Patrick Michael Hickey
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2013-bk-00533 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Request for Special Notice
109
07/10/2018
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
07/10/2018
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
Transfer of Claim Fee Paid (Text entry; no document attached.)
110
07/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims
111
08/03/2018
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
08/03/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
Transfer of Claim Fee Paid (Text entry; no document attached.)
112
08/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims
113
08/29/2018
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
08/29/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/29/2018
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/29/2018
Transfer of Claim Fee Paid (Text entry; no document attached.)
114
08/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims
115
11/21/2018
Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment - 3002.1(f)
116
12/10/2018
Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1 (g)
117
12/20/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
118
12/20/2018
Notice of Intent to Enter Chapter 13 Discharge
119
12/24/2018
Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1 (g)
120
01/23/2019
Final Notice of Intent to Close Case Without Discharge - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
121
01/25/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
122
01/28/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
123
01/29/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
124
01/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
02/01/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.