Paul William Koval
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2016-bk-00026 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/08/2016
Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Petition of Paul William Koval
92
06/25/2018
Postconfirmation Progress Report
93
10/25/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
94
10/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
95
11/14/2018
Postconfirmation Progress Report
96
11/15/2018
Proceeding Memo
97
11/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
98
11/18/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
99
11/20/2018
Generic Motion / Application
100
11/20/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
101
11/20/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
102
11/26/2018
Certificate of Service
103
12/21/2018
Change of Address
12/21/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/26/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
104
02/19/2019
Case Status Report
105
02/25/2019
Certificate of Service
106
02/25/2019
Certificate of No Objection
107
02/25/2019
Certificate of No Objection
108
02/25/2019
Generic Motion
109
02/26/2019
Postconfirmation Progress Report
110
02/28/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
111
03/01/2019
Proceeding Memo
112
03/19/2019
Compensation
03/21/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
113
03/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
114
05/08/2019
Postconfirmation Progress Report

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.