Olson et al v. O'Brien et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2011-cv-00245 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
171
05/23/2018
Stipulation
172
05/23/2018
Notice (Other)
05/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/28/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/28/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
174
05/30/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
175
05/30/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
176
05/30/2018
Declaration
177
05/30/2018
Declaration
178
05/31/2018
Notice (Other)
179
05/31/2018
Notice (Other)
05/31/2018
Docket Annotation re Wrong Event Selected (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
Docket Annotation re Wrong Event Selected (Text entry; no document attached.)
180
06/01/2018
Hearing
181
06/01/2018
Hearing
182
06/01/2018
Hearing
183
06/01/2018
Hearing
06/06/2018
Docket Annotation re no Proposed Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
184
06/06/2018
Notice (Other)
185
06/06/2018
Notice (Other)
186
06/06/2018
Notice (Other)
187
06/06/2018
Notice (Other)
188
06/06/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
189
06/06/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
06/08/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
191
07/12/2018
Appear
192
07/13/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
193
07/15/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
07/20/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
195
07/31/2018
Order on Motion in Limine
196
07/31/2018
Judgment
197
08/27/2018
Notice (Other)
08/28/2018
Docket Annotation re Wrong Event Selected (Text entry; no document attached.)
198
08/28/2018
Notice of Appeal
199
08/29/2018
Notice of Appearance
200
08/30/2018
USCA Case Number
201
08/30/2018
USCA Scheduling Order
202
10/09/2018
Transcript
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.