Peninsula Airways, Inc., dba PenAir
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00282 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Generic Motion / Application
doc
05/23/2018
Affidavit
doc
05/25/2018
Appear Pro Hac Vice
doc
05/25/2018
Appoint Examiner (CM05)
doc
05/25/2018
Shorten Time
doc
05/25/2018
Shorten Time
doc
05/25/2018
Amended Order (SA)
doc
05/29/2018
Appear pro hac vice
doc
05/29/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
doc
05/29/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
05/29/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
doc
06/01/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
371
06/06/2018
Monthly Operating Report
372
06/07/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
06/07/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
373
06/07/2018
Amended Application / Motion
374
06/07/2018
Shorten Time
375
06/07/2018
Shorten Time
376
06/08/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
377
06/08/2018
Certificate of Service
06/11/2018
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
378
06/11/2018
Certificate of Service
379
06/11/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
380
06/12/2018
Extend Time
381
06/12/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
382
06/12/2018
Extend Time
383
06/13/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
384
06/13/2018
Appoint Trustee (CM05)
385
06/13/2018
Generic Motion / Application
06/14/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
386
06/14/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
387
06/14/2018
Memorandum in Support
389
06/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
390
06/18/2018
Withdrawal of Attorney
06/18/2018
Terminate Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
391
06/18/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
392
06/21/2018
Memorandum in Support
393
06/21/2018
Joinder
395
06/21/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
396
06/25/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
397
06/25/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
398
06/26/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
399
06/28/2018
Monthly Operating Report
401
06/29/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
402
07/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
403
07/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
404
07/05/2018
405
07/05/2018
Proceeding Memo
407
07/06/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
408
07/06/2018
Proceeding Memo
410
07/09/2018
Appoint Trustee (CM05)
411
07/09/2018
Declaration
412
07/09/2018
413
07/10/2018
Appear Pro Hac Vice
414
07/11/2018
Appear pro hac vice
415
07/11/2018
Appear Pro Hac Vice
416
07/11/2018
Appear pro hac vice
417
07/17/2018
418
07/19/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
419
07/24/2018
Employ (CM41)
420
07/24/2018
Employ (CM41)
422
07/30/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
423
07/30/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
07/30/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
424
07/31/2018
Employ (CM41)
425
07/31/2018
Hearing
427
08/03/2018
Hearing
08/07/2018
QC Remark Re: Official Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
429
08/07/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
430
08/07/2018
Appear Pro Hac Vice
431
08/08/2018
Employ (CM41)
432
08/09/2018
Monthly Operating Report
433
08/09/2018
Affidavit of Service
434
08/09/2018
Appear pro hac vice
08/10/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
436
08/17/2018
437
08/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
438
08/21/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
439
08/21/2018
Employ
440
08/21/2018
Generic Motion
08/21/2018
Terminate Document / Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
441
08/21/2018
Appear Pro Hac Vice
08/21/2018
Add Party (Text entry; no document attached.)
442
08/21/2018
Employ
443
08/22/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
444
08/22/2018
Shorten Time
445
08/22/2018
Shorten Time
446
08/23/2018
08/23/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
447
08/23/2018
Withdraw As Attorney (MUST be Titled MOTION & submit an order - if not see Notice events)
449
08/23/2018
Shorten Time
450
08/23/2018
Monthly Operating Report
451
08/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
452
08/24/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
453
08/24/2018
Shorten Time
454
08/24/2018
Appear pro hac vice
455
08/24/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
456
08/24/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
08/27/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
457
08/27/2018
Affidavit of Service
458
08/27/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
459
08/27/2018
Generic Motion / Application
460
08/28/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
461
08/29/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
462
08/29/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
08/29/2018
QC Remark Re: Official Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
463
08/29/2018
Non-Opposition
464
08/29/2018
Assume / Reject Lease or Executory Contract (CM06 or CM19)
465
08/29/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
466
08/30/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
467
08/30/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
468
08/31/2018
Certificate of No Objection
469
08/31/2018
Affidavit of Service
470
08/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
471
08/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
472
08/31/2018
Generic Motion
473
08/31/2018
Assume / Reject Lease or Executory Contract
08/31/2018
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
474
09/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
475
09/04/2018
Assume / Reject Lease or Executory Contract (CM06 or CM19)
476
09/04/2018
Hearing
477
09/04/2018
Affidavit of Service
478
09/04/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
479
09/04/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
480
09/05/2018
Affidavit of Service
488
09/10/2018
Certificate of Service
490
09/12/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
491
09/12/2018
Sell Free and Clear of Liens (Hrg Rqd, Under 363(f)) (Fee) (CM21)
09/12/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
492
09/12/2018
Stipulation
493
09/14/2018
Affidavit of Service
494
09/14/2018
Proceeding Memo
495
09/17/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
496
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
497
09/19/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
498
09/20/2018
Stipulation
499
09/21/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
501
09/21/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
502
09/21/2018
Declaration
503
09/21/2018
Declaration
09/24/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
QC Remark Re: Signature Required (Text entry; no document attached.)
