Paul Lynn Kopecky
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00149 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
36
07/03/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
37
07/03/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
07/25/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
07/25/2018
Certificate of No Objection
39
07/26/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments
07/26/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
08/09/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
41
08/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
42
08/14/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
08/16/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.