Penani Mulu, Jr and Eliepa T Mulu
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

3:2017-bk-00359 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
53
06/06/2018
Certificate of No Objection
06/07/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
06/08/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments
55
06/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/19/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.