Patrick Thor Larson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00214 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/09/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
07/09/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
07/09/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
07/09/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
07/09/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
07/10/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
07/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
9
07/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
07/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
07/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
07/23/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
07/23/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
07/23/2018
Change of Address
07/23/2018
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
07/24/2018
Clerks Notice
07/24/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
08/08/2018
Show Cause (with hrg) (SA)
16
08/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
08/15/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
08/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
18
08/31/2018
Dismissing Case (SA)
19
09/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
09/04/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
09/04/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
09/11/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
09/17/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
22
09/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.