Oscar Miguel Hernandez
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona (Bankruptcy)

2:2015-bk-07068 (azb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 706 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/08/2015
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition filed by OSCAR MIGUEL HERNANDEZ Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2015
2
06/08/2015
Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 07/14/2015 at 09:00 AM at US Trustee Meeting Room, 230 N. First Avenue, Suite 102, Phoenix, AZ (341-PHX). Complaints objecting to discharge due by 09/14/2015.
3
06/08/2015
Notice to Document Preparer that Case Filed, Notice to Debtor Not Represented by an Attorney
4
06/08/2015
Credit Counseling Certificate filed by OSCAR MIGUEL HERNANDEZ.
5
06/08/2015
Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments filed by OSCAR MIGUEL HERNANDEZ.
6
06/08/2015
Debtor Application to Waive Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee filed by OSCAR MIGUEL HERNANDEZ.
7
06/08/2015
Statement of Social Security Number Submitted
8
06/08/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 3 Document Preparer Notice of Filing)
9
06/08/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 3 Document Preparer Notice of Filing)
10
06/12/2015
Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 22A-1 $0.00, Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention, Master Mailing List, Bankruptcy Petition Preparer Section 110(b)(2) Notice to Debtor, Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs filed by OSCAR MIGUEL HERNANDEZ.(STEWARD, P.A.)
11
06/12/2015
Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Preparer filed by P.A. (AZCLDP 80297) STEWARD.(STEWARD, P.A.)
12
06/15/2015
Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint--Notice of Meeting of Creditors (related document(s) 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition)
13
06/15/2015
Notice of Financial Management Course Due
14
06/15/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 13 Notice of Financial Management Course Due)
15
06/15/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors (related document(s) 12 BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint)
16
06/29/2015
ORDER Denying Application of the Debtor for Waiver of the Chapter 7 Filing Fee and Order to Pay the Filing Fee in Installments signed on 6/29/2015 (related document(s) 6 Debtor Application to Waive Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee) First Filing Fee Installment due by 7/13/2015, Second Filing Fee Installment due by 8/10/2015, Third Filing Fee Installment due by 9/8/2015, Final Filing Fee Installment due by 10/5/2015. Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2015
17
06/29/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 16 Order Denying Application of the Debtor for Waiver of the Chapter 7 Filing Fee)
18
07/20/2015
Meeting of Creditors was held on date as scheduled Debtor appeared.
19
07/20/2015
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, JILL H. FORD, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Pursuant to Fed R Bank P 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $50.00, Assets Exempt: Not Available, Claims Scheduled: $392190.20, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $392190.20.
20
07/23/2015
ORDER Dismissing Case Debtor (related document(s) 16 Order Denying Application of the Debtor for Waiver of the Chapter 7 Filing Fee).
21
07/23/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal Order (related document(s) 20 Order Dismissing Case)
08/03/2015
Receipt of Chapter 7 Installment Filing Fee - $90.00 from OSCAR HERNANDEZ. Receipt Number 20069932. (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
08/03/2015
Motion to Reinstate Case, in addition to Motion to Extend Time to Pay Filing Fee filed by OSCAR MIGUEL HERNANDEZ (related document(s) 16 Order Denying Application of the Debtor for Waiver of the Chapter 7 Filing Fee, 20 Order Dismissing Case).
23
08/03/2015
ORDER Reinstating Case Debtor signed on 8/3/2015 (related document(s) 22 Motion to Reinstate Case, Motion to Extend Time to Pay Filing Fee).
24
08/05/2015
REINSTATED CASE Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint--Notice of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/25/2015 at 12:00 PM at US Trustee Meeting Room, 230 N. First Avenue, Suite 102, Phoenix, AZ (341-PHX) Complaints under Sections 727 or 523 due by 10/26/2015.
25
08/06/2015
ORDER Denying Filing Fee Waiver and Granting Motion to Extend Time to Pay Filing Fee (Related Doc # 22) signed on 8/6/2015 Final Filing Fee Installment due by 10/30/2015.
26
08/05/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors (related document(s) 24 BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint)
27
08/05/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 23 Order Reinstating Case)
28
08/06/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 25 Order on Motion to Extend Time to Pay Filing Fee)
29
08/27/2015
Meeting of Creditors was held on date as scheduled Debtor appeared.
30
08/27/2015
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, JILL H. FORD, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Pursuant to Fed R Bank P 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 3 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $50.00, Assets Exempt: Not Available, Claims Scheduled: $392190.20, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $392190.20.
