Peterson v. Commissioner of Soc. Sec. Admin.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cv-00014 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/29/2018
Complaint
2
10/29/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
10/29/2018
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
4
10/29/2018
Unissued Summons
5
11/05/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
11/05/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
11/23/2018
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
7
11/27/2018
Notice of Appearance
8
11/28/2018
Scheduling Order
11/28/2018
Docket Annotation re Opening Brief (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
12/19/2018
Notice of Appearance
10
01/18/2019
Answer to Complaint
11
01/18/2019
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security)
12
02/18/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
13
03/07/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
14
03/21/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
15
04/24/2019
ORDER re 12 Motion to Remand. Defendant's final decision is reversed, and this matter is remanded for further proceedings. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 4/24/19.
16
04/26/2019
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.