Patrick Shane Holley
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-00487 (alnb)

Notice of Voluntary Conversion to Chapter 7 Fee Amount $25.

UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION HOLLEY, Patrick Shane Debtor(s) Case# 17-00487 MOTION TO CONVERT CHAPTER 7 CASE TO CHAPTER 13 The abovestyled Debtor(s), by and through Counsel of record, respectfully move(s) the Court to Convert this Case to Chapter 13. The grounds for therefore are as follows: 1. The case has become unfeasible. By: _/s/ Brent W Davis__________ BY: Brent W Davis, Esq. Brent W. Davis, LLC Attorney for Debtor 2700 Rogers Drive, Suite 106 Homewood AL 35209-2055 Phone (205) 989-1919 ~ Fax 866-825-8756 Email brent@brentwdavis.com DATED: February 13, 2018 Case 17-00487-DSC13 Doc 60 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 10:02:11 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 2 United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re Patrick Shane Holley Case No. 17-00487 Debtor(s) Chapter 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE I hereby certify that on February 13, 2018, a copy of attached was served electronically or by regular United States mail to all interested parties, the Trustee and all creditors required. -NONE- /s/ Brent W. Davis Brent W. Davis ASB-5320-I45B Brent W. Davis & Associates, L.L.C. 2700 Rogers Drive Suite 106 Birmingham, AL 35209-2055 205-989-1919Fax:1-866-825-8756 brent@brentwdavis.com Software Copyright (c) 1996-2017 Best Case, LLC - www.bestcase.com Best Case Bankruptcy Case 17-00487-DSC13 Doc 60 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 10:02:11 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 2

Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay, on 5435 Quail Ridge Road, Gardendale, AL 35071 Filed by Creditor U.S. Bank National Association

Case 17-00487-DSC13 Doc 61 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 11:04:32 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 4 Case 17-00487-DSC13 Doc 61 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 11:04:32 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 4 agreement or other loan workout/loss mitigation agreement. Movant may contact the Debtor and Co-Debtor via telephone or written correspondence to offer such an agreement. Any such agreement shall be non-recourse unless included in a reaffirmation agreement. WHEREFORE, PREMISES CONSIDERED, your Movant U.S. Bank National Association, moves for termination of the stay pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 362(a) and 11 U.S.C. § 130l(a) to permit Movant to enforce any and all of its respective rights, title and interest in and to the aforementioned property, including, but not limited to foreclosure, in accordance with the provisions of the note and mortgage, and the laws of the State of Alabama; for relief to contact Debtor and Co-Debtor at its option regarding loss mitigation agreements: and for waiver of Bankruptcy Rule 400l(a)(3). ls/Michael McCormick Michael McCormick Attorney for Movant U.S. Bank National Association McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC 1544 0 ld Alabama Road Roswell, Georgia 30076 678-281-3918 Michael.McCormick@mccalla.com Case 17-00487-DSC13 Doc 61 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 11:04:32 Desc Main Document Page 3 of 4 13th February Case 17-00487-DSC13 Doc 61 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 11:04:32 Desc Main Document Page 4 of 4

Affidavit #

IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA BIRMINGHAM DIVISION IN RE: PATRICK SHANE HOLLEY, CASE NO .: 17 - 00487 - DSC13 DEBTOR. NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT COMES NOWU.S. Bank National Association, by and through the undersigned Counsel, and files the attached Affidavit with the Court. / s / Michael McCormick Michael McCormick Attorney for MovantU.S. Bank National Association McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC 1544 Old Alabaina Road Roswell, GA 30076 678 - 281 - 3918 Michael. McCormick @ mccalla. com Case 17 - 00487 - DSC13 Doc 61 - 1 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 04: 32 Desc Affidavit Page 1 of 4 EXHIBIT B IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA BIRMINGHAM DIVISION IN RE: PATRICK SHANE HOLLEY, CASE NO .: 17 - 00487 - DSCI3 DEBTOR. AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION FOR KELIEF FROM AUTOMATIC STAY AND CO - DEBTOR STAY Before me, the undersigned authority, personally appeared Caviar hon 29 / 2, who being known to me and by me first duly sworn on oath, does depose and states the following: Of 1. My name is Javier healglez and I am a / an officer the Bankruptcy Department atU.S. Bank National Association ("Movant") . Part of my employment in the Bankruptcy Department is to monitor the processing of payinents and / or Cçinimuliicate with various parties relating to a loain serviced by. Movanl, which is currently in bankruptcy. I have an understanding of how tlie books, records, and computer systems relating to Joan servicing work atU.S. Bank National Association. 2, The Debtor executed a Note and Mortgage in the principal amount of $ 274, 928. 00 oli June 16, 2014, Allison Powell ("Co - Debtor") also signed the Mortgage. The note is secured by a real property beiing more particularly described in Movant's Motion for Relief froin Automatic Stuy and Co - Debtor. Stay on file and as evidenced by the Note and Mortgage attached to Movant's said Motio11. Movánt is the current fiolder of said Note and Mortgage: Debtor's Schedule A in the bankruptcy petition lists the current value of Debtor's interest in the real property described hereinabove as $ 287, 800. 00. 3. The subject Note witlı Movant beat's a rate of interest as tlierein provided, Debtor has uot paid certain post - petition installments and other charges totaling to - wit: the October, 2017 to onthly installments ($ 1, 909. 43 each) . Movant will incur additional costs associated witli kis Motion. The estimated amount owed as of December 13, 2017 is: Principal Balance S262, 085. 03 Case 17 - 00487 - DSC13 Doc 61 - 1 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 04: 32 Desc Affidavit Page 2 of 4 Interest Escrow Advances Pro Raia MIP / PMI Suspense Balance ESTIMATED TOTAL S11, 701. 72 $ 7, 654. 56 $ 284. 51 ($ 403. 19) $ 281, 322. 63 Signed this the IPA day of February DI U ti (2018. Jav, urlionale L Loa11 No XXXXXX0167 Sworm to and subscribed before me on this tlie. KU AILL, 2018. 2018. ' revisi ELIZABETH GRACE BROWN Notary Public, State of Texas My Commission Expires October 02, 2018 41: * Notary Public My commission expires: 10 - Z - 2018 14111 Case 17 - 00487 - DSC13 Doc 61 - 1 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 04: 32 Desc Affidavit Page 3 of 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE I hereby certify that I have served a true and correct copy of the foregoing Motion to the parties listed below by placing a copy of the same in the United States Mail first - class, postage prepaid, on this the 13th day of February 2018. Debtor's counsel was served with this motion via electronic filing issued by the Court Clerk to the email address on record with the Court. Debtor's Attorney Brent William Davis brent (@ brentwdavis. com and the following by regularU.S. Mail addressed to: Debtor Patrick Shane Holley 5435 Quail Ridge Road Gardendale, AL 35071 Co - Debtor Allison Powell 5435 Quail Ridge Road Gardendale, AL 35071 Trustee Bradford W. Caraway Chapter 13 Standing Trustee PO Box 10848 Birmingham, AL 35202 - 0848 / s / Michael McCormick Michael McCormick Attorney for Movant McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC 1544 Old Alabama Road Roswell, Georgia 30076 678 - 281 - 3918 Michael. McCormick (amccalla. com Case 17 - 00487 - DSC13 Doc 61 - 1 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 04: 32 Desc Affidavit Page 4 of 4

