Percival Cully Alexie
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00081 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
66
06/05/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
67
06/06/2018
Proceeding Memo
68
06/07/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
69
06/07/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
70
06/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
71
06/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
72
06/27/2018
Proceeding Memo
73
06/29/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
74
07/03/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
75
07/12/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
76
07/19/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
77
12/11/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.