Orenga de Gaffory v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00211 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
9
08/24/2018
Witness List
10
08/24/2018
Witness List
11
09/21/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
12
09/24/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
13
12/21/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
14
12/26/2018
Order
15
01/29/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
16
02/01/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
17
05/02/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
18
05/03/2019
Errata
05/03/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/03/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/03/2019
~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
05/03/2019
Summary Judgment
21
05/03/2019
In Limine
22
05/03/2019
In Limine
23
05/06/2019
Notice of Settlement
24
05/06/2019
Order
05/08/2019
Order on Motion for Settlement (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2019
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2019
Order on Motion in Limine (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2019
Order on Motion in Limine (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.