Exhibit Loan documents #

20140620000551710. 179 Bk: LR201414 Pg: 8627 Jefferson County, Alabama I certify this instrument filed on: 06 / 20 / 2014 11: 54 29 AM MTG Judge of Probate - Alan L. King EXHIBIT A WHEN RECORDED, MAIL TO: First Federal Bank 1300 McFarland Blvd NE Tuscaloosa, ALABAMA 35406 This instrument was prepared by: Natasha Walton First Federal Bank 1300 McFarland Blvd NE Tuscaloosa, ALABAMA 35406 205 - 391 - 6700 [ Space Above This Line For Recording Data ] . State of Alabama MORTGAGE THIS MORTGAGE ("Security Instrument") is given on June 16, 2014. The Grantor is Patrick S. Holley and Allison Powell, husband and wife, as joint tenants with full rights of survivorship, ("Borrowerº") . This Security Instrument is given to Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. ("MERS"), (solely as nominee for Lender, as hereinafter defined, and Lender's successors and assigns), as mortgagee. MERS is organized and existing under the laws of Delaware, and has an address and telephone number of P. O. Box 2026, Flint, MI 48501 - 2026, tel. (888) 679 - MERS. First Federal Bank, ("Lender") is organized and existing under the laws of United States of America, and has an address of 1300 McFarland Blvd NE, Tuscaloosa, ALABAMA 35406. Borrower owes Lender the principal sum of TWO HUNDRED SEVENTY - FOUR THOUSAND NINE HUNDRED TWENTY - EIGHT AND NO / 100 Dollars (U. S. $ 274, 928. 00) . This debt is evidenced by Borrower's note dated the same date as this Security Instrument ("Note"), which provides for monthly payments, with the full debt, if not paid earlier, due and payable on July 1, 2044. This Security Instrument secures to Lender: (a) the repayment of the debt evidenced by the Note, with interest, and all renewals, extensions and modifications of the Note, (b) the payment of all other sums, with interest, advanced under paragraph 7 to protect the security of this Security Instrument, and (c) the performance of Borrower's covenants and agreements under this Security Instrument and the Note. For this purpose, Borrower does hereby mortgage, grant and convey to MERS (solely as nominee for Lender and Lender's successors and assigns) and to the successors and assigns of MERS, with power of sale, the following described property located in Jefferson County, Alabama: See Attached Exhibit ' A ' Parcel ID Number: which has the address of 5435 Quail Ridge Road Gardendale, ALABAMA 35071, (* " Property Address"); TO HAVE AND TO HOLD this property unto MERS (solely as nominee for Lender and Lender's successors and assigns), and to the successors and assigns of MERS, forever, together with all the improvements now or hereafter erected on the property, and all easements, appurtenances and fixtures now or hereafter a part of the property. All replacements and additions shall also be covered by this Security Instrument. All of the foregoing is referred to in this Security Instrument as the " Property. " Borrower understands and agrees that MERS holds only legal title to the interests granted by Borrower in this Security Instrument, but, if necessary to comply with law or custom, MERS, (as FHA Alabama Mortgage with MERS – 4 / 96 Amended 2 / 01 Page 1 of 6 IDS, Inc. Borrower (s) Initials A. Case 17 - 00487 - DSC13 Doc 61 - 2 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 04: 32 Desc Exhibit Loan documents Page 1 of 14 nominee for Lender and Lender's successors and assigns), has the right; to exercise any or all of those interests, including, but not limited to, the right to toreclose and sell the Property; and to take any action required of l. ender including, but not limited 1), releasing or canceling this Security Instrurnent. BORROWER COVENANTS that Borouer is lawfully seized of the estate hereby conveyed and has the right to mortgage, grant and convey the Property and that the Property is unencumbered, except for encumbrances of record. Borrower warrants and will defend generally the title to the Property against all claims and demands, subject to any encumbrances of record. TITIS SECURITY INSTRUMENT ' combines uniform covenants for national use and non - uniform covenants with limited variations by jurisdiction to constitute a unitom secunty instrument covering real propery. UNIFORM COVENANTS. Bonower and Lender covenant and agree as follows: 1. Payment of Principal, Interest and Late Charge. Borrower shall pay when due the principal of, and interest on, the debt evidenced by the Note and late charges due under the Note. 2. Monthly Payment of Taxes, Insurance and Other Charges. Bumower shall include in each monthly payment, together with the principal and interest as set forth in the Note and any late charges, a sum for (a) taxes and special assessments levied or to be levied against the Property, (b) leasehold payments or ground rents on the Property, and (c) premiums for insurance required under paragraph 4. In any year in which the lender must pay a mortgage insurance premium to the Secretary of 1 lousing and Urban Development ("Secretary"), or in any year in which such premium would have been required if Lender still held the Security Instrument, each monthly payment shall also include either: (i) a sum for the annual mortgage insurance premium to be paid by Lender to the Secretary, or (ii) a monthly charge instead of a mortgage insurance premium if this Security Instrument is held by the Secretary, in a reasonable amount to be determined by the Secretary. Except for the monthly charge by the Secretary, these items are called " Escow Items " and the sums paid to Lender are called " Escrow F ' unds. " Lender may, at any time, collect and hold amounts for Escrow Items in an aggregate amount not to exceed the maximum amount that may be required for Borrower's escrow account under the Real Estate Settlement Procedures Act of 1974, 12U.S. C. Section 2601 et sey, and implementing regulations, 12 CFR Part 1024, as they may be amended from time to time ("RESPA"), except that the cushion or reserve permitted by RESPA for manticipated disbursements or disbursements before the Borrower's payments are available in the account may not be based on amounts due for the mortgage insurance premium. If the amounts held by Lender for Escrow Items exceed the amounts permitted to be held loy RESPA, Lender shall account to Borrower for the excess funds as required by RESPA. If the amounts of funds held by Lender at any time are not sufficient to pay the Escrow Items when due, Lender may notify the Borrower and require Borrower to make up the shortage as permitted by RESPA. The liscrow Funds are pledged as additional security for all sums secured by this Security Instrument. If JBorrower tenders to Lender the full payment of all such suns, Borrower's account shall he credited with the balance remaining for all installment items (a), (b), and (c) and any mortgage insurance premium installment that Lender has not become obligated to pay to the Secretary, and lender shall promptly refund any excess funds to Borrower. Immediately prior to a foreclosure sale of the Property or its acquisition by Lender, Borrower's account shall be credited with any balance remaining for all installments for items (a), (b), and (c) . 3. Application of Payments. All payments under paragraphs 1 and 2 shall be applied by lender as follows: ' irst, to the mortgage insurance premium to be paid by Lender to the Secretary or to the monthly charge by the Secretary instead of the monthly mortgage insurance premium; Second, to any taxes, special assessments, leasehold payments or ground rents, and fire, flood and other hazard insurance premiums, as required; Third, to interest due under the Note: Fourth, to amortization of the principal of the Note, and Siſih. In late charges due under the Note. 4. Fire, Flood and Other Hazard Insurance. Borrower shall insure all improvements on the Property, whether now in existence or subsequently erected, against any hazards, casualties, and contingencies, including fire, for which Lender requires insurance. This insurance shall be maintained in the amounts and for the periods that Lender requires. Borrower shall also insurc all improvements on the Property, whether now in existence or subsequently erected, against loss by floods to the extent required by the Secretary. All insurance shall be carried with companies approved by [ . ender. The insurance policies and any renew als shall be held by lender and shall include loss payable clauses in favor of, and in a form acceptable to, lender. In the event of loss, Borrower shall give Lender immediate notice by mail. Lender mar make proof of loss if not made promptly by Borrower. Each insurance company concerned is hcrcby authorized and directed to make payment for such loss directly to Lender, instead of to Borrower and to Lender jointly. All or any part of the insurance proceeds may be applied by Lender, at its option, either (a) to the reduction of the indebtedness under the Note and this Security Instrument. first to any delinquent amounts applied in the order in paragraph 3, and then to FHA Alabama Mortgage with MERS - 4 / 96 Amended 2 / 01 Page 2 of 6 IDS, Inc Borrower (s) Initials. IN. YN Case 17 - 00487 - DSC13 Doc 61 - 2 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 04: 32 Desc Exhibit Loan documents Page 2 of 14 prepayment of principal, or (b) to the restoration or repair of the damaged Property. Any application of the proceeds to the principal shall not extend or postpone the due date of the monthly payments which are referred to in paragraph 2, or change the amount of such payments. Any excess insurance proceeds over an amount required to pay all outstanding indebtedness under the Note and this Security Instrument shall be paid to the entity legally entitled thereto. In the event of foreclosure of this Security Instrument or other transfer of title to the Property that extinguishes the indebtedness, all right, title and interest of Borrower in and to insurance policies in force shall pass to the purchaser. 5. Occupancy, Preservation, Maintenance and Protection of the Property; Borrower's Loan Application; Leaseholds. Borrower shall occupy, establish, and use the Property as Borrower's principal residence within sixty days after the execution of this Security Instrument (or within sixty days of a later sale or transfer of the Property) and shall continue to occupy the Property as Borrower's principal residence for at least one year after the date of occupancy, unless Lender determines that requirement will cause undue hardship for Borrower, or unless extenuating circumstances exist which are beyond Borrower's control. Borrower shall notify Lender of any extenuating circumstances. Borrower shall not commit waste or destroy, damage or substantially change the Property or allow the Property to deteriorate, reasonable wear and tear excepted. Lender may inspect the Property if the Property is vacant or abandoned or the loan is in default. Lender may take reasonable action to protect and preserve such vacant or abandoned Property. Borrower shall also be in default if Borrower, during the loan application process, gave materially false or inaccurate information or statements to Lender (or failed to provide Lender with any material information) in connection with the loan evidenced by the Note, including, but not limited to, representations concerning Borrower's occupancy of the Property as a principal residence. If this Security Instrument is on a leasehold, Borrower shall comply with the provisions of the lease. If Borrower acquires fee title to the Property, the leasehold and fee title shall not be merged unless Lender agrees to the merger in writing. 6. Condemnation. The proceeds of any award or claim for damages, direct or consequential, in connection with any condemnation or other taking of any part of the Property, or for conveyance in place of condemnation, are hereby assigned and shall be paid to Lender to the extent of the full amount of the indebtedness that remains unpaid under the Note and this Security Instrument. Lender shall apply such proceeds to the reduction of the indebtedness under the Note and this Security Instrument, first to any delinquent amounts applied in the order provided in paragraph 3, and then to prepayment of principal. Any application of the proceeds to the principal shall not extend or postpone the due date of the monthly payments, which are referred to in paragraph 2, or change the amount of such payments. Any excess proceeds over an amount required to pay all outstanding indebtedness under the Note and this Security Instrument shall be paid to the entity legally entitled thereto. 7. Charges to Borrower and Protection of Lender's Rights in the Property. Borrower shall pay all govemmental or municipal charges, fines and impositions that are not included in paragraph 2. Borrower shall pay these obligations on time directly to the entity which is owed the payment. If failure to pay would adversely affect Lender's interest in the Property, upon Lender's request Borrower shall promptly furnish to Lender receipts evidencing these payments. If Borrower fails to make these payments or the payments required by paragraph 2, or fails to perform any other covenants and agreements contained in this Security Instrument, or there is a legal proceeding that may significantly affect Lender's rights in the Property (such as a proceeding in bankruptcy, for condemnation or to enforce laws or regulations), then Lender may do and pay whatever is necessary to protect the value of the Property and Lender's rights in the Property, including payment of taxes, hazard insurance and other items mentioned in paragraph 2. * Any amounts disbursed by Lender under this paragraph shall become an additional debt of Borrower and be secured by this Security Instrument. These amounts shall bear interest from the date of disbursement, at the Note rate, and at the option of Lender, shall be immediately due and payable. Borrower shall promptly discharge any lien which has priority over this Security Instrument unless Borrower: (a) agrees in writing to the payment of the obligation secured by the lien in a manner acceptable to Lender, (b) contests in good faith the lien by, or defends against enforcernent of the lien in, legal proceedings which in the Lender's opinion operate to prevent the enforcement of the lien, or (c) secures from the holder of the lien an agreement satisfactory to Lender subordinating the lien to this Security Instrument. If Lender determines that any part of the Property is subject to a lien which may attain priority over this Security Instrument, Lender may give Borrower a notice identifying the lien. BorTower shall satisfy the lien or take one or more of the actions set forth above within 10 days of the giving of notice. 8. Fees. Lender may collect fees and charges authorized by the Secretary. 9. Grounds for Acceleration of Debt. (a) Default. Lender may, except as limited by regulations issued by the Secretary, in the case of payment defaults, require immediate payment in full of all sums secured by this Security Instrument if: (i) Borrower defaults by failing to pay in full any monthly payment required by this Security Instrument prior to or on the due date of the next monthly payment, or (ii) Borrower defaults by failing, for a period of thirty days, to perform any other obligations contained in this Security Instrument. FHA Alabama Mortgage with MERS – 4 / 96 Amended 2 / 01 Page 3 of 6 L IDS, Inc. Borrower (s) Initially Case 17 - 00487 - DSC13 Doc 61 - 2 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 04: 32 Desc Exhibit Loan documents Page 3 of 14 * (b) Sale Without Credit Approval. Lender shall, if permitted by applicable law (including Section 341 (d) of the Garn - St. Germain Depository Institutions Act of 1982, 12U.S. C. 170lj - 3 (d)) and with the prior approval of the Secretary, require immediate payment in full of all sums secured by this Security Instrument if: (1) All or part of the Property, or a beneficial interest in a trust owning all or part of the Property, is sold or otherwise transferred (other than by devise or descent), and (ii) The Property is not occupied by the purchaser or grantee as his or her principal residence, or the purchaser or grantee does so occupy the Property but his or her credit has not been approved in accordance with the requirements of the Secretary. (c) No Waiver. If circumstances occur that would permit Lender to require immediate payment in full, but Lender does not require such payments, Lender does not waive its rights with respect to subsequent events. (d) Regulations of HUD Secretary. In many circumstances regulations issued by the Secretary will limit Lender's rights, in the case of payment defaults, to require immediate payment in full and foreclose if not paid. This Security Instrument does not authorize acceleration or foreclosure if not permitted by regulations of the Secretary. (e) Mortgage Not Insured. Borrower agrees that if this Security Instrument and the Note are not determined to be eligible for insurance under the National Housing Act within 60 days from the date hereof, Lender may, at its option, require immediate payment in full of all sums secured by this Security Instrument. A written statement of any authorized agent of the Secretary dated subsequent to 60 days from the date hereof, declining to insure this Security Instrument and the Note, shall be deemed conclusive proof of such ineligibility. Notwithstanding the foregoing, this option may not be exercised by Lender when the unavailability of insurance is solely due to Lender's failure to remit a mortgage insurance premium to the Secretary. 10. Reinstatement. Borrower has a right to be reinstated if Lender has required immediate payment in full because of Borrower's failure to pay an amount due under the Note or this Security Instrument. This right applies even after foreclosure proceedings are instituted. To reinstate the Security Instrument, Borrower shall tender in a lump sum all amounts required to bring Borrower's account current including, to the extent they are obligations of Borrower under this Security Instrument, foreclosure costs and reasonable and customary attomeys ' fees and expenses properly associated with the foreclosure proceeding. Upon reinstatement by Borrower, this Security Instrument and the obligations that it secures shall remain in effect as if Lender had not required immediate payment in full. However, Lender is not required to permit reinstatement if: (1) Lender has accepted reinstatement after the commencement of foreclosure proceedings within two years immediately preceding the commencement of a current foreclosure proceeding, (ii) reinstatement will preclude foreclosure on different grounds in the future, or (iii) reinstatement will adversely affect the priority of the lien created by this Security Instrument. 11. Borrower Not Released; Forbearance By Lender Not a Waiver. Extension of the time of payment or modification of amortization of the sums secured by this Security Instrument granted by Lender to any successor in interest of Borrower shall not operate to release the liability of the original BorTower or Borrower's successor in interest. Lender shall not be required to commence proceedings against any successor in interest or refuse to extend time for payment or otherwise modify amortization of the sums secured by this Security Instrument by reason of any demand made by the original Borrower or BorTower's successors in interest. Any forbearance by Lender in exercising any right OI remedy shall not be a waiver of or preclude the exercise of any right or remedy. 12. Successors and Assigns Bound; Joint and Several Liability; Co - Signers. The covenants and agreements of this Security Instrument shall bind and benefit the successors and assigns of Lender and Borrower, subject to the provisions of paragraph 9 (b) . Borrower's covenants and agreements shall be joint and several. Any Borrower who co - signs this Security Instrument but does not execute the Note: (a) is co - signing this Security Instrument only to mortgage, grant and convey that Borrower's interest in the Property under the terms of this Security Instrument; (b) is not personally obligated to pay the sums secured by this Security Instrument, and (c) agrees that Lender and any other Borrower may agree to extend, modify, forbear or make any accommodations with regard to the terms of this Security Instrument or the Note without that Borrower's consent. 13. Notices. Any notice to Borrower provided for in this Security Instrument shall be given by delivering it or by mailing it by first class mail unless applicable law requires use of another method. The notice shall be directed to the Property Address or any other address Borrower designates by notice to Lender. Any notice to Lender shall be given by first class mail to Lender's address stated herein or any address Lender designates by notice to BoTower. Any notice provided for in this Security Instrument shall be deemed to have been given to Borrower or Lender when given as provided in this paragraph. 14. Governing Law; Severability. This Security Instrument shall be govermed by Federal law and the law of the jurisdiction in which the Property is located. In the event that any provision or clause of this Security Instrument or the Note conflicts with applicable law, such conflict shall not affect other provisions of this Security Instrument or the Note which can be given effect without the conflicting provision. To this end the provisions of this Security Instrument and the Note are declared to be severable. 