Perlita Javar Alejo
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00043 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/07/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
02/07/2019
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
3
02/07/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
02/07/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2019
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
02/08/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
02/08/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
02/08/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
6
02/08/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
7
02/08/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
8
02/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
02/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
02/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
02/13/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
02/13/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12
03/04/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
03/08/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/18/2019
Statement of No Means Testing Documents Filed (ST3) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2019
Supplemental Statement No Presumed Abuse (ST7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
05/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - USTs Statement of Presumed Abuse
15
05/19/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
16
05/22/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.