Ollena Marie Sanford
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2014-bk-01450 (alnb)

Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Ollena Marie Sanford.

Fill in this information to identify your case: Debtor 1 Ollena Marie Sanford First Name Middle Name Last Name Debtor 2 (Spouse if, filing) First Name Middle Name Last Name United States Bankruptcy Court for the: NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA Case number 14-01450 (if known) Official Form 423 Certification About a Financial Management Course 12/15 If you are an individual, you must take an approved course about personal financial management if: you filed for bankruptcy under chapter 7 or 13, or you filed for bankruptcy under chapter 11 and § 1141 (d)(3) does not apply. In a joint case, each debtor must take the course. 11 U.S.C. §§ 727(a)(11) and 1328(g). After you finish the course, the provider will give you a certificate. The provider may notify the court that you have completed the course. If the provider does notify the court, you need not file this form. If the provider does not notify the court, then Debtor 1 and Debtor 2 must each file this form with the certificate number before your debts will be discharged. If you filed under chapter 7 and you need to file this form, file it within 60 days after the first date set for the meeting of creditors under § 341 of the Bankruptcy Code. If you filed under chapter 11 or 13 and you need to file this form, file it before you make the last payment that your plan requires or before you file a motion for a discharge under § 1141(d)(5)(B) or § 1328(b) of the Bankruptcy Code. Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1007(c). In some cases, the court can waive the requirement to take the financial management course. To have the requirement waived, you must file a motion with the court and obtain a court order. Part 1: Tell the Court About the Required Course. You must check one: I completed an approved course in personal financial management: Date I took the course 01/22/18 Name of approved provider Consumer Financial Education Foundation of America Certificate Number S11823571 I am not required to complete a course in personal financial management because the court has granted my motion for a waiver of the requirement based on (check one): Incapacity. I have a mental illness or a mental deficiency that makes me incapable of realizing or making rational decisions about finances. Disability. My physical disability causes me to be unable to complete a course in personal financial management in person, by phone, or through the internet, even after I reasonably tried to do so. Active duty. I am currently on active military duty in a military combat zone. Residence. I live in a district in which the United States trustee (or bankruptcy administrator) has determined that the approved instructional courses cannot adequately meet my needs. Part 2: Sign Here I certify that the information I have provided is true and correct. /s/ Ollena Marie Sanford Ollena Marie Sanford Date January 23, 2018 Signature of debtor named on certificate Printed name of debtor Official Form 423 Certification About a Financial Management Course Software Copyright (c) 1996-2017 Best Case, LLC - www.bestcase.com Best Case Bankruptcy Case 14-01450-TOM13 Doc 22 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 17:29:30 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 2 S11823571 Ollena Marie Sanford 22nd day of January, 2018. Case 14-01450-TOM13 Doc 22 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 17:29:30 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 2

Debtor's Certifications Regarding Domestic Support Obligations and Section 522(q) for Debtor Filed by Debtor Ollena Marie Sanford.

B2830 (Form 2830) (4/16) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA In re Ollena Marie Sanford Case No. 14-01450 Debtor(s) CHAPTER 13 DEBTOR'S CERTIFICATIONS REGARDING DOMESTIC SUPPORT OBLIGATIONS AND SECTION 522(q) Part I. Certification Regarding Domestic Support Obligations (check no more than one) Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1328(a), I certify that: I owed no domestic support obligation when I filed my bankruptcy petition, and I have not been required to pay any such obligation since then. I am or have been required to pay a domestic support obligation. I have paid all such amounts that my chapter 13 plan required me to pay. I have also paid all such amounts that became due between the filing of my bankruptcy petition and today. Part II. If you checked the second box, you must provide the information below. My current address: My current employer and my employer's address: Part III. Certification Regarding Section 522(q) (check no more than one) Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1328(h), I certify that: I have not claimed an exemption pursuant to §522(b)(3) and state or local law (1) in property that I or a dependent of mine uses as a residence, claims as homestead, or acquired as a burial plot, as specified in §522(p)(1), and (2) that exceeds $160,375* in value in the aggregate. I have claimed an exemption in property pursuant to §522(b)(3) and state or local law (1) that I or a dependent of mine uses as a residence, claims as a homestead, or acquired as a burial plot, as specified in §522(p)(1), and (2) that exceeds $160,375* in value in the aggregate. Part IV. Debtor's Signature I certify under penalty of perjury that the information provided in these certifications is true and correct to the best of my knowledge and belief. Executed on January 23, 2018 /s/ Ollena Marie Sanford Date Ollena Marie Sanford Debtor *Amounts are subjected to adjustment on 4/01/19, and every 3 years thereafter with respect to cases commenced on or after the date of adjustment. Software Copyright (c) 1996-2017 Best Case, LLC - www.bestcase.com Best Case Bankruptcy Case 14-01450-TOM13 Doc 23 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 17:34:10 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account. (Ch13troffice, tt)