15. Borrower's Copy. Borrower shall be given one conformed copy of the Note and of this Security Instrument. FRA Alabama Mortgage with MERS - 4 / 96 Page 4 of 6 Amended 2 / 01 Borrower (s) Initials DN _ H IDS, Inc. Borro Case 17 - 00487 - DSC13 Doc 61 - 2 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 04: 32 Desc Exhibit Loan documents Page 4 of 14 – - 16. Hazardous Substances. Borrower shall not cause or permit the presence, use, disposal, storage, or release of any Hazardous Substances on or in the Property. Borrower shall not do, nor allow anyone else to do, anything affecting the Property that is in violation of any Environmental Law. The preceding two sentences shall not apply to the presence, use, or storage on the Property of small quantities of Hazardous Substances that are generally recognized to be appropriate to normal residential uses and to maintenance of the Property. BoTower shall promptly give Lender written notice of any investigation, claim, demand, lawsuit or other action by any governmental or regulatory agency or private party involving the Property and any Hazardous Substance or Environmental Law of which Borrower has actual knowledge. If Borrower learns, or is notified by any governmental or regulatory authority, that any removal or other remediation of any Hazardous Substances affecting the Property is necessary, Borrower shall promptly take all necessary remedial actions in accordance with Environmental Law. As used in this paragraph 16, " Hazardous Substances " are those substances defined as toxic or hazardous substances by Environmental Law and the following substances: gasoline, kerosene, other flammable or toxic petroleum products, toxic pesticides and lierbicides, volatile solvents, materials containing asbestos or formaldehyde, and radioactive materials. As used in this paragraph 16, " Environmental Law " means federal laws and laws of the jurisdiction where the Property is located that relate to health, safety or environmental protection. ed by thever: (a) all rents recei assignment for additionustee for the benefit or agr NON - UNIFORM COVENANTS. Borrower and Lender further covenant and agree as follows: 17. Assignment of Rents. Borrower unconditionally assigns and transfers to Lender all the rents and revenues of the Property. Borrower authorizes Lender or Lender's agents to collect the rents and revenues and hereby directs each tenant of the Property to pay the rents to Lender or Lender's agents. However, prior to Lender's notice to Borrower of Borrower's breach of any covenant or agreement in the Security Instrument, Borrower shall collect and receive all rents and revenues of the Property as trustee for the benefit of Lender and Borrower. This assignment of rents constitutes an absolute assignment and not an assignment for additional security only. If Lender gives notice of breach to BorTower: (a) all rents received by Bonower shall be held by Borrower as trustee for benefit of Lender only, to be applied to the sums secured by the Security Instrument; (b) Lender shall be entitled to collect and receive all of the rents of the Property; and (c) each tenant of the Property shall pay all rents due and unpaid to Lender or Lender's agent on Lender's written demand to the tenant. Borrower has not executed any prior assignment of the rents and has not and will not perform any act that would prevent Lender from exercising its rights under this paragraph 17. Lender shall not be required to enter upon, take control of or maintain the Property before or after giving notice of breach to Borrower. However, Lender or a judicially appointed receiver may do so at any time there is a breach. Any application of rents shall not cure or waive any default or invalidate any other right or remedy of Lender. This assignment of rents of the Property shall terminate when the debt secured by the Security Instrument is paid in full. 18. Foreclosure Procedure. If Lender requires immediate payment in full under paragraph 9, Lender may invoke the power of sale and any other remedies permitted by applicable law. Lender shall be entitled to collect all expenses incurred in pursuing the remedies provided in this paragraph 18, including, but not limited to, reasonable attormeys ' fees and costs of title evidence. If Lender invokes the power of sale, Lender shall give a copy of a notice to Borrower in the manner provided in paragraph 13. Lender shall publish the notice of sale once a week for three consecutive weeks in a newspaper published in Jefferson County, Alabama, and thereupon shall sell the Property to the highest bidder at public auction at the front door of the County Courthouse of this County. Lender shall deliver to the purchaser Lender's deed conveying the Property. Lender or its designee may purchase the Property at any sale. Borrower covenants and agrees that the proceeds of the sale shall be applied in the following order: (a) to al expenses of the sale, including, but not limited to, reasonable attorneys ' fees; (b) to all sums secured by this Security Instrument; and (c) any excess to the person or persons legally entitled to it. If the Lender's interest in this Security Instrument is held by the Secretary and the Secretary requires immediate payment in full under Paragraph 9, the Secretary may invoke the nonjudicial power of sale provided in the Single Family Mortgage Foreclosure Act of 1994 ("Act") (12U.S. C. 3751 et seq .) by requesting a foreclosure commissioner designated under the Act to commence foreclosure and to sell the Property as provided in the Act. Nothing in the preceding sentence shall deprive the Secretary of any rights otherwise available to a Lender under this Paragraph 18 or applicable law. 19. Release. Upon payment of all sums secured by this Security Instrument, Lender shall release this Security Instrument without charge to Borrower. Borrower shall pay any recordation costs. 20. Waivers. Borrower waives all rights of homestead exemption in the Property and relinquishes all rights of curtesy and dower in the Property. FHA Alabama Mortgage with MERS - 4 / 96 Amended 2101 Page 5 of 6 IDS, Inc. Borrower (s) Initials SH AN Borr Case 17 - 00487 - DSC13 Doc 61 - 2 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 04: 32 Desc Exhibit Loan documents Page 5 of 14 21. Riders to this Security Instrument. If one or more riders are executed by Borrower and recorded together with this Security Instrument, the covenants of each such rider shall be incorporated into and shall amend and supplement the covenants and agreements of this Security Instrument as if the rider (s) were a part of this Security Instrument. [ Check applicable box (es) . ] Condominium Rider U Graduated Payment Rider y Adjustable Rate Rider lx Planned Unit Development Rider D Growing Equity Rider u Other: BY SIGNING BELOW, Borrower accepts and agrees to the terms contained in this Security Instrument and in any rider (s) executed by Borrower and recorded with it. Witnesses: - Witness - Witness Mikun Burel (kbay (Seal) - Borrower (Seal) - Borrower Patrick S. Holley Allison Powell STATE OF ALABAMA, Jefferson County ss: On this 16th day of June 2014 „ I, Stephanie L. Dabbs, a Notary Public in and for said county and in said state, hereby certify that Patrick S. Holley and Allison Powell, whose name (s) is / are signed to the foregoing conveyance, and who is / are known to me, acknowledged before me that, being informed of the contents of the conveyance, he / she / they executed the same voluntarily and as his / her / their act on the day the same bears date. Given under my hand and seal of office this 16th day of _ June 2014 My Commission Expires: - Notary Public 11INU, HANIE L. DABO. Loan originator (organization): First Federal Bank, NMLS # 1 Loan originator (individual): Stacy Raven Higgins; NMLS #: 111111, OTARY ' ' STEP 111111111,: . » • My Comm. Expires: • March 25, 2015. " . . . STATE O. 1111111, FOF ALABA 11111111 ABAMA FHA Alabama Mortgage with MERS – 4 / 96 Amended 2 / 01 Page 6 of 6 IDS, Inc. Case 17 - 00487 - DSC13 Doc 61 - 2. Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 04: 32 Desc Exhibit Loan documents Page 6 of 14 FHA PLANNED UNIT DEVELOPMENT RIDER THIS PLANNED UNIT DEVELOPMENT RIDER is made this 16th day of June, 2014, and is incorporated into and shall be deemed to amend and supplement the Mortgage, Deed of Trust or Security Deed ("Security Instrument") of the same date given by the undersigned ("Borrower") to secure Borrower's Note ("Note") to First Federal Bank ("Lender") of the same date and covering tlhe property described in the Security Instrument and located at: . . . - - - - - - - - - - 5435 Quail Ridge Road Gardendale, ALABAMA 35071 (Property Address) . The Property is a part of a planned unit developinent ("PUD) known as: Quail Ridge (Naine of Planned Unit Development Project) PUD COVENANTS. In addition to the covenants and agreements made in the Security Instrument, Borrower and Lender further covenant and agree as follows: A. So long as the Owners Association (or equivalent entity holding title to common areas and facilities), acting as trustee for the homeowners, maintains, with a generally accepted insurance carrier, a " master " or " blanket " policy insuring the property located in the PUD, including all improvements now existing or hereafter erected on the mortgaged preinises, and suclı policy is satisfactory to Lender and provides insurance coverage in the amounts, for the periods, and against the hazards Lender requires, including fire and other hazards included within the term " extended coverage, " and loss by flood, to the extent required by the Secretary, then: (i) Lender waives the provision in Paragraph 2 of this Security Instrument for the monthly payment to Lender of one - twelfth of the yearly premium installments for FHA - - MULTISTATE PUD Rider 7191 Page 1 of 2 IDS, Inc. Borower () Initial - FA AHL Borrower (s) Initials Case 17 - 00487 - DSC13 Doc 61 - 2. Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 04: 32 Desc Exhibit Loan documents Page 7 of 14 Exhibit Loan goed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 hazard insurance on the Property, and (ii) Borrower's obligation under Paragraph 4 of this Security Instrument to maintain hazard insurance coverage on the Property is deemed satisfied to the extent that the required coverage is provided by the Owners Association policy. Borrower shall give Lender prompt notice of any lapse in required hazard insurance coverage and of any loss occurring from a hazard. In the event of a distribution of hazard insurance proceeds in lieu of restoration or repair following a loss to the Property or to common areas and facilities of the PUD, any proceeds payable to Borrower are hereby assigned and shall be paid to Lender for application to the sums secured by this Security Instrument, with any excess paid to the entity legally entitled thereto. B. Borrower promises to pay all dues and assessments imposed pursuant to the legal instruments creating and governing the PUD. C. If Borrower does not pay PUD dues and assessments when due, then Lender may pay them. Any amounts disbursed by Lender under this paragraph C shall become additional debt of Borrower secured by the Security Instrument. Unless Borrower and Lender agree to other terins of payment, these amounts slıall bear interest from the date of disbursement at the Note rate and shall be payable, with interest, upon notice froin Lender to Borrower requesting payment. BY SIGNING BELOW, Borrower accepts and agrees to the terms and provisions contained in this PUD Rider. PILISES 2 C XMV Allen Buru folkes seal (Seal) - Borrower (Seal) - Borrower Patrick S. Holley Allison Powell FHA – MULTISTATE PUD Rider 7 / 91 Page 2 of 2 IDS, Inc. Case 17 - 00487 - DSC13 Doc 61 - 2. Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 04: 32 Desc Exhibit Loan documents Page 8 of 14 EXHIBIT " A " Lot 209, according to the Survey of Castle Pines, Sector II, as recorded in Map Book 218, page 19, in the Probate office of Jefferson County, Alabama. Subject to easements and restrictions of record and subject to current taxes, a lien but not yet payable. The proceeds of this loan have been applied to the purchase price of the property described herein, conveyed to the mortgagors simultaneously herewith. Allison Powell is one in the same as Allison Powell Holley and Allison Miller Holley. 2014062000USS 1710 919 Bk: LR201414 Pg: 8627 Jefferson County, Alabama 06 / 20 ! 2014 11: 54: 29 AM MTG Fee - $ 40. 00 Mortgage Tax - - $ 4 12. 50 Total of Fees and Taxe5 - $ 452 50 LYNN Case 17 - 00487 - DSC13 Doc 61 - 2 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 04: 32 Desc Exhibit Loan documents Page 9 of 14 ORIGINAL NOTE Multistate NOTE June 16, 2014 (Date) 5435 Quail Ridge Road Gardendale, ALABAMA 35071 (Property Address) 1. PARTIES " Borrower " means each person signing at the end of this Note, and the person's successors and assigns. " Lender " means First Federal Bank and its successors and assigns. 2. BORROWER'S PROMISE TO PAY; INTEREST In return for a loan received from Lender, Borrower promises to pay the principal sum of TWO HUNDRED SEVENTY FOUR THOUSAND NINE HUNDRED TWENTY - EIGHT AND NO / 100 Dollars (U. S. $ 274, 928. 00), plus interest, to the order of Lender. Interest will be charged on unpaid principal, from the date of disbursement of the loan proceeds by Lender, at the rate of FOUR percent (4. 000 %) per year until the full amount of principal has been paid. 3. PROMISE TO PAY SECURED Borrower's promise to pay is secured by a mortgage, deed of trust or similar security instrument that is dated the same date as this Note and called the " Security Instrument. " The Security Instrument protects the Lender from losses which might result if Borrower defaults under this Note. 4. MANNER OF PAYMENT (A) Time Borrower shall make a payment of principal and interest to Lender on the 1st day of each month beginning on August 1, 2014. Any principal and interest remaining on the 1st day of July, 2044, will be due on that date, which is called the " Maturity Date. " (B) Place Payment shall be made at First Federal Bank 1300 McFarland Blvd NE Tuscaloosa, ALABAMA 35406 or at such place as Lender may designate in writing by notice to Borrower. (C) Amount Each monthly payment of principal and interest will be in the amount ofU.S. $ 1, 312. 55. This amount will be part of a larger monthly payment required by the Security Instrument, that shall be applied to principal, interest and other items in the order described in the Security Instrument. (D) Allonge to this Note for payment adjustments If an allonge providing for payment adjustments is executed by Borrower together with this Note, the covenants of the allonge shall be incorporated into and shall amend and supplement the covenants of this Note as if the allonge were a part of this Note. (Check applicable box .) O Graduated Payment Allonge O Growing Equity Allonge U Other (specify) FHA Multistate Fixed Rate Note - (10 / 95) VMP - 1R (0210) . 02 IDS, Inc. Page 1 of 3 Borrower (s) Initials Case 17 - 00487 - DSC13 Doc 61 - 2 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 04: 32 Desc Exhibit Loan documents Page 10 of 14 5. BORROWER'S RIGHT TO PREPAY Borrower has the right to pay the debt evidenced by this Note, in whole or in part, without charge or penalty, on the first day of any month. Lender shall accept prepayment on other days provided that Borrower pays interest on the amount prepaid for the remainder of the month to the extent required by Lender and permitted by regulations of the Secretary. If Borrower makes a partial prepayment, there will be no changes in the due date or in the amount of the monthly payment unless Lender agrees in writing to those changes, 6. BORROWER'S FAILURE TO PAY (A) Late Charge for Overdue Payments If Lender has not received the full monthly payment required by the Security Instrument, as described in Paragraph 4 (C) of this Note, by the end of FIFTEEN calendar days after the payment is due, Lender may collect a late charge in the amount of FOUR percent (4. 000 %) of the overdue amount of each payment. (B) Default If Borrower defaults by failing to pay in full any monthly payment, then Lender may, except as limited by regulations of the Secretary in the case of payment defaults, require immediate payment in full of the principal balance remaining due and all accrued interest. Lender may choose not to exercise this option without waiving its rights in the event of any subsequent default. In many circumstances regulations issued by the Secretary will limit Lender's rights to require immediate payment in full in the case of payment defaults. This Note does not authorize acceleration when not permitted by HUD regulations. As used in this Note, " Secretary " means the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development or his or her designee. (C) Payment of Costs and Expenses If Lender has required immediate payment in full, as described above, Lender may require Borrower to pay costs and expenses including reasonable and customary attorneys ' fees for enforcing this Note to the extent not prohibited by applicable law. Such fees and costs shall bear interest from the date of disbursement at the same rate as the principal of this Note. 7. WAIVERS Borrower and any other person who has obligations under this Note waive the rights of presentment and notice of dishonor. " Presentment " means the right to require Lender to demand payment of amounts due. " Notice of dishonor " means the right to require Lender to give notice to other persons that amounts due have not been paid. 8. GIVING OF NOTICES Unless applicable law requires a different method, any notice that must be given to Borrower under this Note will be given by delivering it or by mailing it by first class mail to Borrower at the property address above or at a different address if Borrower has given Lender a notice of Borrower's different address. Any notice that must be given to Lender under this Note will be given by first class mail to Lender at the address stated in Paragraph 4 (B) or at a different address if Borrower is given a notice of that different address. 9. OBLIGATIONS OF PERSONS UNDER THIS NOTE If more than one person signs this Note, each person is fully and personally obligated to keep all of the promises made in this Note, including the promise to pay the full amount owed. Any person who is a guarantor, surety or endorser of this Note is also obligated to do these things. Any person who takes over these obligations, including the obligations of a guarantor, surety or endorser of this Note, is also obligated to keep all of the promises made in this Note. Lender may enforce its rights under this Note against each person individually or against all signatories together. Any one person signing this Note may be required to pay all of the amounts owed under this Note. FHA Multistate Fixed Rate Note - (10 / 95) VMP - 1R (0210) . 02 IDS, Inc. Page 2 of 3 Borrower (s) Initials www Case 17 - 00487 - DSC13 Doc 61 - 2 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 04: 32 Desc Exhibit Loan documents Page 11 of 14 BY SIGNING BELOW, Borrower accepts and agrees to the terms and covenants contained in this Note. AVTION - IT IS IMPORTANT THAT YOU THOROUGHLY READ THE CONTRACT BEFORE YOU SIGN IT. PuX JINA (Seat) - Borrower (Seal) - Borrower Patrick S. Holley Loan originator (organization): First Federal Bank; NMLS Loan originator (individual): Stacy Raven Higgins, NMLS PAY TO THE ORDER OF:U.S. Bank National Association WITHOUT RECOURSE EIRST FEDERAL BANK ROYWYdü BY: BRANDI HALL ASSISTANT VICE PRESIDENT. . . atiristoria Pay to the order of Without RecourseU.S. Bank National Association Yalu Jam Paula T, Hughes Vice President FHA Multistate Fixed Rate Note - (10 / 95) VMP - 1R (0210) . 02 IDS, Inc. Page 3 of 3 Case 17 - 00487 - DSC13 Doc 61 - 2 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 04: 32 Desc Exhibit Loan documents Page 12 of 14 AKA STATEMENT BOTTOwer Patrick S. Holley This is to certify that the undersigned " BORROWER ", whose name appears on documents related to the purchase and / or financing of the referenced property located at 5435 Quail Ridge Road, Gardendale, AL 35071, is one and the same personas: Patrick S. Holley P. Shane Holley Patrick Shane Holley _ June 16, 2014 Date Patrick S. Holley STATE OF ALABAMA, Jefferson County ss: On this 16th - day of June 1014 _, I, Stephanie. L. Dabbs -, a Notary Public in and for said county and in said state, hereby certify that Patrick S. Holley, whose names (s) is / are signed to the foregoing instrument, and who is / are known to me, acknowledged before me that, being informed of the contexts of the instrument, he / she / they executed the same voluntarily and as his / her / their act on the day the same bears date. Given under my hand and seal of officer this _ 16th day of June 2014 My Commission Expires: - 111111), UANIEL, X, KARY ': 0. Motary Public SS NOTA: S: My Comm. Expres: • • March 25, 2015: 111111 ' ALABAMA * 1111111 Page 1 of 1 AKA Statement IDS, inc. Case 17 - 00487 - DSC13 Doc 61 - 2 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 04: 32 Desc Exhibit Loan documents Page 13 of 14 County Division Code: ALO40 inst. # 2016094251 Pages: 1 of 1 I certify this instrument tiled on 9 / 122016 12: 26 PM Dac: AM Alan L. King, Judge of Probate Jefferson County, AL. Rec: $ 16. 00 Clerk: NICOLE RECORDING REQUESTED AND PREPARED BY:U.S. Bank Home Mortgage 809 S. 60th Street, Suite 210 West Allis, WI 53214 (866) 787 - 9167 MARY J IRWIN And Wben Recorded Mail To:U.S. Bank Iloine Mortgage 809 S. 60th Street, Suite 210 West Allis, WI 53214 ATTN: MARY J IRWIN SIS Sancakaun for Pacodare una ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE For good and valuable consideration, the sufficiency of which is hereby acknowledged, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. AS NOMINEE FOR FIRST FEDERAL BANK, ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS, CIO P. O BOX 2026, FLINT, MI 48501 2026, by these presents does convey, assign, transfer and set over to:U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, 4801 FREDERICA STREET, OWENSBORO, KY 42301 0000, the described Mortgage, together with the certain note (s) described therein with all interest, all liens, and any rights due or to become due thereni. Said Mortgage for $ 274, 928. 00 recorded in the State of ALABAMA, County of JEFFERSON (BIRMINGHAM DIV .) Oficial Records, dated JUNE 16, 2014 and recorded on JUNE 20, 2014, as Instrument No. 20140620000551710, ia Book No. LR 201414, at Page No. 8627. Original Mortgagor: PATRICKS. HOLLEY AND ALLISON POWELL, HUSBAND AND WIFE, AS JOINT TENANTS WITH FULL RIGHTS OF SURVIVORSHIP. Original Mortgagee: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. AS NOMINEE FOR FIRST FEDERAL BANK, ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS, Date: AVGUST 19, 2016 MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. AS NOMINEE FOR FIRST FEDERAL BANK, ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS By: Mm 0 TON Janice J Dela Cruz, Assistant Secretary WITNESS: Staplaususdumaell Stephanie Stelmack Musiek Mary Dukes Aiarick State of County of WISCONSIN MILWAUKEE } ss, This instrument was acknowledged before me onAUGUST 19, 2016, by Janice D Dela Cruz as Assistant Secretary of MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. AS NOMINEE FOR FIRST FEDERAL BANK, ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS NOTAB (Notary Name): Janice Abner JANICE ABNER (Title or Rank): Notary Public | STATE OF " IMMA WiscONS My commission expires: 12 / 10 / 2017 13: 13. . i ' ta, at: 111477IIII ' yi sic, REGISTR. ORAIE NO813313 Httumanitatistili · 111 * ' '; CORPON, 1999 Sigtuttitur. Di sia) XIIVI 1100 SEAL * * * * * Stirttitli HIIHEISIELLE PELAYAfie " Holiitibi: Jtnil Misir. intitel: Case 17 - 00487 - DSC13 Doc 61 - 2 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 04: 32 Desa Exhibit Loan documents Page 14 of 14

