Patricia A Victor
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00101 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Schedule H (Form 106H & 206H)
doc
05/21/2018
Schedule G (Form 106G & 206G)
doc
05/21/2018
Schedule C (Form 106C)
doc
05/21/2018
Schedule A/B (Form 106A/B & 206A/B)
05/29/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
doc
05/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
doc
06/01/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
doc
06/04/2018
Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (SA)
30
06/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
31
06/08/2018
Proceeding Memo
32
06/08/2018
Dismissing Case (SA)
33
06/08/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
34
06/08/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
35
06/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/11/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
06/27/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
37
06/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
38
07/17/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
07/18/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.