Pamela Yarbrough
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81940 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
8
07/03/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
07/03/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
01/17/2019
Relief from Stay
42
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
44
02/06/2019
Limit Notice
48
03/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.