Exhibit Payment history

Creditor: Debtor: Case No .: Loan No .: Our File No .:U.S. Bank National Association Patrick Shane Holley 17 - 00487 PAYMENTS RECEIVED Loan Status as of: 12 / 13 / 2017 Initial Due Date: 3 / 1 / 2017 Collateral: 5435 Quail Ridge Road Gardendale, AL 35071 Date Amount Late Charges / NSF / Other Paid Over / Short Received Received Due Date Amount Due Description PCN Status Original Post - $ 1, 909. 43, Claimed on POC $ 3 / 1 / 2017 ] $ 1, 909. 43 | $ | 3 / 16 / 2017 $ 2, 000. 00 $ 4 / 1 / 2017 $ 1, 909. 43 | $ 4 / 19 / 2017 $ 2, 000, 00 | n | n | n | n | n 5 / 1 / 2017 $ 1, 909. 43 $ 5 / 16 / 2017 $ 2, 000. 00 6 / 1 / 2017 | $ 1, 909. 43 $ 6 / 16 / 2017 $ 1, 990, 00 ՄI { V ] { V ] (III { V ] ՄԱԴII { V ] ] ԱIO $ (1, 909. 43) | Payment Accrued 2, 000. 00 | Funds Received (1, 909. 43) | Payment Accrued 2, 000. 00 | Funds Received (1, 909. 43) | Payment Accrued 2, 000. 00 JFunds Received (1, 909. 43) | Payment Accrued 1, 990. 00 | Funds Received Payment Accrued Payment Accrued Payment Accrued (1, 909. 43) | Payment Accrued (352. 28) A / O Adj (1, 909. 43) | Payment Accrued (1, 909. 43) Payment Accrued | DIV 7 / 1 / 2017 | $ 8 / 1 / 2017 $ 9 / 1 / 2017 | $ 10 / 1 / 2017 | $ 1, 909. 43 | $ A / O Payment A / 0 Payment A / O Payment A - IUM | 10 / 11 / 2017 UIUI S (352. 28) | $ 11 / 1 / 2017 $ 12 / 1 / 2017 | $ 1, 909. 43 $ 1, 909. 43 $ Դ | Post due for 10 / 01 / 17 w / $ 0. 00 in susp Total: $ 7, 990. 00 $ 13, 366. 01 $ (352. 28) $ (5, 728. 29) Delinquent Payments Days Delinquent: 73 Month Due P & I Due Escrow Due Stip Due 10 / 1 / 2017 | $ 1, 312. 55 | $ 596. 88 $ 11 / 1 / 2017 $ 1, 312. 55 $ 596. 88 $ 12 / 1 / 2017 | $ 1, 312. 55 $ 596. 88 ] ]: Դ ՄIIԱԴ | Total Due $ 1, 909. 43 $ 1, 909. 43 1, 909. 43 ՄIԱԴIԱԴ $ 5, 728. 29 Delinquency / overage | Less Suspense Total Delinquency / overage IԱԴ | ՄԴ | 5, 728. 29 Case 17 - 00487 - DSC13 Doc 61 - 3 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 04: 32 Desc Exhibit Payment history Page 1 of 2 Creditor:U.S. Bank National Association PAYMENTS RECEIVED Loan Status as of: Initial Due Date: 12 / 13 / 2017 3 / 1 / 2017 Debtor: Case No .: Loan No .: Our File No .: Patrick Shane Holley 17 - 00487 xxxxxx0167 3211 - N - 2216 5435 Quail Ridge Road | Gardendale, AL 35071 Collateral: Trustee Payments Atmount Received Received 11 / 16 / 17 $ 403. 19 Date Total Paid $ 403. 19 Case 17 - 00487 - DSC13 Doc 61 - 3 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 04: 32 Desc Exhibit Payment history Page 2 of 2

Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor U.S. Bank National Association (RE: related document(s) {{61}} Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay, on 5435 Quail Ridge Road, Gardendale, AL 35071).

