Phillip L Kilpatrick and Renee B Kilpatrick
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81555 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/25/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
05/25/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
19
07/19/2018
Amended Schedules (Fee)
07/19/2018
Corrective Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
07/20/2018
Approving
08/14/2018
Request for Clerk to Send Notice of Filing of Claim by Debtor or Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Request for Clerk to Send Notice of Filing of Claim by Debtor or Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
09/17/2018
Notice of Change of Address

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.