Peggy E. Norman
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-05162 (alnb)

Order on Objection to Claim(s) 1,4 - Objections are Sustained and the balance of claim numbers 1 and 4 are disallowed. Signed on 7/16/2018 (RE: related document(s)[52] Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman, [53] Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman).

17-05162-TOM13 1 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA - SOUTHERN DIVISION In the Matter of: Peggy E. Norman } Case No: 17-05162-TOM13 SSN: XXX-XX-9300 } DEBTOR(S). } } } ORDER SUSTAINING This matter came before the Court on Thursday, July 12, 2018 09:30 AM, for a hearing on the following: 1) RE: Doc #52; Debtor's Objection to Claim # 1 of Capital One Auto Finance in the amount of $16,002.81 2) RE: Doc #53; Debtor's Objection to Claim # 4 of United Consumer Financial Services in the amount of $955.50 Proper notice of the hearing was given and appearances were made by the following: Bradford W. Caraway (Trustee) Robert D. Reese, attorney for Peggy E. Norman (Debtor) It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that: Based on arguments of counsel and the pleadings, the Objections are Sustained and the balance of claim numbers 1 and 4 are Disallowed. The Claimants have 45 days from the date of possession to file a deficiency balance claim if one is asserted. Further, in the event a deficiency balance claim is not filed timely and a discharge order is entered in this case, then the claimant's right to payment on any deficiency balance is hereby waived. Dated: 07/16/2018 /s/ TAMARA O. MITCHELL TAMARA O. MITCHELL United States Bankruptcy Judge Case 17-05162-TOM13 Doc 59 Filed 07/16/18 Entered 07/16/18 16:26:18 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[59] Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 07/18/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-05162-TOM Peggy E. Norman Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: pbgray Page 1 of 1 Date Rcvd: Jul 16, 2018 Form ID: pdf000 Total Noticed: 10 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Jul 18, 2018. db +Peggy E. Norman, 267 Martin Drive, Birmingham, AL 35215-1179 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. cr +E-mail/PDF: acg.acg.ebn@americaninfosource.com Jul 17 2018 02:27:48 Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital On, P.O. Box 165028, Irving, TX 75016-5028 cr +E-mail/PDF: acg.acg.ebn@americaninfosource.com Jul 17 2018 02:28:43 Capital One Auto Finance, a divison of Capital One, 4515 N Santa Fe Ave. Dept APS, Oklahoma City, OK 73118-7901 cr +E-mail/Text: bnc@bass-associates.com Jul 17 2018 02:13:00 United Consumer Financial Serv., Bass & Associates, P.C., 3936 E. Ft. Lowell Rd, Suite 200, Tucson, AZ 85712-1083 9577302 +E-mail/PDF: AIS.COAF.EBN@Americaninfosource.com Jul 17 2018 02:28:00 CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE, ATTN: BANKRUPTCY, PO BOX 30285, SALT LAKE CITY UT 84130-0285 9577303 +E-mail/PDF: AIS.COAF.EBN@Americaninfosource.com Jul 17 2018 02:27:09 CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE, 3901 DALLAS PARKWAY, PLANO TX 75093-7864 9577304 +E-mail/PDF: AIS.COAF.EBN@Americaninfosource.com Jul 17 2018 02:28:00 CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE, PO BOX 60511, CITY OF INDUSTRY CA 91716-0511 9579586 +E-mail/PDF: acg.acg.ebn@americaninfosource.com Jul 17 2018 02:28:43 Capital One Auto Finance, a division, of Capital One, N.A. c/o AIS, Portfolio Services, LP, 4515 N Santa Fe Ave. Dept. APS, Oklahoma City, OK 73118-7901 9577335 +E-mail/Text: EBankruptcy@UCFS.NET Jul 17 2018 02:17:27 UNITED CONSUMER FINANCIAL SVCS, 865 BASSETT RD, WESTLAKE OH 44145-1194 9613506 +E-mail/Text: bnc@bass-associates.com Jul 17 2018 02:13:00 United Consumer Financial Services, Bass & Associates, P.C., 3936 E. Ft. Lowell Road, Suite #200, Tucson, AZ 85712-1083 TOTAL: 9 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS ***** NONE. TOTAL: 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Jul 18, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on July 16, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com J. Suzanne Shinn on behalf of Debtor Peggy E. Norman pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com;9382390420@filings.docketbird .com Jacob Pippin Mauldin on behalf of Creditor Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper jmauldin@rubinlublin.com, lcaplan@rubinlublin.com;nbrown@rubinlublin.com;akhosla@rubinlublin.com;mhashim@rubinlublin.com;jd abbs2@rubinlublin.com Robert D. Reese on behalf of Debtor Peggy E. Norman pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com;9382390420@filings.docketbird .com TOTAL: 4 Case 17-05162-TOM13 Doc 60 Filed 07/18/18 Entered 07/19/18 00:10:43 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 2 720 81,7(' 67$7(6 %$1.5837&< &2857 1257+(51 ',675,&7 2) $/$%$0$ 6287+(51 ',9,6,21,Q WKH 0DWWHU RI 3HJJ\ (1RUPDQ ` &DVH 1R 720 661;;;;; ` '(%725 6 ` ` ` 25'(5 6867$,1,1* 7KLV PDWWHU FDPH EHIRUH WKH &RXUW RQ 7KXUVGD\ -XO\ ents of counsel and the pleadings, the Objections are Sustained and the balance of claim numbers 1 and 4 are Disallowed. The Claimants have 45 days from the date of possession to file a deficiency balance claim if one is asserted. Further, in the event a deficiency balance claim is not filed timely and a discharge order is entered in this case, then the claimant's right to payment on any deficiency balance is hereby waived. 'DWHG aged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 94 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Court Audio
1
12/06/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Peggy E. Norman
2
12/06/2017
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman.