Fonn Number LR 4001-1 A (07 LO) IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA BIRMINGHAM DIVISION In re: } Case No. 17-00487-DSC Patrick Shane Holley, } Chapter 13 } Debtor. FACT SUMMARY SHEET FOR RENEWED MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM AUTOMATIC STAYOR FOR ADEOUATE PROTECTION IN CHAPTER 7 AND 13 CASES Type of Loan/Credit Transaction: _M_o 1_ t�g�a-ge ______ Date of Loan/Credit Transaction: 6/16/2014 Type of Collateral: _R_ea_l _ P_ r_ o p�e_rt�y�--- Monthly Payment: $1,909.43 Amount Financed: $274,928.00 APR or Interest Rate: 4.000% Term ofLoan: Payoff Amount: $281,322.63 as of December 13, 2017 (Date) Value of Collateral and Basis: $287,800.00 (Value) as of 2/7/2017 (Date) Debtor's Schedule A (Basis) Address of Real Property: 5435 Quail Ridae Road, Gardendale, Alabama 35071 Delinquent Pre-Petition Payments: What Month(s)? August, 2016 to February, 2017 Amount: $9,187.85 P&I (total pmt amount is $1.909.43) Claim Filed? X Yes No Date Claim Filed: 17-00487 2-1 Claim Number ------- Number of Months of Pre-Petition Payment Default Put into Debtor's Chapter 13 Plan: ---'--'------------ Seven (7) Delinquent Post-Petition Payments: What Month(s)? October, 2017 to December. 2017 Amount of Mortgage Payments $5,728.29 Late Charges? $0.00 Court Costs I Attorney Fees? $0.00 Total Amount Due $5,728.29 Claim Filed? Yes x No Date Claim filed: -N/---- A Claim Number NIA Number ofPost-Petition Payments Received (Not How Applied): Four (4) Number of Post-Petition Payments Held by Creditor but Not Applied to Debt: Zero(OJ Number of Post-Petition Payments Returned by Creditor to Debtor: Zero (0) If Lease, Lease Expiration Date: _N_/A ___________ TfTem1inated, Lease Termination Date: ------------� NIA Insurer of Collateral: ------------� NIA Term ofinsurance: _N_IA ___________ (Expiration Date) Prior Stay Order(s) Tnvolving Movant, Including Cunent Case: x Yes No If yes, give case number(s) and date(s) of order(s): Case No.: 17-00487 Date: 10/11/2017 Case No.: ------- Date: Case No.: Date: Debtor's Statement oflntention: NIA Date: 2/13/2018 Submitted by: /sl!ovfichael McCormick (Signature) Case 17-00487-DSC13 Doc 62 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 11:05:47 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Convert Case Trustee Bradford W. Caraway removed from the case. Trustee Thomas E Reynolds added to the case. Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts Due 5/11/2018. 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/12/2018 at 02:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 5/11/2018.

Information to identify the case: Debtor 1 Patrick Shane Holley Social Security number or ITIN xxx−xx−4403 First Name Middle Name Last Name EIN _ _−_ _ _ _ _ _ _ Debtor 2 Social Security number or ITIN _ _ _ _ First Name Middle Name Last Name (Spouse, if filing) EIN _ _−_ _ _ _ _ _ _ UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF Date case filed in chapter 13 2/7/17 ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION Date case converted to chapter 7 2/13/18 Case number: 17−00487−DSC7 Official Form 309A (For Individuals or Joint Debtors) Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case −− No Proof of Claim Deadline 12/15 For the debtors listed above, a case has been filed under chapter 7 of the Bankruptcy Code. An order for relief has been entered. This notice has important information about the case for creditors, debtors, and trustees, including information about the meeting of creditors and deadlines. Read both pages carefully. The filing of the case imposed an automatic stay against most collection activities. This means that creditors generally may not take action to collect debts from the debtors or the debtors' property. For example, while the stay is in effect, creditors cannot sue, garnish wages, assert a deficiency, repossess property, or otherwise try to collect from the debtors. Creditors cannot demand repayment from debtors by mail, phone, or otherwise. Creditors who violate the stay can be required to pay actual and punitive damages and attorney's fees. Under certain circumstances, the stay may be limited to 30 days or not exist at all, although debtors can ask the court to extend or impose a stay. The debtors are seeking a discharge. Creditors who assert that the debtors are not entitled to a discharge of any debts or who want to have a particular debt excepted from discharge may be required to file a complaint in the bankruptcy clerk's office within the deadlines specified in this notice. (See line 9 for more information.) To protect your rights, consult an attorney. All documents filed in the case may be inspected at the bankruptcy clerk's office at the address listed below or through PACER (Public Access to Court Electronic Records at www.pacer.gov). The staff of the bankruptcy clerk's office cannot give legal advice. To help creditors correctly identify debtors, debtors submit full Social Security or Individual Taxpayer Identification Numbers, which may appear on a version of this notice. However, the full numbers must not appear on any document filed with the court. Do not file this notice with any proof of claim or other filing in the case. Do not include more than the last four digits of a Social Security or Individual Taxpayer Identification Number in any document, including attachments, that you file with the court. About Debtor 1: About Debtor 2: 1. Debtor's full name Patrick Shane Holley 2. All other names used in the last 8 years 3. Address 5435 Quail Ridge Road Gardendale, AL 35071 4. Debtor's attorney Brent William Davis Contact phone 205−989−1919 Brent W. Davis & Associates, L.L.C. Name and address 2700 Rogers Drive Email: brent@brentwdavis.com Suite 106 Homewood, AL 35209−2055 5. Bankruptcy trustee Thomas E Reynolds Contact phone 205−957−6500 Reynolds Legal Solutions, LLC Name and address 300 Richard Arrington Jr. Blvd. N Suite 503 Birmingham, AL 35203 For more information, see page 2 > Official Form 309A (For Individuals or Joint Debtors) Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case −− No Proof of Claim Deadline page 1 Case 17-00487-DSC7 Doc 63 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 12:09:03 Desc Ch 7 First Mtg I/J No POC Page 1 of 2 Debtor Patrick Shane Holley Case number 17−00487−DSC7 6. Bankruptcy clerk's office Robert S. Vance Federal Building Hours open: 1800 5th Avenue North Documents in this case may be filed at this Birmingham, AL 35203 8:00 a.m. − 4:00 p.m. address. You may inspect all records filed Monday−Friday in this case at this office or online at www.pacer.gov. Contact phone 205−714−4000 Date: 2/13/18 7. Meeting of creditors March 12, 2018 at 02:30 PM Location: Debtors must attend the meeting to be The meeting may be continued or adjourned to a Robert S. Vance Federal questioned under oath. In a joint case, later date. If so, the date will be on the court Building, 1800 5th Avenue North, both spouses must attend. Creditors may attend, but are not required to do so. docket. Birmingham, AL 35203 8. Presumption of abuse The presumption of abuse does not arise. If the presumption of abuse arises, you may have the right to file a motion to dismiss the case under 11 U.S.C. § 707(b). Debtors may rebut the presumption by showing special circumstances. 9. Deadlines File by the deadline to object to discharge or Filing deadline: 5/11/18 to challenge whether certain debts are The bankruptcy clerk's office must receive dischargeable: these documents and any required filing fee by the following deadlines. You must file a complaint: • if you assert that the debtor is not entitled to receive a discharge of any debts under any of the subdivisions of 11 U.S.C. § 727(a)(2) through (7), or • if you want to have a debt excepted from discharge under 11 U.S.C § 523(a)(2), (4), or (6). You must file a motion: • if you assert that the discharge should be denied under § 727(a)(8) or (9). Deadline to object to exemptions: Filing deadline: 30 days after the The law permits debtors to keep certain property as conclusion of the meeting of creditors exempt. If you believe that the law does not authorize an exemption claimed, you may file an objection. 10. Proof of claim No property appears to be available to pay creditors. Therefore, please do not file a proof of claim now. If it later appears that assets are available to pay creditors, the clerk Please do not file a proof of claim unless will send you another notice telling you that you may file a proof of claim and stating the you receive a notice to do so. deadline. 11. Creditors with a foreign address If you are a creditor receiving a notice mailed to a foreign address, you may file a motion asking the court to extend the deadlines in this notice. Consult an attorney familiar with United States bankruptcy law if you have any questions about your rights in this case. 12. Exempt property The law allows debtors to keep certain property as exempt. Fully exempt property will not be sold and distributed to creditors. Debtors must file a list of property claimed as exempt. You may inspect that list at the bankruptcy clerk's office or online at www.pacer.gov. If you believe that the law does not authorize an exemption that the debtors claim, you may file an objection. The bankruptcy clerk's office must receive the objection by the deadline to object to exemptions in line 9. Official Form 309A (For Individuals or Joint Debtors) Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case −− No Proof of Claim Deadline page 2 Case 17-00487-DSC7 Doc 63 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 12:09:03 Desc Ch 7 First Mtg I/J No POC Page 2 of 2

Order Appointing Trustee. Thomas E Reynolds added to the case. Signed on 2/13/2018.

Trn−501 [Order Appointing Interim Trustee] (Rev. 09/15) United States Bankruptcy Court NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−00487−DSC7 Patrick Shane Holley Chapter 7 SSN: xxx−xx−4403 Debtor(s) ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM TRUSTEE AND APPROVING STANDING BOND It is ORDERED and notice is hereby given that: 1. The following interim trustee is hereby appointed, and the trustee's standing bond is fixed under the general blanket bond heretofore approved. Thomas E Reynolds Reynolds Legal Solutions, LLC 300 Richard Arrington Jr. Blvd. N Suite 503 Birmingham, AL 35203 2. Unless the interim trustee files a rejection of this appointment within seven (7) days following receipt of this order, the trustee will be deemed to have accepted this appointment as provided by Rule 2008. Dated: February 13, 2018 /s/ D. Sims Crawford United States Bankruptcy Judge jlp Case 17-00487-DSC7 Doc 64 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 12:11:02 Desc Order Appointing Interim Trust Page 1 of 1

Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Michael McCormick, Attorney for U.S. Bank, N.A. (RE: related document(s) {{61}} Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor U.S. Bank National Association, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay). Hearing scheduled 3/13/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.

