Orion Marine Contractors, Inc. v. City of Seward
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cv-00151 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
81
08/29/2018
USCA Order
82
10/09/2018
USCA Order
83
10/17/2018
USCA Mandate
10/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
86
11/27/2018
Notice of Change of Address
87
12/03/2018
Notice of Settlement
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
89
12/12/2018
Notice (Other)
90
12/12/2018
Stipulation of Dismissal
12/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.