Olga Scudder-Padilla
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00297 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
8
09/11/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
9
09/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
10
09/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
09/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
09/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
09/20/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
14
09/20/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
15
09/20/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
16
09/20/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
17
09/20/2018
Certificate of Service
18
10/06/2018
Entry of Appearance
10/17/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
11/07/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
11/13/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
11/13/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
21
11/13/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
22
11/16/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.