504
09/24/2018
Stipulation
505
09/24/2018
Declaration
506
09/25/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
507
09/25/2018
Administrative Expenses
508
09/26/2018
Case Status Report
509
09/26/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
510
09/26/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
511
09/26/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
512
09/27/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
513
09/27/2018
Expedite Hearing
514
09/27/2018
Certificate of No Objection
515
09/28/2018
Generic Motion / Application
516
09/28/2018
Stipulation
517
09/28/2018
Affidavit of Service
518
09/28/2018
Proceeding Memo
519
09/28/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
520
09/28/2018
09/28/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
521
10/01/2018
Shorten Time
522
10/01/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
523
10/01/2018
Shorten Time
524
10/02/2018
525
10/02/2018
Proceeding Memo
526
10/02/2018
Approving Stipulation (SA)
527
10/02/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
528
10/03/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
529
10/03/2018
Generic Motion
530
10/03/2018
531
10/04/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
532
10/04/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
533
10/05/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
534
10/05/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
535
10/05/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
536
10/05/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
537
10/08/2018
Change of Address
10/09/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
538
10/09/2018
Proceeding Memo
539
10/09/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
540
10/10/2018
Hearing
541
10/10/2018
Sell Free and Clear of Liens
542
10/10/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
543
10/10/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
10/11/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
544
10/13/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
10/13/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
545
10/13/2018
Generic Motion / Application
546
10/15/2018
Affidavit of Service
547
10/15/2018
Generic Motion
548
10/16/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
549
10/17/2018
Generic Motion / Application
550
10/17/2018
Generic Motion / Application
551
10/17/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
552
10/17/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
10/18/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
553
10/19/2018
Proceeding Memo
554
10/19/2018
Generic Motion
10/19/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
555
10/19/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
556
10/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
557
10/22/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
558
10/22/2018
Affidavit of Service
559
10/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
560
10/22/2018
Generic Motion / Application
561
10/22/2018
Shorten Time
562
10/22/2018
Shorten Time
563
10/22/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
564
10/23/2018
Hearing
565
10/25/2018
Affidavit of Service
566
10/26/2018
Generic Motion / Application
567
10/26/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
568
10/26/2018
Certificate of Service
569
10/30/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
570
11/01/2018
Generic Motion
571
11/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
572
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
573
11/06/2018
Entry of Appearance
574
11/09/2018
Proceeding Memo
11/09/2018
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
575
11/09/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
576
11/13/2018
Bond
577
11/13/2018
Monthly Operating Report
578
11/14/2018
Monthly Operating Report
579
11/16/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
580
11/16/2018
Hearing
581
11/19/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
582
11/20/2018
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
11/20/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
583
11/21/2018
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
11/21/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
Transfer of Claim Fee Paid (Text entry; no document attached.)
584
11/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims
585
11/26/2018
Substitution of Attorney
586
11/27/2018
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
11/27/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
Set Court Fees Due (Use For Non-ECF Atty or For Oral Motions That Require Fees) (Text entry; no document attached.)
587
11/29/2018
Administrative Expenses
588
11/29/2018
Generic Motion / Application
589
11/29/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
590
11/29/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
591
11/29/2018
Administrative Expenses
11/29/2018
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/29/2018
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/29/2018
Transfer of Claim Fee Paid (Text entry; no document attached.)