09/10/2015
Receipt of Chapter 7 Installment Filing Fee - $90.00 from OSCAR HERNANDEZ. Receipt Number 20071324. (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
10/04/2015
Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee) for 2926 E. Cherry Lynn Rd Phoenix, AZ 85016 filed by DIANE L. DRAIN of LAW OFFICE OF D.L. DRAIN, P.A. on behalf of MICHAEL R. REHM & ELIZABETH A. REHM TRUST.
1
Exhibit A - Petition #
2
Exhibit B - Trustee's Deed #
3
Exhibit C - Complaint for Eviction #
4
Exhibit D - Schedule A #
5
Exhibit E - Unexpired Leases #
6
Exhibit F - SOFA #15 #
7
Exhibit H - City of Phoenix citation #
8
Exhibit I - Debtors Motion to Stay FED #
9
Exhibit G-1 - Pictures of Property #
10
Exhibit Property Pictures Exhibit G-2 #
11
Exhibit Property Pictures Exhibit G-3 #
12
Exhibit Property Pictures Exhibit G-4 #
13
Exhibit Property Pictures Exhibit G-5 #
14
Exhibit Property Pictures Exhibit G-6 #
15
Exhibit Property Pictures Exhibit G-7
15 Attachments
10/04/2015
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee)(2:15-bk-07068-MCW) [motion,185] (176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 26020707. Fee amount 176.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
10/04/2015
Notice of Bar Date If No Expedited Hearing is Scheduled filed by DIANE L. DRAIN of LAW OFFICE OF D.L. DRAIN, P.A. on behalf of MICHAEL R. REHM & ELIZABETH A. REHM TRUST (related document(s) 31 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee)) Objections/Responses due by 10/19/2015.
1
Proposed Order Granting Movant's Motion for Relief
1 Attachment
33
10/04/2015
Certificate of Service Of Motion for Relief filed by DIANE L. DRAIN of LAW OFFICE OF D.L. DRAIN, P.A. on behalf of MICHAEL R. REHM & ELIZABETH A. REHM TRUST. (related document(s) 31 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee))
34
10/04/2015
Motion to Accelerate/Expedite Movant's Expedited Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay filed by DIANE L. DRAIN of LAW OFFICE OF D.L. DRAIN, P.A. on behalf of MICHAEL R. REHM & ELIZABETH A. REHM TRUST (related document(s) 31 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee)).
35
10/05/2015
ORDER Granting Expedited Hearing on Movant's Emergency Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay and for Adequate Protection (Related Doc # 34) signed on 10/5/2015 Hearing on Emergency/Expedited Motion set for 10/7/2015 at 02:00 PM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 702, Phoenix, AZ (MCW).
36
10/05/2015
Amended Certificate of Service of Motion for Relief, Proposed Order, Order Setting Expedited Hearing filed by DIANE L. DRAIN of LAW OFFICE OF D.L. DRAIN, P.A. on behalf of MICHAEL R. REHM & ELIZABETH A. REHM TRUST. (related document(s) 31 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee), 34 Motion to Accelerate/Expedite)
37
10/05/2015
Amended Certificate of Service correcting address of Subject Property filed by DIANE L. DRAIN of LAW OFFICE OF D.L. DRAIN, P.A. on behalf of MICHAEL R. REHM & ELIZABETH A. REHM TRUST. (related document(s) 31 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee))
38
10/06/2015
Notice of Appearance filed by PATRICK T. DERKSEN of WITTHOFT DERKSEN, PC on behalf of JILL H. FORD.
39
10/06/2015
Application to Employ Trustee's Application for Employment of Counsel filed by PATRICK T. DERKSEN of WITTHOFT DERKSEN, PC on behalf of JILL H. FORD.
40
10/06/2015
Declaration of Attorney Patrick T. Derksen in Support of Trustee's Application for Employment of Counsel filed by PATRICK T. DERKSEN of WITTHOFT DERKSEN, PC on behalf of JILL H. FORD. (related document(s) 39 Application to Employ)
41
10/06/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Authorizing Employment of Counsel filed by PATRICK T. DERKSEN of WITTHOFT DERKSEN, PC on behalf of JILL H. FORD (related document(s) 39 Application to Employ).
42
10/06/2015
Notice of No Objection Trustee's Notice of No Objection to Emergency Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay and for Adequate Protection filed by PATRICK T. DERKSEN of WITTHOFT DERKSEN, PC on behalf of JILL H. FORD (related document(s) 31 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee)).
43
10/06/2015
Supplemental Amended Motion for Relief from Stay Movant's Expedited Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay filed by DIANE L. DRAIN of LAW OFFICE OF D.L. DRAIN, P.A. on behalf of MICHAEL R. REHM & ELIZABETH A. REHM TRUST (related document(s) 31 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee)).
