Pomeroy v. State of Alaska
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00061 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
7
09/11/2018
Notice (Other)
8
09/19/2018
Order Dismissing Case
9
09/21/2018
Order
10
10/12/2018
Notice of Appeal
11
10/12/2018
Certificate of Service
12
10/17/2018
USCA Case Number
13
10/17/2018
USCA Scheduling Order
14
11/02/2018
USCA Order
15
02/27/2019
USCA Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.