Peter Arthur Oler
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00128 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
doc
05/30/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
doc
05/30/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
06/01/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/04/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
17
07/31/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
18
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
08/03/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.