Orlando Franklin

2:2017-bk-31996 (almb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
View docket sheet
Last full docket sheet refresh: 92 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/14/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition.Fee Amount $150. filed by Mary Conner Pool on behalf of Orlando Franklin.
2
07/14/2017
Chapter 13 Plan. The Plan will be noticed by the clerk's office and the certificate of service will be filed within 5 working days. filed by Mary Conner Pool on behalf of Orlando Franklin.
3
07/14/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments filed by Mary Conner Pool on behalf of Orlando Franklin.
4
07/14/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor filed by Mary Conner Pool on behalf of Orlando Franklin.
5
07/14/2017
Employee Income Records for Debtor filed by Mary Conner Pool on behalf of Orlando Franklin.
6
07/14/2017
Declaration re: Electronic Filing filed by Mary Conner Pool on behalf of Orlando Franklin.
7
07/14/2017
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(17-31996) [misc,volp13a] (150.00). Receipt number 10148464, amount $ 150.00. (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury)
8
07/15/2017
Meeting of Creditors, Trustee and Deadlines Assigned. Section 341(a) Meeting of Creditors to be held 08/24/2017 at 01:30 PM in 341 Meeting of Creditors (Rm 105), FMJ Fed. Courthouse (Lee St. entrance), Montgomery, AL 36104. Confirmation hearing to be held 09/25/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4C, Judge Williams Presiding, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Montgomery, AL. The Trustee appointed to this case is Sabrina L. McKinney. Deadline to file Proofs of Claim is 11/22/2017. Deadline to file Objections to Discharge Under 523 is 10/23/2017.
9
07/17/2017
Order Approving Application To Pay Filing Fees In Installments. (Related Doc # 3). Entered On 7/17/2017. Final Installment Payment due by 11/14/2017.
10
07/18/2017
Trustee's Income Withholding Order.
11
07/19/2017
BNC Certificate of Service - Meeting of Creditors - (RE: related document(s) 8 Auto Assign Meeting of Creditors-Ch 13). No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 07/19/2017.
12
07/19/2017
BNC Certificate of Service - Order Approving Payment of Filing Fee Installments - (RE: related document(s) 9 Order on Motion To Pay Filing Fees in Installments). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/19/2017.
13
07/19/2017
BNC Certificate of Service - Chapter 13 Plan - (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan). No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 07/19/2017.
14
08/09/2017
Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor filed by Mary Conner Pool on behalf of Orlando Franklin (RE: related document(s) 8 Auto Assign Meeting of Creditors-Ch 13).
15
08/17/2017
Trustee's Order Releasing Wages.
16
08/22/2017
Receipt of Chapter 13 Installment Filing Fee - $160.00 by CM. Receipt Number 6013848. (admin)
17
08/25/2017
Proceeding Memo - 341 Meeting of Creditors Hearing Held (Non-Image Entry).
18
09/05/2017
Objection to Claim # 3 (REGIONAL MANAGEMENT COPORATION), Reason: Improperly classified filed by Mary Conner Pool on behalf of Orlando Franklin. Responses due by 10/10/2017.
19
09/15/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan.
09/25/2017
Hearing Continued (related document(s): 8 Auto Assign Meeting of Creditors-Ch 13) Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/04/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 4C, Judge Williams Presiding, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Montgomery, AL. (jmclain) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
10/11/2017
Order Sustaining Objection to Claim 3 (REGIONAL MANAGEMENT COPORATION) Entered On 10/11/2017(RE: related document(s) 18 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Orlando Franklin).
21
10/13/2017
BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - (RE: related document(s) 20 Order on Objection to Claim). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/13/2017.
22
10/17/2017
Amended Schedules I, J, filed by Mary Conner Pool on behalf of Orlando Franklin.
12/04/2017
Hearing Continued (related document(s): 8 Auto Assign Meeting of Creditors-Ch 13) Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/29/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 4C, Judge Williams Presiding, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Montgomery, AL. (jmclain) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
12/15/2017
Transfer of Claim. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: OneMain (Claim No. 2) To Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Fee Amount $25 filed by PRA Receivables Management LLC.
24
12/15/2017
Receipt of filing fee for Transfer of Claim(17-31996) [claims,trclm] (25.00). Receipt number 10534067, amount $ 25.00. (re:Doc# 23) (U.S. Treasury)
25
12/17/2017
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Transfer of Claim. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/17/2017.
26
01/23/2018
Objection to Claim # 4 (INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE), Reason: Other filed by Mary Conner Pool on behalf of Orlando Franklin. Responses due by 02/26/2018.
27
01/23/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. filed by Mary Conner Pool on behalf of Orlando Franklin (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Orlando Franklin).
1
Cummalative Statement of Amendments & Cert of Service
1 Attachment
28
01/24/2018
Amended Trustee's Income Withholding Order.
01/29/2018
Hearing Continued (related document(s): 8 Auto Assign Meeting of Creditors-Ch 13) Confirmation hearing to be held on 02/26/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 4C, Judge Sawyer Presiding, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Montgomery, AL. (jmclain) (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
02/21/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. filed by Mary Conner Pool on behalf of Orlando Franklin (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Orlando Franklin, 27 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Orlando Franklin).
1
Amended Plan dated 2-21-18
1 Attachment
30
02/21/2018
Notice of Withdrawal of Document filed by Mary Conner Pool on behalf of Orlando Franklin (RE: related document(s) 26 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Orlando Franklin).
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.