Patterson v. City of New York
Court Docket Sheet

2nd Circuit Court of Appeals

2017-02586 (ca2)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Taj Patterson, FILED. Service date 09/28/2017 by CM/ECF. [2135685] [17-2586] [Entered: 09/28/2017 02:29 PM]

Case 17-2586, Document 46, 09/28/2017, 2135685, Page1 of 1 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR SUBSTITUTE, ADDITIONAL, OR AMICUS COUNSEL Short Title: Patterson v. City of New York Docket No.: 17-2586 Substitute, Additional, or Amicus Counsel’s Contact Information is as follows: Name: Michael B. Kimberly Firm: Mayer Brown LLP Address: 1999 K St NW Washington, DC 20006 Telephone: (202) 263-3127 Fax: (202) 263-5350 E-mail: mKimberly@mayerbrown.com Appearance for: Taj Patterson/Plaintiff-Appellant (party/designation) Select One: Substitute counsel (replacing lead counsel:) (name/firm) Substitute counsel (replacing other counsel:) (name/firm) Additional counsel (co-counsel with: Andrew B. Stoll/Stoll, Glickman & Bellina LLP) (name/firm) Amicus (in support of:) (party/designation) CERTIFICATION I certify that: I am admitted to practice in this Court and, if required by Interim Local Rule 46.1(a)(2), have renewed my admission on 9/29/2016 OR I applied for admission on. Signature of Counsel:/s/Michael B. Kimberly Type or Print Name:Michael B. Kimberly

CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 10/20/2017, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[2143976] [17-2586] [Entered: 10/10/2017 05:56 PM]

Case 17-2586, Document 49, 10/10/2017, 2143976, Page1 of 1 UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE SECOND CIRCUIT _____________________________________________ At a stated Term of the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, held at the Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, in the City of New York, on the 10th day of October, two thousand and seventeen. ___________________________________________ Patterson ORDER v. 17-2586 City of New York ___________________________________________ This Court’s Civil Appeals Mediation Program ("CAMP") has scheduled mediation in this appeal pursuant to Local Rule 33.1: Date: Friday, October 20, 2017 at 10:30 am (EST). Venue: Telephone mediation. Required Attendees: Counsel. Duration: 3 hours must be allocated. Instructions: CAMP will email individual dial-in information, including a PIN, to each counsel two weeks prior to the mediation. A PIN is unique to each caller and cannot be shared. Dean W. M. Leslie, Circuit Mediator, will hold the mediation. Counsel are directed to be prepared to discuss the legal merits of each issue on appeal, settlement possibilities, and the narrowing or clarification of issues. Counsel must proceed with the so-ordered briefing schedule. See Local Rule 31.2. Mediation does not constitute an "extraordinary circumstance" for the purpose of seeking a briefing extension. See Local Rule 27.1(f). Any questions regarding this order should be sent via email to camp_support@ca2.uscourts.gov or by calling (212) 857-8760. For The Court: Catherine O’Hagan Wolfe, Clerk of Court

CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 11/03/2017, Start Time: 2:00 PM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[2155322] [17-2586] [Entered: 10/24/2017 02:01 PM]

Case 17-2586, Document 50, 10/24/2017, 2155322, Page1 of 1 UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE SECOND CIRCUIT _____________________________________________ At a stated Term of the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, held at the Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, in the City of New York, on the 24th day of October, two thousand and seventeen. ___________________________________________ Patterson ORDER v. 17-2586 City of New York ___________________________________________ This Court’s Civil Appeals Mediation Program ("CAMP") has scheduled mediation in this appeal pursuant to Local Rule 33.1: Date: Friday, November 3, 2017 at 2:00 pm (EST). Venue: Telephone mediation. Required Attendees: Counsel. Duration: 3 hours must be allocated. Instructions: CAMP will email individual dial-in information, including a PIN, to each counsel two weeks prior to the mediation. A PIN is unique to each caller and cannot be shared. Dean W. M. Leslie, Circuit Mediator, will hold the mediation. Counsel are directed to be prepared to discuss the legal merits of each issue on appeal, settlement possibilities, and the narrowing or clarification of issues. Counsel must proceed with the so-ordered briefing schedule. See Local Rule 31.2. Mediation does not constitute an "extraordinary circumstance" for the purpose of seeking a briefing extension. See Local Rule 27.1(f). Any questions regarding this order should be sent via email to camp_support@ca2.uscourts.gov or by calling (212) 857-8760. For The Court: Catherine O’Hagan Wolfe, Clerk of Court

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
46
09/28/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Taj Patterson, FILED. Service date 09/28/2017 by CM/ECF. [2135685] [17-2586] [Entered: 09/28/2017 02:29 PM]
47
09/28/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Taj Patterson, FILED. Service date 09/28/2017 by CM/ECF. [2135695] [17-2586] [Entered: 09/28/2017 02:37 PM]
48
09/28/2017
ATTORNEYS, Michael B. Kimberly and Paul Whitfield Hughes for Taj Patterson, in case 17-2586[47], [46], ADDED.[2135713] [17-2586] [Entered: 09/28/2017 02:44 PM]
49
10/10/2017
CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 10/20/2017, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[2143976] [17-2586] [Entered: 10/10/2017 05:56 PM]
50
10/24/2017
CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 11/03/2017, Start Time: 2:00 PM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[2155322] [17-2586] [Entered: 10/24/2017 02:01 PM]
53
11/21/2017
MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellant Taj Patterson, FILED. Service date 11/21/2017 by CM/ECF. [2177415] [17-2586] [Entered: 11/21/2017 02:00 PM]
57
11/21/2017
NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[2177737] [17-2586] [Entered: 11/21/2017 04:15 PM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.