Perscilla Ellis
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

7:2017-bk-70334 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 304 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/23/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Perscilla Ellis
2
02/23/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Perscilla Ellis. Related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13).
3
02/23/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Perscilla Ellis
5
02/23/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Perscilla Ellis.
6
02/23/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Perscilla Ellis.
7
02/23/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Perscilla Ellis.
8
02/23/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/07/2017 at 09:30 AM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 1502 Tuscaloosa. Confirmation hearing to be held on 05/16/2017 at 01:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa. Proof of Claim due by 07/06/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 08/22/2017 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 06/06/2017.
9
02/24/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
02/24/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Perscilla Ellis Case Number 02-71002, Chapter 13 filed in Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/26/2002, Dismissed for Other Reason on 12/07/2002; Case Number 95-60263, Chapter 13 filed in Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court on 01/06/1995.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
02/24/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Perscilla Ellis, 7 Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee Through Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Perscilla Ellis).
11
02/25/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 02/25/2017.
12
02/26/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Perscilla Ellis). Notice Date 02/26/2017.
13
02/26/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 02/26/2017.
14
04/04/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Atlas Acquisitions LLC.
15
04/07/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held. Debtor appeared.
04/10/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 77.50 Filed by Trustee C David Cottingham. (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-70334-JHH13) [misc,feepay] (77.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20565868. Fee Amount 77.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
04/16/2017
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Perscilla Ellis.
18
04/16/2017
Amended Schedule A/B: Property Individual, Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules, Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income Form 122C-2 Filed by Debtor Perscilla Ellis.
19
04/17/2017
Notice of Confirmation Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 17 Amended Chapter 13 Plan dated April 14, 2017 filed by Debtor Perscilla Ellis). Hearing scheduled 5/16/2017 at 01:45 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
20
04/19/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 19 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 04/19/2017.
05/08/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 77.50 Filed by Trustee C David Cottingham. (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/08/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-70334-JHH13) [misc,feepay] (77.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20674832. Fee Amount 77.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
05/11/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Trustee C David Cottingham (RE: related document(s) 17 Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Perscilla Ellis. filed by Debtor Perscilla Ellis).
22
05/11/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 21 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Trustee C David Cottingham). Hearing scheduled 5/16/2017 at 01:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
23
05/14/2017
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Debtor Perscilla Ellis.
24
05/14/2017
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Debtor Perscilla Ellis.
25
05/17/2017
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #17; Confirmation Hearing on Amended Chapter 13 Plan dated April 14, 2017) Hearing scheduled 06/06/2017 at 01:45 PM at Room 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
26
05/17/2017
ORDER Withdrawing Signed on 05/17/2017 RE: Doc #21; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of the Plan.
27
05/19/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 26 Order Withdrawing). Notice Date 05/19/2017.
06/05/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 77.50 Filed by Trustee C David Cottingham. (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-70334-JHH13) [misc,feepay] (77.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20776585. Fee Amount 77.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
06/08/2017
Courtroom Notes Trustee Recommends Confirmation--Confirmation Order to be Entered.
29
06/13/2017
Trustee's Bench Sheet.
30
06/13/2017
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 6/13/2017 (RE: related document(s) 17 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Perscilla Ellis).
31
06/15/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 30 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 06/15/2017.
32
07/05/2017
Objection to Claim # 9 of LVNV Funding LLC in the amount of $469.52 **STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS** Filed by Trustee C David Cottingham.
33
07/05/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 32 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee C David Cottingham). Hearing scheduled 8/22/2017 at 09:15 AM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
34
07/07/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 33 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 07/07/2017.
07/10/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 77.50 Filed by Trustee C David Cottingham. (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-70334-JHH13) [misc,feepay] (77.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20902046. Fee Amount 77.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
07/11/2017
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s) 10 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
36
07/13/2017
Withdrawal of Claims: 9 Filed by Creditor LVNV Funding LLC.
37
07/14/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 36 Withdrawal of Claim filed by Creditor LVNV Funding LLC). Hearing scheduled 8/22/2017 at 09:15 AM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
38
08/24/2017
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 9 (LVNV Funding LLC) Signed on 8/24/2017 (RE: related document(s) 32 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee C David Cottingham, 36 Withdrawal of Claim filed by Creditor LVNV Funding LLC).
39
08/26/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 38 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 08/26/2017.
40
09/12/2017
Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. Hearing scheduled 10/5/2017 at 09:00 AM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
41
10/10/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing RE: Doc #40; Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. Hearing scheduled 11/09/2017 at 01:30 PM at Room 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa
42
10/12/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 41 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 10/12/2017.
43
11/02/2017
Consent to Action at Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Debtor Perscilla Ellis (RE: related document(s) 40 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).
44
11/03/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 43 Consent to Action at Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss filed by Debtor Perscilla Ellis). Hearing scheduled 11/9/2017 at 01:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
45
11/15/2017
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #40; Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments) Hearing scheduled 12/07/2017 at 01:30 PM at Room 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
46
12/12/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor Memnon Tierce
1
Exhibit note #
2
Exhibit mortgage
2 Attachments
12/12/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-70334-JHH13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21497628. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 46) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
12/12/2017
*ENTERED IN ERROR* - Amended Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Memnon Tierce Modified per Corrective Entry on 12/15/2017
48
12/12/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay (RE: related document(s) 46 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Memnon Tierce). Hearing scheduled 1/10/2018 at 09:05 AM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa. (dxt) Modified Hearing Date from 1/10/2017 per Corrective Entry on 12/12/2017
12/12/2017
Corrective Entry - Hearing Date Should be 2018 (RE: related document(s) 48 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
12/12/2017
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, W. Cameron Parsons, attorney for Creditor, has filed a PDF document that does not match the docket event when filing the Amended Motion for Relief from Stay - Doc. 47. SOLUTION: The filer, W. Cameron Parsons, attorney for Creditor, should enter a "Corrective Entry - Entered in Error" and refile the PDF (Fact Summary Sheet) using the docket event Fact Summary for Motion for Relief from Stay found under Bankuptcy Events: Miscellaneous. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 47 Amended Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Memnon Tierce).
50
12/13/2017
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #40; Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments) Hearing scheduled 02/08/2018 at 01:30 PM at Room 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
51
12/14/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 48 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 12/14/2017.
52
12/15/2017
CORRECTIVE ENTRY entered in error Filed by Creditor Memnon Tierce (RE: related document(s) 47 Amended Motion for Relief from Stay).
53
12/15/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Memnon Tierce (RE: related document(s) 46 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
54
01/02/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing RE: Doc #46; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Memnon Tierce. Hearing scheduled 02/08/2018 at 01:30 PM at Room 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa
55
01/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 54 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 01/04/2018.
56
02/08/2018
Order and Notice of Hearing RE: Doc #46; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Memnon Tierce. Hearing scheduled 03/20/2018 at 09:05 AM at Room 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa
57
02/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 56 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 02/10/2018.
58
02/12/2018
ORDER Withdrawing Signed on 02/12/2018 RE: Doc #40; Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments.
65
07/15/2018
Incur Debt
74
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.