Peterson v. Alaska Communications Systems Group, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2012-cv-00090 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
301
09/11/2018
Status Report
302
09/11/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
09/11/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
305
09/13/2018
Order
306
09/13/2018
Notice (Other)
307
09/26/2018
Stay
308
09/26/2018
Declaration
309
10/10/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
310
10/10/2018
Declaration
311
10/19/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
312
10/25/2018
Order
313
11/15/2018
Statement
314
11/19/2018
Appear
11/19/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
317
11/30/2018
Statement
318
12/20/2018
Order on Motion to Stay
319
12/27/2018
Notice (Other)
320
01/04/2019
Order
02/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
322
02/22/2019
Status Report
323
02/25/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
324
02/28/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
325
03/04/2019
Suggestion of Death
326
03/06/2019
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
03/08/2019
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
328
03/12/2019
Substitute Party
329
03/12/2019
Memorandum
330
03/25/2019
Order on Motion to Substitute Party
331
05/16/2019
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.