Peter Christopher Moore
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00313 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/19/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
09/19/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
09/19/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
QC Remark Re: Summary, Stat & Declaration (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
09/20/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
4
09/20/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
5
09/20/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
6
09/20/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
7
09/20/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
8
09/21/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
09/21/2018
Credit Counseling Deficiency to Chambers (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
09/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
10
09/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
09/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
09/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
09/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
09/24/2018
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
15
09/26/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
16
09/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
09/28/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
18
09/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
19
10/09/2018
Request for Special Notice
10/11/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
10/12/2018
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
21
10/12/2018
Notice Request
10/12/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
10/12/2018
Notice of Non-Compliance (LBF37)
23
10/12/2018
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
10/14/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
10/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
25
10/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
10/15/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
27
10/16/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
28
10/16/2018
Proceeding Memo
29
10/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
10/17/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
10/19/2018
Comply (SA)
10/19/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
10/22/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
32
10/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10/23/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
10/24/2018
Creditor Matrix (Only Use When PDF Image Omitted From Petition - Not An Amended Matrix)
34
10/24/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
35
10/24/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
10/25/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
11/01/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
11/01/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
11/01/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
38
11/01/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
39
11/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
40
11/02/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
41
11/02/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
42
11/02/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
43
11/02/2018
Certificate of Service
44
11/02/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
45
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
46
11/08/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
11/13/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
11/14/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
48
11/15/2018
Proceeding Memo
49
11/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
12/03/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
12/04/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
12/07/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
12/13/2018
Proceeding Memo
52
12/13/2018
Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (SA)
53
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.