Omni Enterprises, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2015-bk-00076 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
186
06/05/2018
Report of Unclaimed Funds / Funds Less than 5 dollars
187
10/10/2018
Report of Unclaimed Funds / Funds Less than 5 dollars
188
12/18/2018
Change of Address
12/18/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
189
01/24/2019
Generic Motion / Application
190
02/08/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
191
02/11/2019
Joinder
192
02/15/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
193
02/20/2019
Generic Motion / Application
194
02/26/2019
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
195
03/03/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
196
03/14/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
197
03/18/2019
Hearing
03/18/2019
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
198
04/04/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
199
04/05/2019
Proceeding Memo

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.