0028-1R-EPIE1R-00180190-201161 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: OLLENA MARIE SANFORD Case No.: 14-01450-TOM13 Debtor(s) CHAPTER 13 STANDING TRUSTEE'S FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT Bradford W. Caraway, chapter 13 standing trustee, submits the following Final Report and Account of the administration of the estate pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1302(b)(1). The trustee declares as follows: 1) The case was filed on 04/11/2014. 2) The plan was confirmed on 07/07/2014. 3) The plan was modified by order after confirmation pursuant to 11 U.S.C Section 1329 on NA. 4) The trustee filed action to remedy default by the debtor in performance under the plan on NA. 5) The case was completed on 03/08/2018. 6) Number of months from filing or conversion to last payment: 47. 7) Number of months case was pending: 52. 8) Total value of assets abandoned by court order: NA. 9) Total value of assets exempted: 15,076.00. 10) Amount of unsecured claims discharged without full payment: 15,149.00. 11) All checks distributed by the trustee relating to this case have cleared the bank. Receipts: Total paid by or on behalf of the debtor: $52,670.00 Less amount refunded to debtor: $316.43 NET RECEIPTS: $52,353.57 Expenses of Administration: Attorney's Fees Paid Through The Plan: $3,250.00 Court Costs: $.00 Trustee Expenses and Compensation: $3,111.42 Other: $.00 TOTAL EXPENSES OF ADMINISTRATION: $6,361.42 Attorney fees paid and disclosed by debtor: $.00 Scheduled Creditors: Creditor Claim Claim Claim Principal Interest Name Class Scheduled Asserted Allowed Paid Paid ALABAMA POWER COMPANY Secured 4,895.00 4,951.11 4,951.11 4,951.11 267.30 AMERICAS FIRST FEDERAL CREDIT UNION Secured 92,547.00 92,191.51 92,191.51 .00 .00 BECKET & LEE, LLP Unsecured 443.00 432.07 432.07 432.07 .00 BEST BUY Unsecured 3,003.00 NA NA .00 .00 CHASE Unsecured 12,146.00 NA NA .00 .00 CREDIT FIRST NA Unsecured 867.00 892.30 892.30 892.30 .00 DISCOVER BANK Unsecured 6,093.00 6,093.64 6,093.64 6,093.64 .00 FIA CARD SERVICES NA Unsecured 3,169.00 3,169.50 3,169.50 3,169.50 .00 NAVIENT SOLUTIONS Unsecured 3,774.00 3,880.24 3,880.24 3,880.24 .00 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC Unsecured 2,058.00 2,102.41 2,102.41 2,102.41 .00 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC Unsecured 3,529.00 3,529.37 3,529.37 3,529.37 .00 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC Unsecured 4,900.00 5,084.28 5,084.28 5,084.28 .00 QUANTUM 3 GROUP LLC Unsecured 1,233.00 1,233.58 1,233.58 1,233.58 .00 Page 1 of 2 UST Form 101-13-FR-S (9/1/2009) Case 14-01450-TOM13 Doc 28 Filed 08/07/18 Entered 08/07/18 10:17:33 Desc Page 1 of 2 0028-1R-EPIE1R-00180190-201161 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: OLLENA MARIE SANFORD Case No.: 14-01450-TOM13 Debtor(s) CHAPTER 13 STANDING TRUSTEE'S FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT Scheduled Creditors: Creditor Claim Claim Claim Principal Interest Name Class Scheduled Asserted Allowed Paid Paid QUANTUM 3 GROUP LLC Unsecured 6,811.00 6,811.82 6,811.82 6,811.82 .00 QUANTUM 3 GROUP LLC Unsecured 7,544.00 7,544.53 7,544.53 7,544.53 .00 Summary of Disbursements to Creditors: Claim Principal Interest Allowed Paid Paid Secured Payments: Mortgage Ongoing: 92,191.51 .00 .00 Mortgage Arrearage: .00 .00 .00 Debt Secured by Vehicle: .00 .00 .00 All Other Secured: 4,951.11 4,951.11 267.30 TOTAL SECURED: 97,142.62 4,951.11 267.30 Priority Unsecured Payments: Domestic Support Arrearage: .00 .00 .00 Domestic Support Ongoing: .00 .00 .00 All Other Priority: .00 .00 .00 TOTAL PRIORITY: .00 .00 .00 GENERAL UNSECURED PAYMENTS: 40,773.74 40,773.74 .00 Disbursements: Expenses of Administration: $6,361.42 Disbursements to Creditors: $45,992.15 TOTAL DISBURSEMENTS: $52,353.57 12) The trustee certifies that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 5009, the estate has been fully administered, the foregoing summary is true and complete, and all administrative matters for which the trustee is responsible have been completed. The trustee requests a final decree be entered that discharges the trustee and grants such other relief as may be just and proper. Date: 08/03/2018 By: /s/Bradford W. Caraway Chapter 13 Standing Trustee STATEMENT: This Uniform Form is associated with an open bankruptcy case, therefore, Paperwork Reduction Act exemption 5 C.F.R. Section 1320.4(a)(2) applies. Page 2 of 2 UST Form 101-13-FR-S (9/1/2009) Case 14-01450-TOM13 Doc 28 Filed 08/07/18 Entered 08/07/18 10:17:33 Desc Page 2 of 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 77 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/11/2014