3
12/06/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman
5
12/06/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman.
6
12/06/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman.
7
12/06/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman.
8
12/06/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman.
9
12/06/2017
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman.
10
12/06/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/10/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 02/22/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 02/14/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 06/04/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 03/12/2018.
12/07/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Peggy E. Norman Case Number 96-04237, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 06/21/1996; Case Number 02-08134, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 10/11/2002, Standard Discharge on 03/19/2003.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
12/07/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
12
12/07/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman).
13
12/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 12/08/2017.
14
12/09/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman). Notice Date 12/09/2017.
15
12/09/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 11 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 12/09/2017.
16
12/12/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A., c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
17
12/12/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jacob Pippin Mauldin Filed by Creditor Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper.
18
12/18/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
19
01/04/2018
Objection to Claim # 2 of Internal Revenue Service in the amount of $24,331.47 Filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman. (Shinn, J.)
20
01/05/2018
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a divison of Capital One, N.A. c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
21
01/05/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 19 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman). Hearing scheduled 2/8/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
22
01/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 21 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/07/2018.
23
01/12/2018
Trustee's Notice Continuance of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/17/2018 at 01:30 PM (Ch13troffice, sc)
24
01/12/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
25
01/12/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor United Consumer Financial Serv.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Service
1 Attachment
26
01/16/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 24 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 2/22/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
27
01/17/2018
Trustee's Notice Continuance of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/24/2018 at 01:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. (Ch13troffice, sc)
28
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 26 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
29
01/25/2018
Trustee's Notice Continuance of Meeting of Creditors on 1/31/2018 at 01:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham.
30
02/01/2018
Trustee's Notice Continuance of Meeting of Creditors on 2/7/2018 at 01:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham.
31
02/07/2018
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 2 - Objection is Withdrawn. Signed on 2/7/2018 (RE: related document(s) 19 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman).
32
02/08/2018
Meeting of Creditors Not Held 02/07/2018. (Ch13troffice, sc)
33
02/09/2018
Amended Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ul)
34
02/09/2018
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 33 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 2/22/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
35
02/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 31 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 02/09/2018.
36
02/22/2018
Order and Notice of Hearing Signed on 2/22/2018 (RE: related document(s) The Clerk is directed to reschedule the section 341 first meeting of creditors 10 Confirmation Hearing, Order Continuing 33 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 4/5/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
37
02/22/2018
Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/7/2018 at 01:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham.Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts Due 3/12/2018.Proofs of Claims due by 2/14/2018.Government Proof of Claim due by 6/4/2018.
38
02/23/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/22/2018 11:20:18 AM ]. File Size [ 433 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:12 ]. (RE: Doc #33; Trustee's Amended Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case). (adiuser).
39
02/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 37 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13). Notice Date 02/24/2018.
40
02/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 36 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 02/24/2018.
41
03/07/2018
Power of Attorney Filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman. (Shinn, J.)
42
03/08/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 3/7/2018. (Ch13troffice, bc)
03/14/2018
Payment of Full Filing Fee. Fee Amount $ 310 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/14/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-05162-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21837819. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
03/14/2018
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s) 12 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
44
04/06/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/5/2018 12:32:47 PM ]. File Size [ 874 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:26 ]. (RE: Doc #33; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case). (adiuser).
45
04/09/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 4/9/2018 (RE: related document(s) 10 Confirmation Hearing, 33 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case). Hearing scheduled 5/24/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
46
04/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 45 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 04/11/2018.
47
05/01/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities, Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses Filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman.
48
05/01/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman.).
49
05/02/2018
Trustee's Letter to Cease Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
50
05/24/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/24/2018 12:19:05 PM ]. File Size [ 335 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:56 ]. (RE: Doc #33; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case). (adiuser).
51
05/24/2018
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
52
06/05/2018
Objection to Claim # 1 of Capital One Auto Finance in the amount of $16,002.81 Filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman.
53
06/05/2018
Objection to Claim # 4 of United Consumer Financial Services in the amount of $955.50 Filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman.
54
06/06/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 52 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman, 53 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman). Hearing scheduled 7/12/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
55
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 54 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/08/2018.
56
06/11/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan; The Trustees objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied Signed on 6/11/2018 (RE: related document(s) 10 Confirmation Hearing, 33 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case, 48 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman).
57
06/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 56 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 06/13/2018.
58
07/12/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/12/2018 10:18:36 AM ]. File Size [ 470 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:18 ]. (RE: Doc #52; Debtor's Objection to Claim # 1 of Capital One Auto Finance in the amount of $16,002.81). (adiuser).
59
07/16/2018
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 1,4 - Objections are Sustained and the balance of claim numbers 1 and 4 are disallowed. Signed on 7/16/2018 (RE: related document(s)[52] Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman, [53] Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Peggy E. Norman).
60
07/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[59] Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 07/18/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.