Peter Benson Mattison
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00239 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/27/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
07/27/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
07/27/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
07/27/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
07/27/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/27/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/27/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
07/27/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
5
07/27/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
6
07/27/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
7
07/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
8
07/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
07/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
07/30/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
08/02/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
11
08/23/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
08/28/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/10/2018
Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
09/11/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
14
10/24/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
15
10/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
10/29/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.