Pamela Sue Kinsey
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-04401 (alnb)

Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)

IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION IN RE:) CASE NO.: 17-04401-TOM13 PAMELA SUE KINSEY) SS#: ###-##-0541))) DIRECTION FOR DEDUCTION TO: ST VINCENT'S HEALTH SYSTEM This Direction replaces any Direction you ATTN: PAYROLL DEPT. have previously received from the Trustee 810 ST. VINCENT'S DRIVE regarding this Debtor. BIRMINGHAM, AL 35205- the employer of the above-named Debtor. The Debtor named herein has filed a petition under Chapter 13 of the Bankruptcy Code, thereby subjecting his or her future earnings to the jurisdiction of the United States Bankruptcy Court until further notice. The Debtor has filed a written plan and the Bankruptcy Court has assumed jurisdiction over the Debtor's future earnings, which are no longer subject to levy or garnishment except continuing wage- withholding orders for current child support. The Debtor has requested or agreed to the issuance of this Direction to implement the proposed plan in this case, or the plan has been confirmed as provided by law. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1325(c), "After confirmation of a plan, the court may order any entity from whom the debtor receives income to pay all or any part of such income to the trustee." IT IS DIRECTED that, beginning immediately, the above-named Employer is directed to deduct from the Debtor's earnings, vacation pay, and bonuses, the sum of $292.00 BIWEEKLY and forward said deductions at least once each month to the Chapter 13 Trustee for this Court at: Bradford W. Caraway Chapter 13 Standing Trustee Department SF 3 P.O. Box 830525 Birmingham, AL 35283-0525 The above named employer is hereby enjoined from imposing any type of penalty or taking any type of disciplinary action against the Employee-Debtor based on the issuance or effect of this Direction. It has been issued to implement the Debtor's voluntary Chapter 13 plan as authorized by the U.S. Bankruptcy Code. Any such discriminatory action is prohibited by 11 U.S.C. § 525. DATE: January 23, 2018 /s/ Bradford W. Caraway Chapter 13 Standing Trustee P.O. Box 10848 Birmingham, AL 35202-0848 Please include the Debtor's bankruptcy case number with any payment remitted to the Trustee's office. For information regarding this Direction for Deduction, please contact the Trustee's office via telephone (205) 323-4631, via fax (205) 252-0239, or via email info@ch13bham.com. PLEASE NOTIFY THE TRUSTEE'S OFFICE IF THIS DEBTOR LEAVES YOUR EMPLOYMENT SF Case 17-04401-TOM13 Doc 23 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 11:54:22 Desc Page 1 of 2 «user_initials» Case 17-04401-TOM13 Doc 23 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 11:54:22 Desc Page 2 of 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 268 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/13/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Pamela Sue Kinsey
2
10/13/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Pamela Sue Kinsey.
4
10/13/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Pamela Sue Kinsey.
5
10/13/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Pamela Sue Kinsey.
10/13/2017
Payment of Full Filing Fee. Fee Amount $ 310 Filed by Debtor Pamela Sue Kinsey. (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/13/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04401-13) [misc,feepay] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21277964. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
10/13/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Pamela Sue Kinsey.
7
10/13/2017
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Pamela Sue Kinsey.
8
10/13/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/15/2017 at 10:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/14/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 02/13/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 04/11/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 01/16/2018.
9
10/14/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10
10/15/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 10/15/2017.
10/16/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Pamela Sue Kinsey Case Number 12-02643, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 06/01/2012; Case Number 92-03845, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 05/22/1992; Case Number 09-00820, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/12/2009, Standard Discharge on 05/28/2009.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
10/18/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Pamela Sue Kinsey). Notice Date 10/18/2017.
12
10/18/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 10/18/2017.
13
10/19/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
14
11/15/2017
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
15
11/15/2017
Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Pamela Sue Kinsey.
16
11/15/2017
Debtor's Certifications Regarding Domestic Support Obligations and Section 522(q) for Debtor Filed by Debtor Pamela Sue Kinsey.
17
11/16/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 11/15/2017. (Ch13troffice, jc)
18
12/13/2017
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (Confirmation Hearing) Hearing scheduled 12/14/2017 at 10:59 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
19
12/15/2017
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
20
01/10/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 1/10/2018 (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Pamela Sue Kinsey).
21
01/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 01/12/2018.
22
01/19/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Thomas G Tutten Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
23
01/23/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.