Pongco and Devos
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-ap-90002 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
doc
05/31/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
doc
06/01/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
06/11/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
06/27/2018
Clerks Notice of Undeliverable Mail
14
08/02/2018
Proceeding Memo
15
08/03/2018
Setting Trial (SA)
08/03/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
17
09/12/2018
Dismiss Party (Adv Cases Only)
18
12/03/2018
Extend Time
19
12/04/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
20
12/06/2018
Partial Summary Judgment (CM52)
21
12/07/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
22
12/14/2018
Proceeding Memo
23
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.