Pedro F. Tena and Shawna L. Tena
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00289 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/31/2018
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Pedro f. Tena and Shawna l. Tena
4
09/04/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
5
09/04/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
09/04/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
09/04/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
7
09/04/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
14
09/11/2018
Entry of Appearance
15
09/12/2018
Entry of Appearance
16
09/20/2018
Entry of Appearance
17
09/21/2018
Request for Special Notice
18
09/23/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
19
09/23/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
20
09/23/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
21
09/23/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
22
09/23/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
23
09/23/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
09/24/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
QC Remark Re: Incorrect Image (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
09/25/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
10/02/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
10/09/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
26
11/07/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
27
11/07/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
28
11/12/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
29
11/12/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
11/13/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
11/15/2018
Proceeding Memo
31
11/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
32
11/27/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
33
11/27/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
34
11/27/2018
Certificate of Service
11/27/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
11/27/2018
Certificate of No Objection
36
11/28/2018
Relief from Stay
37
11/29/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
11/29/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
11/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12/20/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/28/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
12/28/2018
Certificate of No Objection
40
12/28/2018
Certificate of Service
41
01/02/2019
Relief from Stay
42
01/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
43
01/11/2019
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
44
01/11/2019
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
01/16/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
02/05/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
46
02/12/2019
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
47
02/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
48
02/15/2019
Proceeding Memo
49
03/13/2019
Claims (SA)
50
03/13/2019
Claims (SA)
51
03/13/2019
Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (SA)
03/14/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
03/15/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
53
03/15/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
54
03/15/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
55
03/29/2019
Convert Case From Chapter 13 to Chapter 11 (CM11)
56
03/29/2019
Memorandum in Support
57
04/02/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
58
04/03/2019
Entry of Appearance
04/29/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.