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $281 Filed by Ollena Marie Sanford
3
04/11/2014
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Ollena Marie Sanford.
4
04/11/2014
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Ollena Marie Sanford.
04/11/2014
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(14-01450-13) [misc,volp13] (281.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 16478503. Fee Amount 281.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2014
*INCORRECT NOTICE AS TO JUDGE REASSIGNMENT* Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/07/2014 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing will be set at a later date. Proof of Claim due by 08/05/2014. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/08/2014 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 07/07/2014. Modified on 4/14/2014 (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
04/11/2014
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Ollena Marie Sanford.
6
04/11/2014
Tax Documents for the Year for 2013 Filed by Debtor Ollena Marie Sanford.
7
04/11/2014
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Ollena Marie Sanford.
8
04/12/2014
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
9
04/14/2014
For cause, it is ordered that the foregoing case is to be reassigned and transferred from Judge Thomas B Bennett to Judge Tamara O Mitchell.
10
04/14/2014
Amended Meeting of Creditors (Judge reassignment) 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/7/2014 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham.Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts Due 7/7/2014.Proofs of Claims due by 8/5/2014.Government Proof of Claim due by 10/8/2014.
11
04/14/2014
Notice of Confirmation Hearing Confirmation hearing to be held on 6/12/2014 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
12
04/16/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13). Notice Date 04/16/2014.
13
04/16/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Ollena Marie Sanford). Notice Date 04/16/2014.
14
04/16/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/16/2014.
15
04/16/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 11 Notice of Confirmation Hearing). Notice Date 04/16/2014.
16
04/18/2014
Trustee's Direction for Deduction.
17
05/08/2014
Meeting of Creditors Held 5/7/2014.
18
06/11/2014
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (Confirmation Hearing) Hearing scheduled 06/12/2014 at 10:59 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
19
06/16/2014
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
20
07/07/2014
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 7/7/2014 (RE: related document(s) 5 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Ollena Marie Sanford, 11 Notice of Confirmation Hearing).
21
07/09/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 07/09/2014.
22
01/23/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Ollena Marie Sanford.
23
01/23/2018
Debtor's Certifications Regarding Domestic Support Obligations and Section 522(q) for Debtor Filed by Debtor Ollena Marie Sanford.
24
02/16/2018
Trustee's Letter to Cease Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
25
07/09/2018
Trustee's Certification of Plan Completion. (Ch13troffice, tt)
26
07/09/2018
Order Discharging Debtor Signed on 7/9/2018.
27
07/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 26 Order Discharging Debtor). Notice Date 07/11/2018.
28
08/07/2018
Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account. (Ch13troffice, tt)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.