44
10/06/2015
Affidavit of Service by John McClimon on Debtor filed by DIANE L. DRAIN of LAW OFFICE OF D.L. DRAIN, P.A. on behalf of MICHAEL R. REHM & ELIZABETH A. REHM TRUST. (related document(s) 31 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee))
1
Pictures from process server
1 Attachment
45
10/07/2015
ORDER Granting Application to Employ (Related Doc # 39) signed on 10/7/2015.
46
10/07/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Granting Movant's Motion for Relief filed by DIANE L. DRAIN of LAW OFFICE OF D.L. DRAIN, P.A. on behalf of MICHAEL R. REHM & ELIZABETH A. REHM TRUST (related document(s) 31 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee)).
1
Proposed Order Granting Movant's Motion for Relief
1 Attachment
47
10/07/2015
Minutes of Hearing held on: 10/07/2015 Subject: EXPEDITED HEARING ON EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY AND FOR ADEQUATE PROTECTION RE: 2926 E CHERRY LYNN RD., PHOENIX, AZ 85016 FILED BY MICHAEL R. REHM & ELIZABETH A. REHM TRUST. (vCal Hearing ID (1316038)). (related document(s) 34)
48
10/07/2015
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/07/2015 02:00 PM ]. File Size [ 9,764 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:20:49 ]. (vCal Hearing ID (1316038)).
49
10/08/2015
Trustee Withdrawal of Report of No Distribution filed by JILL H. FORD on behalf of JILL H. FORD.
50
10/08/2015
ORDER Granting Motion for Relief from Stay (Related Doc # 31) signed on 10/8/2015.
51
10/08/2015
ORDER Granting Movant's Emergency Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay and for Adequate Protection (Amended to Correct Address) signed on 10/8/2015 (related document(s) 31 Motion for Relief from Stay (176.00 fee)).
52
10/09/2015
Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order (related document(s) 51 Order Granting)
53
10/08/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 50 Order on Motion for Relief from Stay)
54
10/08/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 50 Order on Motion for Relief from Stay)
55
10/09/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 52 Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order)
56
10/09/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 52 Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order)
57
10/15/2015
Notice of Appearance filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL CONECKY on behalf of OSCAR MIGUEL HERNANDEZ.
58
10/15/2015
Notice of Filing Documents Referenced in Court filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL CONECKY on behalf of OSCAR MIGUEL HERNANDEZ.
1
Exhibit Exhibit A
1 Attachment
10/15/2015
Receipt of Chapter 7 Installment Filing Fee - $90.00 from OSCAR MIGUEL HERNANDEZ. Receipt Number 20072612. (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/23/2015
Receipt of Chapter 7 Final Installment Filing Fee - $65.00 from OSCAR MIGUEL HERNANDEZ. Receipt Number 20073921. (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
12/03/2015
Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course
60
12/04/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 59 Deficiency Memo to Debtor (No Financial Management Course Form))
61
01/12/2016
The estate having been fully administered, further administration of the reopened case having been completed, or the case reopened for the filing of further proceedings which either have been filed and no further court action is required or were not filed within 90 days of the reopening; IT IS ORDERED that the case is closed and if a trustee has been appointed, the trustee is discharged from and relieved of his trust. Jurisdiction is retained over any pending adversary(s). Judge Madeleine C. Wanslee
62
01/12/2016
ENTERED IN ERROR Notice That Case was Closed Without Entry of the Discharge for Failure of the Debtor to File a Certificate of Completion of the Financial Management Course. Modified on 1/26/2016
63
01/14/2016
ORDER Reopening Case Due to Administrative Error signed on 1/14/2016.
64
01/13/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 62 Notice Case Closed With No Discharge)
65
01/14/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 63 Order Reopening Case Due to Administrative Error)
66
01/26/2016
Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course
67
01/26/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 66 Deficiency Memo to Debtor (No Financial Management Course Form))
68
02/10/2016
Financial Management Course Certificate filed by OSCAR MIGUEL HERNANDEZ.
69
02/11/2016
Chapter 7 Discharge, Debtor
70
02/11/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice - Discharge of Debtor (related document(s) 69 BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge)
71
02/17/2016
The estate having been fully administered, further administration of the reopened case having been completed, or the case reopened for the filing of further proceedings which either have been filed and no further court action is required or were not filed within 90 days of the reopening; IT IS ORDERED that the case is closed and if a trustee has been appointed, the trustee is discharged from and relieved of his trust. Jurisdiction is retained over any pending adversary(s). Judge Madeleine C. Wanslee
72
02/17/2016
ORDER Reopening Case Due to Administrative Error signed on 2/17/2016.
