Robert Wood, Zane Wood to Dismiss, referred to Judge Ira De Ment
15
03/28/2000
ORDER DISMISSING this case with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL.
03/28/2000
Case closed (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.