Patrice Munsel Williams
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-04748 (alnb)

Report of Audit with No Material Misstatement Identified. Filed by Hagerman, Rachael

UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA In re:)) PATRICE MUNSEL WILLIAMS) Case No. 17-04748-DSC13) Chapter 13) AO Project # DBT18-022 Debtor.) REPORT OF DEBTOR AUDIT Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 586(f)(1), the Administrative Office of the United States Courts (AOUSC) contracted for an audit to be performed of the above-captioned debtor's petition, schedules and other information filed by the debtor in this case. In accordance with the Debtor Audit Standards established pursuant to Section 603(a) of the Bankruptcy Abuse Prevention and Consumer Protection Act of 2005, Tichenor & Associates, LLP performed the procedures enumerated in the contract between it and the AOUSC to determine whether certain items in the bankruptcy petition, schedules, and statements as originally filed by PATRICE MUNSEL WILLIAMS in Bankruptcy Case No. 17-04748-DSC13 contain material misstatements concerning the debtor's income, expenditures, or assets. The auditor finds: No material misstatements.  One or more material misstatements. The material misstatements are listed on the attached List of Material Misstatements. The debtor was responsible for the preparation of the bankruptcy petition, schedules, and statements in this case. The AOUSC is responsible for the sufficiency of the procedures developed to determine the accuracy, veracity, and completeness of the petitions, schedules and other information that the debtor is required to provide under 11 U.S.C. §§ 521 and 1322. Tichenor & Associates, LLP makes no representation regarding the sufficiency of the procedures either for the purpose for which this report has been requested or for any other purpose. The analysis and findings contained in this report are intended solely for the information and of the AOUSC and parties-in-interest in the subject civil bankruptcy proceeding and are not intended to be and should not be used by anyone other than these parties. However, this report is a matter of public record and its distribution is not limited. The Report is not a legal Case 17-04748-DSC13 Doc 39 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/15/18 14:12:47 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 2 determination, and the legal effect of the auditor's findings of material misstatement is a question for the Court. Further, the findings contained in the report neither require the AOUSC or other parties in interest to take, nor preclude these parties from taking, legal action in or relating to this case, including with respect to matters not discussed in this report. Dated this 15th day of February, 2018. Respectfully submitted, /s/ William R. Tichenor, CPA William R. Tichenor, CPA Managing Partner TICHENOR & ASSOCIATES, LLP 1700 Eastpoint Parkway, Suite 270 Louisville, KY 40223 (502) 245-0775 cc: Bankruptcy Administrator Northern District of Alabama Chapter 13 Trustee of Northern District of Alabama AO Office of Audit 2 Case 17-04748-DSC13 Doc 39 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/15/18 14:12:47 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 247 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/03/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Patrice Munsel Williams
2
11/03/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Patrice Munsel Williams.
3
11/03/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Patrice Munsel Williams
5
11/03/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Patrice Munsel Williams.
6
11/03/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Patrice Munsel Williams.
7
11/03/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Patrice Munsel Williams.
8
11/03/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/13/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/23/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/13/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 05/02/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 02/12/2018.
9
11/04/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
10
11/05/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 11/05/2017.
11/06/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Patrice Munsel Williams Case Number 97-07446, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 10/03/1997, Dismissed for Other Reason on 09/22/2000; Case Number 14-02954, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 07/31/2014, Standard Discharge on 11/10/2014.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
11/04/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
12
11/06/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Patrice Munsel Williams).
13
11/07/2017
Notes: In reference to Section 1328(f) the debtor received a discharge in Case Number 14-02954-7 filed 7/31/2014, Standard Discharge on 11/10/2014. (RE: related document(s) 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Patrice Munsel Williams).
14
11/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Patrice Munsel Williams). Notice Date 11/08/2017.
15
11/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 11 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 11/08/2017.
16
11/09/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A., c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
17
11/09/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A., c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
18
11/13/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
19
11/19/2017
Amended Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Patrice Munsel Williams
20
11/20/2017
Order Approving Amended Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 19 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Patrice Munsel Williams).
21
12/14/2017
**ENTERED IN ERROR - incorrect date** Meeting of Creditors Held 12/20/2017. (Ch13troffice, bc) Modified on 12/14/2017
22
12/14/2017
CORRECTIVE ENTRY incorrect date Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway (RE: related document(s) 21 Meeting of Creditors Held). (Ch13troffice, bc)
23
12/14/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 12/13/2017. (Ch13troffice, bc)
24
12/14/2017
Bankruptcy Administrator Motion to Obtain Statement of Social Security Number Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Jon A Dudeck.
25
12/15/2017
Order Granting Bankruptcy Administrator Motion to Obtain Statement of Social Security Number (Related Doc # 24) Signed on 12/15/2017.
26
12/17/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 25 Order on Bankruptcy Administrator Motion to Obtain Statement of Social Security Number). Notice Date 12/17/2017.
28
12/20/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i). (Ch13troffice, km)
29
12/21/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 28 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i)). Hearing scheduled 1/23/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
30
12/23/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 29 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/23/2017.
31
12/26/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Enslen Crowe Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
32
01/05/2018
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a divison of Capital One, N.A. c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
33
01/05/2018
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a divison of Capital One, N.A. c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
34
01/14/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 2015 Filed by Debtor Patrice Munsel Williams.
01/22/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 155.00 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04748-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (155.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21630625. Fee Amount 155.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
01/22/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (Confirmation Hearing) Hearing scheduled 01/23/2018 at 10:59 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
36
01/25/2018
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
02/08/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 77.50 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04748-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (77.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21700433. Fee Amount 77.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
02/08/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan. Trustees Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are Withdrawn. Signed on 2/8/2018 (RE: related document(s) 28 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i)).
38
02/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 37 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 02/10/2018.
39
02/15/2018
Report of Audit with No Material Misstatement Identified. Filed by Hagerman, Rachael
42
10/15/2018
Fact Summary for Motion for Relief from Stay
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.