Pedersen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00182 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/08/2018
Complaint
2
08/08/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
08/08/2018
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
08/10/2018
Order on Motion to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
08/08/2018
Unissued Summons
5
08/08/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
7
08/10/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
08/10/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
09/20/2018
Notice of Appearance
9
09/24/2018
Order
09/24/2018
Docket Annotation re Opening Brief (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
09/25/2018
Affidavit of Service
11
09/25/2018
Affidavit of Service
12
09/25/2018
Affidavit of Service
13
11/05/2018
Notice of Appearance
14
11/16/2018
Answer to Complaint
15
11/16/2018
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security)
16
12/04/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
17
12/04/2018
Declaration
12/07/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
01/10/2019
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security)
20
01/10/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
21
01/31/2019
Notice of Appearance
22
02/08/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
23
02/18/2019
Reply to Response to Motion

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.