Pamela Idell Echols
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00163 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/30/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
05/30/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/30/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
doc
05/30/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
05/30/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/30/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
05/30/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/30/2018
Amended Voluntary Petition
doc
05/30/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
05/31/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
06/11/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
07/03/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
08/27/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
16
08/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
08/30/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.