Ott v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Court Docket Sheet

3:2017-cv-08051 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 436 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
03/20/2017
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX183405 as to Howard D Olinsky. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
1
03/14/2017
COMPLAINT filed by Dennis Lee Ott. (submitted by Howard Olinsky)
1
Letter
2
Civil Cover Sheet
2 Attachments
2
03/14/2017
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Long Form) by Dennis Lee Ott. (submitted by Howard Olinsky)
3
03/14/2017
SUMMONS Submitted by Dennis Lee Ott. (submitted by Howard Olinsky)
1
Summons
2
Summons
2 Attachments
4
03/14/2017
This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-17-08051-PCT-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.
5
03/14/2017
ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 3/14/17.
6
03/14/2017
SCHEDULING ORDER (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 3/14/17.
7
03/15/2017
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Howard D. Olinsky by Dennis Lee Ott.
8
03/15/2017
Summons Issued as to SSA Office of General Counsel, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.
1
Summons
2
Summons
2 Attachments
9
03/20/2017
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
10
04/11/2017
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Dennis Lee Ott: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint and Scheduling Order upon US Attorney's Office, Office of General Counsel, Attorney General on 4/7/2017.
11
06/06/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Ta Lu on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
12
06/06/2017
ANSWER to [1] Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
13
06/06/2017
NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript re: [12] Answer to Complaint filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
1
001 Certification Page
2
002 Court Transcript Index
3
003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral He
4
004 Payment Documents and Decisions
5
005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices
6
006 Non Disability Related Development
7
007 Disability Related Development
8
008 Medical Records Part 1
9
009 Medical Records Part 2
10
010 Medical Records Part 3
11
011 Medical Records Part 4
12
012 Medical Records Part 5
12 Attachments
14
08/07/2017
OPENING BRIEF by Dennis Lee Ott.
15
09/05/2017
RESPONSE BRIEF by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
16
09/20/2017
REPLY BRIEF by Dennis Lee Ott.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.