Orsburn v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Court Docket Sheet

4:2017-cv-00296 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 295 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/27/2017
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14375392 filed by Terry Orsburn.
1
Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC
1 Attachment
2
06/27/2017
SUMMONS Submitted by Terry Orsburn.
1
Summons
2
Summons)(DLC
2 Attachments
3
06/27/2017
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14375392. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eric J Markovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 4:CV-17-00296-TUC-EJM. Magistrate Election form attached.
4
06/27/2017
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.
1
Summons
2
Summons)(DLC
2 Attachments
5
06/28/2017
SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties must fully comply with the deadlines and procedures within this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 6/28/17.
06/28/2017
Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Edward A Wicklund on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
07/13/2017
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
07/21/2017
NOTICE of request for e-notices by J. Cole Hernandez. (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
08/02/2017
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Terry Orsburn: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint and Scheduling Order upon US Attorney's Office, Office of General Counsel, Attorney General on 7/24/2017.
8
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey McClain appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
10
09/07/2017
Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Markovich conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
11
09/18/2017
ANSWER to [1] Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
12
09/18/2017
NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript re: [11] Answer to Complaint filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
1
Certification Page
2
Court Transcript Index
3
Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearin
4
Payment Documents and Decisions
5
Jurisdictional Documents and Notices
6
Non Disability Related Development
7
Disability Related Development
8
Medical Records Part 1
9
Medical Records Part 2
9 Attachments
13
11/17/2017
OPENING BRIEF by Terry Orsburn.
14
12/18/2017
RESPONSE BRIEF by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
15
01/02/2018
REPLY BRIEF by Terry Orsburn Reply Brief in Support of Social Security Appeal.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.