Olson v. McCloud
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00111 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
25
05/14/2018
ORDER denying Petition under 28:2254. Motions at dockets 11, 12, and 13 are denied as moot, dockets 14 and 19 are denied, docket 21 is granted, and docket 22 is denied. Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 5/14/18.
27
05/29/2018
Hearing
28
06/04/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing
29
06/26/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
30
06/26/2018
Notice of Appeal
31
06/26/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
32
06/27/2018
USCA Case Number
33
01/29/2019
USCA Mandate
34
03/18/2019
USCA Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.