Pierce v. Arctic Catering and Support et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00286 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
41
06/04/2018
Witness List
42
07/30/2018
Substitute Attorney
43
07/30/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
44
07/31/2018
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
45
07/31/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
46
08/24/2018
Dismiss
47
08/27/2018
Order Dismissing Case

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.