Van−014 [Notice of Final Hearing] (Rev. 07/15) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−00487−DSC7 Patrick Shane Holley Chapter 7 SSN: xxx−xx−4403 Debtor(s) NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING Notice is hereby given that Michael McCormick, Attorney for U.S. Bank, N.A. filed a Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay and Co−Debtor Stay − Allison Powell in the above−styled case. The preliminary hearing shall be consolidated with the final evidentiary hearing and parties are to be prepared for trial. The final hearing will be held to consider and act upon said Motion. Date: Tuesday, March 13, 2018 Time: 10:00 AM Location: Robert S. Vance Federal Bldg, 1800 5th Ave No, Courtroom 1, Birmingham, AL 35203 Attendance is not required if a settlement has been reached as approved by all parties and filed with the Court by an attorney prior to the hearing date. Dated: February 13, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court jlp Case 17-00487-DSC7 Doc 65 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 12:51:57 Desc Notice of Final Hearing Page 1 of 1

Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor U.S. Bank National Association (RE: related document(s)[61] Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay, on 5435 Quail Ridge Road, Gardendale, AL 35071, [62] Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay).

UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA BIRMINGHAM DIVISION IN RE:)) PATRICK SHANE HOLLEY,) CASE NO. 17-00487) DEBTOR.)) U.S. BANK NATIONAL) ASSOCIATION,)) MOVANT.)) vs.)) PATRICK SHANE HOLLEY,) ALLISON POWELL, CO-DEBTOR,)) DEFENDANTS.) I hereby certify that I have served a true and correct copy of the Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay and Co-Debtor Stay filed on February 13, 2018 [Docket #61] and the Fact Summary Sheet filed on February 13, 2018 [Docket #62] to the parties listed below by placing a copy of the same in the United States Mail first-class, postage prepaid, on this the 15th day of February, 2018. Trustee Thomas E Reynolds Reynolds Legal Solutions, LLC 300 Richard Arrington Jr. Blvd. N Suite 503 Birmingham, AL 35203 /s/Michael J. McCormick Michael J. McCormick Attorney for Movant McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC 1544 Old Alabama Road Roswell, Georgia 30076 678-281-3918 Michael.McCormick@mccalla.com Case 17-00487-DSC7 Doc 67 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/15/18 10:23:09 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Trustee's Notice of No Objection Filed by Trustee Thomas E Reynolds (RE: related document(s)[61] Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay, on 5435 Quail Ridge Road, Gardendale, AL 35071 Filed by Creditor U.S. Bank National Association.

IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION IN RE: PATRICK SHANE HOLLEY BANKRUPTCY CASE NO .: 17 - 00487 Debtor (s) . NOTICE OF NO OBJECTION COMES NOW Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee in the above styled Chapter 7 bankruptcy case, and states that he has no objection to the Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay filed byU.S. Bank National Association (Doc. 61) . Ale: Olimele / s / Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee THOMAS E. REYNOLDS, TRUSTEE OF COUNSEL: REYNOLDS LEGAL SOLUTIONS, LLC 300 Richard Arrington Jr. Blvd. N. Suite 503 Birmingham, AL 35203 Telephone: (205) 957 - 6500 E - mail: terſareynoldslegalsolutions. com Case 17 - 00487 - DSC7 Doc 68 Filed 02 / 15 / 18 Entered 02 / 15 / 18 12: 54: 52 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[63] Convert Case). Notice Date 02/15/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-00487-DSC Patrick Shane Holley Chapter 7 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: jpannell Page 1 of 2 Date Rcvd: Feb 13, 2018 Form ID: 309A Total Noticed: 39 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Feb 15, 2018. db #+Patrick Shane Holley, 5435 Quail Ridge Road, Gardendale, AL 35071-2985 aty +Enslen Crowe, Sirote and Permutt, PO Box 55887, Birmingham, AL 35255-5887 aty +Michael McCormick, McCalla Raymer Padrick Cobb Nichols &, 1544 Old Alabama Rd., Roswell, GA 30076-2102 intp +Allison Powell, 5435 Quail Ridge Road, Gardendale, AL 35071-2985 cr +U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, 14841 Dallas Parkway, Suite 300, Dallas, TX 75254-7883 9340560 +Bank of America, N.A., P O Box 982284, El Paso, TX 79998-2284 9370946 +NCB Management Services, Inc., One Allied Drive, Trevose, PA 19053-6945 9376138 ST VINCENT AL EMERGENCY DEPARTMENT, WAKEFIELD AND ASSOCIATES, PO BOX 50250, KNOXVILLE,TN 37950-0250 9257355 State of Ala Dept of Revenue, POB 154, Montgomery, AL 36135-0001 9382229 +U.S. Attorney, 1801 4th Avenue N, Birmingham, AL 35203-2101 9257363 +Wakefield & Associates, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 50250, Knoxville, TN 37950-0250 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. aty E-mail/Text: brent@brentwdavis.com Feb 13 2018 18:28:16 Brent William Davis, Brent W. Davis & Associates, L.L.C., 2700 Rogers Drive, Suite 106, Homewood, AL 35209-2055 tr +EDI: QTEREYNOLDS.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Thomas E Reynolds, Reynolds Legal Solutions, LLC, 300 Richard Arrington Jr. Blvd. N, Suite 503, Birmingham, AL 35203-3354 smg +E-mail/Text: bnc_notices_southern@alnba.uscourts.gov Feb 13 2018 18:29:31 Thomas Corbett, BA Birmingham, 1800 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203-2111 cr +EDI: AISACG.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Capital One Auto Finance c/o AIS Portfolio Service, 4515 N Santa Fe Ave. Dept. APS, Oklahoma City, OK 73118-7901 cr EDI: AISACG.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Capital One Auto Finance c/o AIS Portfolio Service, P.O. BOX 4360, Houston, TX 77210-4360 cr +EDI: AISACG.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital On, P.O. Box 165028, Irving, TX 75016-5028 9257356 +EDI: AFNIRECOVERY.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Afni, Po Box 3427, Bloomington, IL 61702-3427 9322020 EDI: ALDEPREV.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Alabama Department of Revenue, Legal Division, P.O. Box 320001, Montgomery, Al 36132-0001 9257357 +EDI: BANKAMER.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Bank Of America, Nc4-105-03-14, Po Box 26012, Greensboro, NC 27420-6012 9257358 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@cavps.com Feb 13 2018 18:30:08 Calvary Portfolio Services, 500 Summit Lake Ste 400, Valhalla, NY 10595-2322 9257359 +EDI: CAPITALONE.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Capital One, Attn: General Correspondence/Bankruptcy, Po Box 30285, Salt Lake City, UT 84130-0285 9257351 +EDI: CAPONEAUTO.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Capital One Auto Finance, Attn: General Correspondence/Bankruptcy, Po Box 30285, Salt Lake City, UT 84130-0285 9594085 +EDI: AIS.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Capital One Auto Finance c/o AIS, Portfolio Services, 4515 N Santa Fe Ave. Dept. APS, Oklahoma, City, OK 73118-7901 9262866 +EDI: AISACG.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Capital One Auto Finance, c/o Ascension Capital Gr, P.O. Box 201347, Arlington, TX 76006-1347 9374893 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@cavps.com Feb 13 2018 18:30:08 Cavalry SPV I, LLC, 500 Summit Lake Drive, Ste 400, Valhalla, NY 10595-1340 9257352 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy.bnc@ditech.com Feb 13 2018 18:28:50 Ditech, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 6172, Rapid City, SD 57709-6172 9257360 +EDI: IIC9.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 IC Systems, Inc, 444 Highway 96 East, St Paul, MN 55127-2557 9257354 +EDI: IRS.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Internal Revenue Service TCS, insolvency, 801 Tom Martin Drive, Birmingham, AL 35211-6432 9257361 +EDI: RESURGENT.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 LVNV Funding, Po Box 10497, Greenville, SC 29603-0497 9304084 EDI: RESURGENT.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as, assignee of FNBM, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, PO Box 10587, Greenville, SC 29603-0587 9381778 EDI: RESURGENT.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as, assignee of Arrow Financial Services,, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, PO Box 10587, Greenville, SC 29603-0587 9257362 EDI: PRA.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Portfolio Recovery, Po Box 41067, Norfolk, VA 23541 9388656 EDI: PRA.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, POB 41067, Norfolk VA 23541 9282287 +EDI: PRA.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 PRA Receivables Management, LLC, PO Box 41021, Norfolk, VA 23541-1021 9302141 EDI: Q3G.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Quantum3 Group LLC as agent for, Galaxy International Purchasing LLC, PO Box 788, Kirkland, WA 98083-0788 9548250 EDI: USBANKARS.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 U.S. Bank National Association, C/O U.S. Bank Home Mortgage, a division of U.S. Bank NA, 4801 Frederica Street, Owensboro, Kentucky 42301 9283587 EDI: USBANKARS.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 U.S. Bank National Association, c/o U.S. Bank Home Mortgage, a division of U.S. Bank National Assoc., 4801 Frederica Street, Owensboro, Kentucky 42301 Case 17-00487-DSC7 Doc 69 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/16/18 00:07:48 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 4 District/off: 1126-2 User: jpannell Page 2 of 2 Date Rcvd: Feb 13, 2018 Form ID: 309A Total Noticed: 39 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (continued) 9257353 +EDI: USBANKARS.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Us Bank Home Mortgage, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 5229, Cincinnati, OH 45201-5229 TOTAL: 28 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (undeliverable, * duplicate) ***** cr* +PRA Receivables Management, LLC, PO Box 41021, Norfolk, VA 23541-1021 cr* Quantum3 Group LLC as agent for, Galaxy International Purchasing LLC, PO Box 788, Kirkland, WA 98083-0788 TOTALS: 0, * 2, ## 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. Addresses marked '#' were identified by the USPS National Change of Address system as requiring an update. While the notice was still deliverable, the notice recipient was advised to update its address with the court immediately. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Feb 15, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on February 13, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com Brent William Davis on behalf of Debtor Patrick Shane Holley brent@brentwdavis.com, 6167146420@filings.docketbird.com Enslen Crowe on behalf of Creditor U.S. Bank National Association ndbankruptcy@sirote.com Michael McCormick on behalf of Creditor U.S. Bank National Association BankruptcyECFMail@mccallaraymer.com, mjm@mccallaraymer.com Thomas E Reynolds ter@reynoldslegalsolutions.com, treynolds@ecf.epiqsystems.com;dnm@reynoldslegalsolutions.com TOTAL: 5 Case 17-00487-DSC7 Doc 69 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/16/18 00:07:48 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 4 Information to identify the case: Debtor 1 Patrick Shane Holley Social Security number or ITIN xxx−xx−4403 First Name Middle Name Last Name EIN _ _−_ _ _ _ _ _ _ Debtor 2 Social Security number or ITIN _ _ _ _ First Name Middle Name Last Name (Spouse, if filing) EIN _ _−_ _ _ _ _ _ _ UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF Date case filed in chapter 13 2/7/17 ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION Date case converted to chapter 7 2/13/18 Case number: 17−00487−DSC7 Official Form 309A (For Individuals or Joint Debtors) Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case −− No Proof of Claim Deadline 12/15 For the debtors listed above, a case has been filed under chapter 7 of the Bankruptcy Code. An order for relief has been entered. This notice has important information about the case for creditors, debtors, and trustees, including information about the meeting of creditors and deadlines. Read both pages carefully. The filing of the case imposed an automatic stay against most collection activities. This means that creditors generally may not take action to collect debts from the debtors or the debtors' property. For example, while the stay is in effect, creditors cannot sue, garnish wages, assert a deficiency, repossess property, or otherwise try to collect from the debtors. Creditors cannot demand repayment from debtors by mail, phone, or otherwise. Creditors who violate the stay can be required to pay actual and punitive damages and attorney's fees. Under certain circumstances, the stay may be limited to 30 days or not exist at all, although debtors can ask the court to extend or impose a stay. The debtors are seeking a discharge. Creditors who assert that the debtors are not entitled to a discharge of any debts or who want to have a particular debt excepted from discharge may be required to file a complaint in the bankruptcy clerk's office within the deadlines specified in this notice. (See line 9 for more information.) To protect your rights, consult an attorney. All documents filed in the case may be inspected at the bankruptcy clerk's office at the address listed below or through PACER (Public Access to Court Electronic Records at www.pacer.gov). The staff of the bankruptcy clerk's office cannot give legal advice. To help creditors correctly identify debtors, debtors submit full Social Security or Individual Taxpayer Identification Numbers, which may appear on a version of this notice. However, the full numbers must not appear on any document filed with the court. Do not file this notice with any proof of claim or other filing in the case. Do not include more than the last four digits of a Social Security or Individual Taxpayer Identification Number in any document, including attachments, that you file with the court. About Debtor 1: About Debtor 2: 1. Debtor's full name Patrick Shane Holley 2. All other names used in the last 8 years 3. Address 5435 Quail Ridge Road Gardendale, AL 35071 4. Debtor's attorney Brent William Davis Contact phone 205−989−1919 Brent W. Davis & Associates, L.L.C. Name and address 2700 Rogers Drive Email: brent@brentwdavis.com Suite 106 Homewood, AL 35209−2055 5. Bankruptcy trustee Thomas E Reynolds Contact phone 205−957−6500 Reynolds Legal Solutions, LLC Name and address 300 Richard Arrington Jr. Blvd. N Suite 503 Birmingham, AL 35203 For more information, see page 2 > Official Form 309A (For Individuals or Joint Debtors) Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case −− No Proof of Claim Deadline page 1 Case 17-00487-DSC7 Doc 69 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/16/18 00:07:48 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 3 of 4 Debtor Patrick Shane Holley Case number 17−00487−DSC7 6. Bankruptcy clerk's office Robert S. Vance Federal Building Hours open: 1800 5th Avenue North Documents in this case may be filed at this Birmingham, AL 35203 8:00 a.m. − 4:00 p.m. address. You may inspect all records filed Monday−Friday in this case at this office or online at www.pacer.gov. Contact phone 205−714−4000 Date: 2/13/18 7. Meeting of creditors March 12, 2018 at 02:30 PM Location: Debtors must attend the meeting to be The meeting may be continued or adjourned to a Robert S. Vance Federal questioned under oath. In a joint case, later date. If so, the date will be on the court Building, 1800 5th Avenue North, both spouses must attend. Creditors may attend, but are not required to do so. docket. Birmingham, AL 35203 8. Presumption of abuse The presumption of abuse does not arise. If the presumption of abuse arises, you may have the right to file a motion to dismiss the case under 11 U.S.C. § 707(b). Debtors may rebut the presumption by showing special circumstances. 9. Deadlines File by the deadline to object to discharge or Filing deadline: 5/11/18 to challenge whether certain debts are The bankruptcy clerk's office must receive dischargeable: these documents and any required filing fee by the following deadlines. You must file a complaint: • if you assert that the debtor is not entitled to receive a discharge of any debts under any of the subdivisions of 11 U.S.C. § 727(a)(2) through (7), or • if you want to have a debt excepted from discharge under 11 U.S.C § 523(a)(2), (4), or (6). You must file a motion: • if you assert that the discharge should be denied under § 727(a)(8) or (9). Deadline to object to exemptions: Filing deadline: 30 days after the The law permits debtors to keep certain property as conclusion of the meeting of creditors exempt. If you believe that the law does not authorize an exemption claimed, you may file an objection. 10. Proof of claim No property appears to be available to pay creditors. Therefore, please do not file a proof of claim now. If it later appears that assets are available to pay creditors, the clerk Please do not file a proof of claim unless will send you another notice telling you that you may file a proof of claim and stating the you receive a notice to do so. deadline. 11. Creditors with a foreign address If you are a creditor receiving a notice mailed to a foreign address, you may file a motion asking the court to extend the deadlines in this notice. Consult an attorney familiar with United States bankruptcy law if you have any questions about your rights in this case. 12. Exempt property The law allows debtors to keep certain property as exempt. Fully exempt property will not be sold and distributed to creditors. Debtors must file a list of property claimed as exempt. You may inspect that list at the bankruptcy clerk's office or online at www.pacer.gov. If you believe that the law does not authorize an exemption that the debtors claim, you may file an objection. The bankruptcy clerk's office must receive the objection by the deadline to object to exemptions in line 9. Official Form 309A (For Individuals or Joint Debtors) Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case −− No Proof of Claim Deadline page 2 Case 17-00487-DSC7 Doc 69 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/16/18 00:07:48 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 4 of 4

