Ponce v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Court Docket Sheet

2:2017-cv-01524 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 430 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/18/2017
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-14242238 filed by Angelica Ponce. (submitted by Howard Olinsky)
1
Exhibit
2
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025117387640" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025117387640','1034311','6','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Civil Cover Sheet)
2 Attachments
2
05/18/2017
SUMMONS Submitted by Angelica Ponce. (submitted by Howard Olinsky)
1
Summons
2
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025117387666" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025117387666','1034311','8','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Summons)
2 Attachments
3
05/18/2017
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14242238. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-17-01524-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.
4
05/18/2017
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration (via Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region X), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.
1
Summons
2
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025117387700" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025117387700','1034311','12','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Summons)
2 Attachments
5
05/18/2017
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 1 Complaint filed by Angelica Ponce. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
6
05/19/2017
SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: This action was commenced on May 18, 2017 and assigned to an expedited track pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 16.2 (b)(1)(A)(i). IT IS ORDERED that the parties must fully comply with the following deadlines and procedures: See document for full details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/18/2017.
05/19/2017
Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Howard D Olinsky on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
06/22/2017
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Angelica Ponce: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint and Scheduling Order upon US Attorney's Office, Office of General Counsel, Attorney General on 6/12/2017.
8
07/08/2017
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daphne Banay appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
9
08/11/2017
ANSWER to [1] Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
10
08/11/2017
NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
1
001 Certification Page
2
002 Court Transcript Index
3
003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral He
4
004 Payment Documents and Decisions
5
005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices
6
006 Non Disability Related Development
7
007 Disability Related Development
8
008 Medical Records Part 1
9
009 Medical Records Part 2
10
010 Medical Records Part 3
10 Attachments
11
10/10/2017
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief by Angelica Ponce.
12
10/10/2017
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Corrected by Angelica Ponce.
1
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
1 Attachment
13
10/10/2017
ORDER granting the [11], [12] Motions for Extension of Time and Plaintiffshall have up to and including November 9, 2017 to file an Opening Brief. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/10/2017.(LFIG)
14
11/09/2017
OPENING BRIEF by Angelica Ponce.
15
12/05/2017
RESPONSE BRIEF by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
16
12/20/2017
REPLY BRIEF by Angelica Ponce.
17
06/21/2018
Order
18
06/21/2018
Clerks Judgment
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.