592
11/30/2018
Certificate of Service
593
11/30/2018
Administrative Expenses
594
11/30/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
11/30/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
595
11/30/2018
Administrative Expenses
596
11/30/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
597
11/30/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
11/30/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/30/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
598
11/30/2018
Administrative Expenses
599
11/30/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
600
12/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims
601
12/02/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
602
12/02/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
603
12/02/2018
Administrative Expenses
604
12/02/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
605
12/02/2018
Administrative Expenses
606
12/02/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
607
12/03/2018
Affidavit of Service
608
12/03/2018
Extend Time
609
12/03/2018
Administrative Expenses
610
12/03/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
611
12/03/2018
Administrative Expenses
612
12/03/2018
Administrative Expenses
613
12/03/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
614
12/03/2018
Administrative Expenses
12/03/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
615
12/03/2018
Affidavit of Service
616
12/03/2018
Administrative Expenses
617
12/03/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
618
12/03/2018
Administrative Expenses
619
12/03/2018
Administrative Expenses
620
12/03/2018
Extend Time
12/03/2018
Add Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
621
12/03/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
622
12/03/2018
Administrative Expenses
623
12/03/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
624
12/03/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
625
12/03/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
626
12/03/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
12/04/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
627
12/04/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
628
12/04/2018
Administrative Expenses
629
12/07/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
630
12/07/2018
Administrative Expenses
631
12/07/2018
Extend Time
632
12/07/2018
Extend Time
633
12/10/2018
Administrative Expenses
634
12/10/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
635
12/11/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
636
12/11/2018
Generic Motion / Application
637
12/11/2018
Administrative Expenses
638
12/12/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
639
12/12/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
640
12/12/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
641
12/12/2018
Affidavit of Service
642
12/12/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
643
12/12/2018
Administrative Expenses
644
12/13/2018
Limit Notice
645
12/14/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
646
12/14/2018
Monthly Operating Report
647
12/14/2018
Proceeding Memo
12/14/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
648
12/14/2018
Change of Address
649
12/14/2018
Generic Motion
12/14/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
650
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
651
12/17/2018
Limit Notice
12/20/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/31/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
652
01/09/2019
Appear Pro Hac Vice
653
01/09/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
01/09/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
654
01/09/2019
Amended Application / Motion
655
01/09/2019
Declaration
656
01/10/2019
Shorten Time
657
01/10/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
658
01/10/2019
Shorten Time
659
01/10/2019
Appear pro hac vice
660
01/11/2019
Hearing
661
01/11/2019
Certificate of Service
01/11/2019
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
662
01/14/2019
Extend Time
663
01/14/2019
Generic Motion / Application
664
01/14/2019
Extend Time
01/15/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
665
01/15/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
666
01/15/2019
Bond
667
01/15/2019
Setting Hearing (SA)
668
01/15/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
669
01/16/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
670
01/16/2019
Declaration
01/17/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
671
01/17/2019
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
672
01/18/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
673
01/23/2019
Appear Pro Hac Vice
674
01/23/2019
Proceeding Memo
675
01/23/2019
Appear pro hac vice
676
01/23/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
677
02/01/2019
Support Documentation
678
02/04/2019
Administrative Expenses
679
02/04/2019
Allow Filing of Late Filed Claim (CM02)
680
02/05/2019
Monthly Operating Report
681
02/05/2019
Setting Hearing (SA)
682
02/05/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
683
02/05/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
684
02/06/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
685
02/06/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
686
02/06/2019
Certificate of Service
687
02/11/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
688
02/11/2019
Generic Motion
689
02/11/2019
Compel
690
02/11/2019
Shorten Time
691
02/11/2019
Shorten Time
692
02/11/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
693
02/13/2019
Amend Application
694
02/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
695
02/15/2019
Proceeding Memo
696
02/15/2019
Proceeding Memo
697
02/15/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
698
02/15/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
699
02/15/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
700
02/15/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
701
02/15/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
702
02/15/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
703
02/15/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
704
02/15/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
705
02/15/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
706
02/15/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
707
02/15/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
708
02/20/2019
Appear Pro Hac Vice
709
02/20/2019
Appear pro hac vice
710
02/21/2019
Case Status Report
711
02/21/2019
Stipulation
712
02/22/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
713
02/22/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
714
02/22/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
715
02/22/2019
Generic Motion / Application
716
02/22/2019
Shorten Time
717
02/22/2019
Extend Time
718
02/22/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
719
02/22/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
720
02/25/2019
Extend Time
02/25/2019
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
721
02/25/2019
Shorten Time
722
02/25/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
723
02/27/2019
Compensation / Professional Fees
724
02/28/2019
Hearing
725
02/28/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
02/28/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
726
03/01/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
727
03/01/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
728
03/04/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
729
03/04/2019
Administrative Expenses
730
03/04/2019
Generic Motion / Application
731
03/04/2019
Declaration
732
03/04/2019
Declaration
733
03/05/2019
Proceeding Memo
734
03/05/2019
Administrative Expenses
735
03/07/2019
Stipulation
736
03/11/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
737
03/11/2019
Addendum
738
03/11/2019
Declaration
739
03/14/2019
Generic Motion / Application
740
03/14/2019
Objection to Compensation / Professional Fees (CM47-COAwith)
741
03/14/2019
Memorandum in Support
742
03/14/2019
Generic Motion / Application
743
03/14/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
744
03/14/2019
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
03/14/2019
QC Remark Re: Incorrect Image (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/14/2019
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
745
03/20/2019
Stipulation
746
03/20/2019
Stipulation
747
03/21/2019
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
748
03/21/2019
Approving Stipulation (SA)
749
03/22/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
750
03/26/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
03/26/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
751
03/28/2019
Stipulation
752
03/29/2019
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
03/29/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
753
04/01/2019
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
04/01/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2019
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2019
Transfer of Claim Fee Paid (Text entry; no document attached.)
754
04/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims
755
04/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims
756
04/04/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
757
04/04/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
758
04/04/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
759
04/04/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
760
04/05/2019
Approving Stipulation (SA)
04/15/2019
Under Advisement Deadline & Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/15/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/15/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/15/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
761
04/15/2019
Proceeding Memo
762
04/16/2019
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.