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[63] Convert Case). Notice Date 02/15/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-00487-DSC Patrick Shane Holley Chapter 7 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: jpannell Page 1 of 2 Date Rcvd: Feb 13, 2018 Form ID: van010 Total Noticed: 35 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Feb 15, 2018. db #+Patrick Shane Holley, 5435 Quail Ridge Road, Gardendale, AL 35071-2985 intp +Allison Powell, 5435 Quail Ridge Road, Gardendale, AL 35071-2985 cr +U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, 14841 Dallas Parkway, Suite 300, Dallas, TX 75254-7883 9257357 #+Bank Of America, Nc4-105-03-14, Po Box 26012, Greensboro, NC 27420-6012 9340560 +Bank of America, N.A., P O Box 982284, El Paso, TX 79998-2284 9257359 +Capital One, Attn: General Correspondence/Bankruptcy, Po Box 30285, Salt Lake City, UT 84130-0285 9257360 +IC Systems, Inc, 444 Highway 96 East, St Paul, MN 55127-2557 9370946 +NCB Management Services, Inc., One Allied Drive, Trevose, PA 19053-6945 9376138 ST VINCENT AL EMERGENCY DEPARTMENT, WAKEFIELD AND ASSOCIATES, PO BOX 50250, KNOXVILLE,TN 37950-0250 9257355 State of Ala Dept of Revenue, POB 154, Montgomery, AL 36135-0001 9382229 +U.S. Attorney, 1801 4th Avenue N, Birmingham, AL 35203-2101 9548250 ++US BANK, PO BOX 5229, CINCINNATI OH 45201-5229 (address filed with court: U.S. Bank National Association, C/O U.S. Bank Home Mortgage, a division of U.S. Bank NA, 4801 Frederica Street, Owensboro, Kentucky 42301) 9257353 +Us Bank Home Mortgage, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 5229, Cincinnati, OH 45201-5229 9257363 +Wakefield & Associates, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 50250, Knoxville, TN 37950-0250 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. smg +E-mail/Text: bnc_notices_southern@alnba.uscourts.gov Feb 13 2018 18:29:24 Thomas Corbett, BA Birmingham, 1800 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203-2111 cr +E-mail/PDF: acg.acg.ebn@americaninfosource.com Feb 13 2018 18:27:46 Capital One Auto Finance c/o AIS Portfolio Service, 4515 N Santa Fe Ave. Dept. APS, Oklahoma City, OK 73118-7901 cr E-mail/PDF: acg.acg.ebn@americaninfosource.com Feb 13 2018 18:28:02 Capital One Auto Finance c/o AIS Portfolio Service, P.O. BOX 4360, Houston, TX 77210-4360 cr +E-mail/PDF: acg.acg.ebn@americaninfosource.com Feb 13 2018 18:27:46 Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital On, P.O. Box 165028, Irving, TX 75016-5028 E-mail/Text: ctmail@ch13bham.com Feb 13 2018 18:30:51 Chapter 13 Standing Trustee, PO Box 10848, Birmingham, AL 35202-0848 9257356 +E-mail/Text: EBNProcessing@afni.com Feb 13 2018 18:29:53 Afni, Po Box 3427, Bloomington, IL 61702-3427 9322020 E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@revenue.alabama.gov Feb 13 2018 18:30:40 Alabama Department of Revenue, Legal Division, P.O. Box 320001, Montgomery, Al 36132-0001 9257358 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@cavps.com Feb 13 2018 18:30:06 Calvary Portfolio Services, 500 Summit Lake Ste 400, Valhalla, NY 10595-2322 9257351 +E-mail/PDF: AIS.COAF.EBN@Americaninfosource.com Feb 13 2018 18:28:07 Capital One Auto Finance, Attn: General Correspondence/Bankruptcy, Po Box 30285, Salt Lake City, UT 84130-0285 9594085 +E-mail/PDF: EBN_AIS@AMERICANINFOSOURCE.COM Feb 13 2018 18:34:25 Capital One Auto Finance c/o AIS, Portfolio Services, 4515 N Santa Fe Ave. Dept. APS, Oklahoma, City, OK 73118-7901 9262866 +E-mail/PDF: acg.acg.ebn@americaninfosource.com Feb 13 2018 18:27:46 Capital One Auto Finance, c/o Ascension Capital Gr, P.O. Box 201347, Arlington, TX 76006-1347 9374893 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@cavps.com Feb 13 2018 18:30:06 Cavalry SPV I, LLC, 500 Summit Lake Drive, Ste 400, Valhalla, NY 10595-1340 9257352 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy.bnc@ditech.com Feb 13 2018 18:28:50 Ditech, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 6172, Rapid City, SD 57709-6172 9257354 +E-mail/Text: cio.bncmail@irs.gov Feb 13 2018 18:28:39 Internal Revenue Service TCS, insolvency, 801 Tom Martin Drive, Birmingham, AL 35211-6432 9257361 +E-mail/PDF: resurgentbknotifications@resurgent.com Feb 13 2018 18:34:19 LVNV Funding, Po Box 10497, Greenville, SC 29603-0497 9304084 E-mail/PDF: resurgentbknotifications@resurgent.com Feb 13 2018 18:34:19 LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as, assignee of FNBM, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, PO Box 10587, Greenville, SC 29603-0587 9381778 E-mail/PDF: resurgentbknotifications@resurgent.com Feb 13 2018 18:34:40 LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as, assignee of Arrow Financial Services,, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, PO Box 10587, Greenville, SC 29603-0587 9257362 E-mail/PDF: PRA_BK2_CASE_UPDATE@portfoliorecovery.com Feb 13 2018 18:34:31 Portfolio Recovery, Po Box 41067, Norfolk, VA 23541 9388656 E-mail/PDF: PRA_BK2_CASE_UPDATE@portfoliorecovery.com Feb 13 2018 18:45:29 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, POB 41067, Norfolk VA 23541 9282287 +E-mail/PDF: PRA_BK2_CASE_UPDATE@portfoliorecovery.com Feb 13 2018 18:34:21 PRA Receivables Management, LLC, PO Box 41021, Norfolk, VA 23541-1021 9302141 E-mail/Text: bnc-quantum@quantum3group.com Feb 13 2018 18:29:05 Quantum3 Group LLC as agent for, Galaxy International Purchasing LLC, PO Box 788, Kirkland, WA 98083-0788 TOTAL: 21 Case 17-00487-DSC7 Doc 70 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/16/18 00:07:48 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 3 District/off: 1126-2 User: jpannell Page 2 of 2 Date Rcvd: Feb 13, 2018 Form ID: van010 Total Noticed: 35 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (continued) ***** ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (undeliverable, * duplicate) ***** cr* +PRA Receivables Management, LLC, PO Box 41021, Norfolk, VA 23541-1021 cr* Quantum3 Group LLC as agent for, Galaxy International Purchasing LLC, PO Box 788, Kirkland, WA 98083-0788 9283587* ++US BANK, PO BOX 5229, CINCINNATI OH 45201-5229 (address filed with court: U.S. Bank National Association, c/o U.S. Bank Home Mortgage, a division of U.S. Bank National Assoc., 4801 Frederica Street, Owensboro, Kentucky 42301) TOTALS: 0, * 3, ## 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. Addresses marked '++' were redirected to the recipient's preferred mailing address pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 342(f)/Fed.R.Bank.PR.2002(g)(4). Addresses marked '#' were identified by the USPS National Change of Address system as requiring an update. While the notice was still deliverable, the notice recipient was advised to update its address with the court immediately. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Feb 15, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on February 13, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com Brent William Davis on behalf of Debtor Patrick Shane Holley brent@brentwdavis.com, 6167146420@filings.docketbird.com Enslen Crowe on behalf of Creditor U.S. Bank National Association ndbankruptcy@sirote.com Michael McCormick on behalf of Creditor U.S. Bank National Association BankruptcyECFMail@mccallaraymer.com, mjm@mccallaraymer.com Thomas E Reynolds ter@reynoldslegalsolutions.com, treynolds@ecf.epiqsystems.com;dnm@reynoldslegalsolutions.com TOTAL: 5 Case 17-00487-DSC7 Doc 70 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/16/18 00:07:48 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 3 Van−010 [Conversion Notice] (Rev. 12/15) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−00487−DSC7 Patrick Shane Holley Chapter 7 SSN: xxx−xx−4403 Debtor(s) CONVERSION NOTICE NOTICE is hereby provided: The Debtor filed a Notice of Conversion on 2/13/18. The Debtor is required to pay the conversion fee of $25.00 to the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court within 2 business days from the date of this notice, or this case may be set for dismissal. On or before 14 days from the date of filing the Notice of Conversion the Debtor is required to do the following: (1) File amendments to Schedules A through F, listing any and all changes to property or amounts owed since the commencement of the original bankruptcy case; (2) File a Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information − Individual (Official Form 106) pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §159; (3) File an Attorney's Disclosure of Compensation regarding fees received in the chapter 13 case, fees paid for the conversion of the chapter 13 case and any fees for the chapter 7 case pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §329; (4) File a Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Means−Test Calculation (Official Form 122A) for cases filed on or after October 17, 2005; Further, the Debtor is required to file with the Court on or before 30 days from the date of the Notice of Conversion or the date set for the Section 341 meeting of creditors, whichever date is earlier, a Statement of Intention pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §521. A copy of the statement is to be served on the creditors and parties to the case and the same is to be certified to the Court upon completion. Failure to comply with the filing requirements or payment of fees within the time limits may result in the dismissal of the case. Copies of all amendments and statements are to be served on the appointed Chapter 7 Trustee and the Bankruptcy Administrator. Dated: February 13, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court jlp Case 17-00487-DSC7 Doc 70 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/16/18 00:07:48 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 3 of 3