73
02/17/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 72 Order Reopening Case Due to Administrative Error)
74
02/23/2016
Application for FRBP 2004 Examination Of Oscar Miguel Hernandez filed by PATRICK T. DERKSEN of WITTHOFT DERKSEN, PC on behalf of JILL H. FORD.
75
02/23/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order for Rule 2004 Examination of Oscar Miguel Hernandez filed by PATRICK T. DERKSEN of WITTHOFT DERKSEN, PC on behalf of JILL H. FORD (related document(s) 74 Application for FRBP 2004 Examination).
76
02/23/2016
Amended Application for FRBP 2004 Examination Of Oscar Miguel Hernandez filed by PATRICK T. DERKSEN of WITTHOFT DERKSEN, PC on behalf of JILL H. FORD.
77
02/23/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order For Rule 2004 Examination of Oscar Miguel Hernandez filed by PATRICK T. DERKSEN of WITTHOFT DERKSEN, PC on behalf of JILL H. FORD (related document(s) 76 Application for FRBP 2004 Examination).
78
02/23/2016
ORDER Granting Application for FRBP 2004 Examination (Related Doc # 76) signed on 2/23/2016.
79
03/10/2016
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL CONECKY on behalf of OSCAR MIGUEL HERNANDEZ.
1
Exhibit Exhibit 1 #
2
Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw
2 Attachments
80
03/14/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL CONECKY on behalf of OSCAR MIGUEL HERNANDEZ (related document(s) 79 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney).
1
Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw
1 Attachment
81
03/22/2016
Notice of 2004 Examination Notice of Rule 2004 Examination of Oscar Miguel Hernandez filed by PATRICK T. DERKSEN of WITTHOFT DERKSEN, PC on behalf of JILL H. FORD.
82
03/24/2016
ORDER Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Related Doc # 79) signed on 3/24/2016.
83
04/14/2016
Notice of 2004 Examination Notice of Re-Scheduled Rule 2004 Examination of Oscar Miguel Hernandez filed by PATRICK T. DERKSEN of WITTHOFT DERKSEN, PC on behalf of JILL H. FORD.
84
07/20/2016
Application to Employ Trustee's Application For Authorization To Employ Special Counsel (State Court Litigation) filed by PATRICK T. DERKSEN of WITTHOFT DERKSEN, PC on behalf of JILL H. FORD.
85
07/20/2016
Declaration of Attorney Declaration in Support of Trustee's Application for Authorization to Employ Special Counsel (State Court Litigation) filed by PATRICK T. DERKSEN of WITTHOFT DERKSEN, PC on behalf of JILL H. FORD. (related document(s) 84 Application to Employ)
86
07/20/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Employment of Special Counsel (State Court Litigation) filed by PATRICK T. DERKSEN of WITTHOFT DERKSEN, PC on behalf of JILL H. FORD (related document(s) 84 Application to Employ).
87
07/20/2016
Application to Employ Trustee's Application for Authorization to Employ Special Counsel (District Court Litigation) filed by PATRICK T. DERKSEN of WITTHOFT DERKSEN, PC on behalf of JILL H. FORD.
88
07/20/2016
Declaration of Attorney Declaration in Support of Trustee's Application for Authorization to Employ Special Counsel (District Court Litigation) filed by PATRICK T. DERKSEN of WITTHOFT DERKSEN, PC on behalf of JILL H. FORD. (related document(s) 87 Application to Employ)
89
07/20/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Employment of Special Counsel (District Court Litigation) filed by PATRICK T. DERKSEN of WITTHOFT DERKSEN, PC on behalf of JILL H. FORD (related document(s) 87 Application to Employ).
90
07/21/2016
ORDER Granting Application to Employ (Related Doc # 84) signed on 7/21/2016.
91
07/21/2016
ORDER Granting Application to Employ (Related Doc # 87) signed on 7/21/2016.
92
10/10/2016
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, JILL H. FORD, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Pursuant to Fed R Bank P 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 8 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $50.00, Assets Exempt: Not Available, Claims Scheduled: $392190.20, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $392190.20. filed by JILL H. FORD on behalf of JILL H. FORD.
93
10/17/2016
Trustee Withdrawal of Report of No Distribution filed by JILL H. FORD on behalf of JILL H. FORD.
98
07/02/2018
Approve Compromise/Settlement (Motion to)
99
07/03/2018
Hearing on Settlement (Notice of)
100
07/03/2018
Certificate of Mailing
101
07/23/2018
Change of Address (Debtor)
102
07/31/2018
Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)
103
08/01/2018
Order
104
08/01/2018
Minute Entry
105
08/02/2018
oAllowing Fees and Expenses to Attorney or Other Professional Employed by Trustee
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.