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[65] Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 02/15/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-00487-DSC Patrick Shane Holley Chapter 7 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: jpannell Page 1 of 1 Date Rcvd: Feb 13, 2018 Form ID: van014 Total Noticed: 11 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Feb 15, 2018. db #+Patrick Shane Holley, 5435 Quail Ridge Road, Gardendale, AL 35071-2985 intp +Allison Powell, 5435 Quail Ridge Road, Gardendale, AL 35071-2985 cr +U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, 14841 Dallas Parkway, Suite 300, Dallas, TX 75254-7883 9283587 ++US BANK, PO BOX 5229, CINCINNATI OH 45201-5229 (address filed with court: U.S. Bank National Association, c/o U.S. Bank Home Mortgage, a division of U.S. Bank National Assoc., 4801 Frederica Street, Owensboro, Kentucky 42301) 9257353 +Us Bank Home Mortgage, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 5229, Cincinnati, OH 45201-5229 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. smg +E-mail/Text: bnc_notices_southern@alnba.uscourts.gov Feb 13 2018 18:29:22 Thomas Corbett, BA Birmingham, 1800 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203-2111 cr +E-mail/PDF: acg.acg.ebn@americaninfosource.com Feb 13 2018 18:27:30 Capital One Auto Finance c/o AIS Portfolio Service, 4515 N Santa Fe Ave. Dept. APS, Oklahoma City, OK 73118-7901 cr E-mail/PDF: acg.acg.ebn@americaninfosource.com Feb 13 2018 18:27:44 Capital One Auto Finance c/o AIS Portfolio Service, P.O. BOX 4360, Houston, TX 77210-4360 cr +E-mail/PDF: acg.acg.ebn@americaninfosource.com Feb 13 2018 18:27:30 Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital On, P.O. Box 165028, Irving, TX 75016-5028 cr +E-mail/PDF: PRA_BK2_CASE_UPDATE@portfoliorecovery.com Feb 13 2018 18:34:30 PRA Receivables Management, LLC, PO Box 41021, Norfolk, VA 23541-1021 cr E-mail/Text: bnc-quantum@quantum3group.com Feb 13 2018 18:29:04 Quantum3 Group LLC as agent for, Galaxy International Purchasing LLC, PO Box 788, Kirkland, WA 98083-0788 TOTAL: 6 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (undeliverable, * duplicate) ***** 9548250* ++US BANK, PO BOX 5229, CINCINNATI OH 45201-5229 (address filed with court: U.S. Bank National Association, C/O U.S. Bank Home Mortgage, a division of U.S. Bank NA, 4801 Frederica Street, Owensboro, Kentucky 42301) TOTALS: 0, * 1, ## 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. Addresses marked '++' were redirected to the recipient's preferred mailing address pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 342(f)/Fed.R.Bank.PR.2002(g)(4). Addresses marked '#' were identified by the USPS National Change of Address system as requiring an update. While the notice was still deliverable, the notice recipient was advised to update its address with the court immediately. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Feb 15, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on February 13, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com Brent William Davis on behalf of Debtor Patrick Shane Holley brent@brentwdavis.com, 6167146420@filings.docketbird.com Enslen Crowe on behalf of Creditor U.S. Bank National Association ndbankruptcy@sirote.com Michael McCormick on behalf of Creditor U.S. Bank National Association BankruptcyECFMail@mccallaraymer.com, mjm@mccallaraymer.com Thomas E Reynolds ter@reynoldslegalsolutions.com, treynolds@ecf.epiqsystems.com;dnm@reynoldslegalsolutions.com TOTAL: 5 Case 17-00487-DSC7 Doc 71 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/16/18 00:07:48 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 2 Van−014 [Notice of Final Hearing] (Rev. 07/15) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−00487−DSC7 Patrick Shane Holley Chapter 7 SSN: xxx−xx−4403 Debtor(s) NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING Notice is hereby given that Michael McCormick, Attorney for U.S. Bank, N.A. filed a Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay and Co−Debtor Stay − Allison Powell in the above−styled case. The preliminary hearing shall be consolidated with the final evidentiary hearing and parties are to be prepared for trial. The final hearing will be held to consider and act upon said Motion. Date: Tuesday, March 13, 2018 Time: 10:00 AM Location: Robert S. Vance Federal Bldg, 1800 5th Ave No, Courtroom 1, Birmingham, AL 35203 Attendance is not required if a settlement has been reached as approved by all parties and filed with the Court by an attorney prior to the hearing date. Dated: February 13, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court jlp Case 17-00487-DSC7 Doc 71 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/16/18 00:07:48 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 244 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/07/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Patrick Shane Holley
2
02/07/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Patrick Shane Holley.
3
02/07/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Patrick Shane Holley
5
02/07/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Patrick Shane Holley.
6
02/07/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Patrick Shane Holley.
7
02/07/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Patrick Shane Holley.
8
02/07/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/08/2017 at 10:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 04/04/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 06/06/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 08/07/2017 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 05/08/2017.
9
02/08/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
02/08/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Patrick Shane Holley Case Number 02-03663, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 05/08/2002.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
02/08/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Patrick Shane Holley).
11
02/09/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 02/09/2017.
12
02/10/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A.
13
02/10/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Patrick Shane Holley). Notice Date 02/10/2017.
14
02/10/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 02/10/2017.
15
03/01/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
16
03/09/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 3/8/2017. (Ch13troffice, jc)
17
03/15/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
18
03/16/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 4/4/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
19
03/18/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 18 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 03/18/2017.
20
03/19/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2015 Filed by Debtor Patrick Shane Holley.
21
04/04/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 4/4/2017 (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation Hearing), 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 6/6/2017 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
22
04/06/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 21 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 04/06/2017.
04/18/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 155.00 Filed by Trustee C. David Cottingham (Acting). (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-00487-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (155.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20599997. Fee Amount 155.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
04/26/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Patrick Shane Holley.
05/18/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 77.50 Filed by Trustee C. David Cottingham (Acting). (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-00487-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (77.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20720259. Fee Amount 77.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
05/30/2017
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Patrick Shane Holley.
25
05/30/2017
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Patrick Shane Holley.
26
05/30/2017
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 3 of IRS in the amount of $17,464.57 Filed by Debtor Patrick Shane Holley.
27
05/31/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 26 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Patrick Shane Holley). Hearing scheduled 7/11/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
28
06/02/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 27 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/02/2017.
06/07/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 77.50 Filed by Trustee C. David Cottingham (Acting). (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-00487-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (77.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20785066. Fee Amount 77.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
06/07/2017
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s) 10 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
30
06/09/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 6/9/2017 (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation Hearing), 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case). Hearing scheduled 7/18/2017 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
31
06/11/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 30 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 06/11/2017.
32
07/11/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 7/11/2017 (RE: related document(s) 26 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Patrick Shane Holley). Hearing scheduled 8/15/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
33
07/13/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 32 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 07/13/2017.
34
07/18/2017
Withdrawal of Claims: 4 Filed by Creditor Quantum3 Group LLC as agent for.
35
07/18/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 7/18/2017 (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation Hearing), 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 8/15/2017 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
36
07/21/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 35 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 07/21/2017.
37
08/15/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 8/15/2017 (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation Hearing, 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 9/19/2017 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. (cdr) Modified on 8/15/2017
38
08/16/2017
Order the Objection to Claim #3 is overruled and claim is allowed as filed. Signed on 8/16/2017 (RE: related document(s) 26 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Patrick Shane Holley).
39
08/17/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 37 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 08/17/2017.
40
08/18/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 38 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 08/18/2017.
41
09/08/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay, Filed by Creditor U.S. Bank National Association
1
Affidavit #
2
Note #
3
Mortgage
3 Attachments
42
09/08/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor U.S. Bank National Association (RE: related document(s) 41 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay,).
09/08/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-00487-DSC13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21138661. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 41) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
09/11/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Enslen Crowe, Attorney for U.S. Bank, N.A. (RE: related document(s) 41 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor U.S. Bank National Association, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay). Hearing scheduled 10/3/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
45
09/13/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 43 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 09/13/2017.
46
09/22/2017
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
47
10/03/2017
Courtroom Deputy Notes (By agreement of the parties, this matter is settled and Mrs. Crowe shall submit a proposed order.) RE: Doc #41; Motion for Relief from Stay and Co-Debtor Stay filed by Enslen Crowe, Attorney for U.S. Bank, N.A.
48
10/11/2017
Order Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 41), Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Co-Debtor Stay (Related Doc # 41) Signed on 10/11/2017.
49
10/11/2017
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 10/11/2017 (RE: related document(s) 17 Trustees Objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied. 24 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Patrick Shane Holley).
50
10/13/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 49 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 10/13/2017.
51
10/13/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 48 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 10/13/2017.
52
11/22/2017
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
53
12/13/2017
Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, ct)
54
12/14/2017
Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (RE: related document(s) 53 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 1/23/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
55
12/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 54 Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Notice Date 12/16/2017.
56
12/28/2017
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP f/k/a AIS Data Services d/b/a/ Ascension Capital Group.
57
01/24/2018
Bench Sheet: (RE: related document(s) 53 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).
58
01/24/2018
Order - Other: Debtor has until 2/13/18 to Convert to Chapter 7, if not Converted this case shall be Dismissed - Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Related Doc # 53) Signed on 1/24/2018.
59
01/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 58 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Notice Date 01/26/2018.
60
02/13/2018
Notice of Voluntary Conversion to Chapter 7 Fee Amount $25.
02/13/2018
Receipt of Notice of Voluntary Conversion to Chapter 7(17-00487-DSC13) [notice,ntccnv] (25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21716341. Fee Amount 25.00 (re:Doc# 60) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
02/13/2018
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay, on 5435 Quail Ridge Road, Gardendale, AL 35071 Filed by Creditor U.S. Bank National Association
1
Affidavit #
2
Exhibit Loan documents #
3
Exhibit Payment history
3 Attachments
62
02/13/2018
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor U.S. Bank National Association (RE: related document(s) 61 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay, on 5435 Quail Ridge Road, Gardendale, AL 35071).
02/13/2018
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-00487-DSC13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21716941. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 61) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
02/13/2018
Convert Case Trustee Bradford W. Caraway removed from the case. Trustee Thomas E Reynolds added to the case. Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts Due 5/11/2018. 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/12/2018 at 02:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 5/11/2018.
64
02/13/2018
Order Appointing Trustee. Thomas E Reynolds added to the case. Signed on 2/13/2018.
65
02/13/2018
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Michael McCormick, Attorney for U.S. Bank, N.A. (RE: related document(s) 61 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor U.S. Bank National Association, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay). Hearing scheduled 3/13/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
67
02/15/2018
Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor U.S. Bank National Association (RE: related document(s)[61] Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay, on 5435 Quail Ridge Road, Gardendale, AL 35071, [62] Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay).
68
02/15/2018
Trustee's Notice of No Objection Filed by Trustee Thomas E Reynolds (RE: related document(s)[61] Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay, on 5435 Quail Ridge Road, Gardendale, AL 35071 Filed by Creditor U.S. Bank National Association.
69
02/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[63] Convert Case). Notice Date 02/15/2018.
70
02/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[63] Convert Case). Notice Date 02/15/2018.
71
02/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[65] Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 02/15/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.