Pool Engineering, Inc. v. Swalling Construction Company, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00029 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
46
06/12/2018
Hearing
06/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
08/06/2018
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
50
08/13/2018
Appear
08/15/2018
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
08/21/2018
Pretrial Order
53
08/30/2018
Amend/Correct
08/30/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
09/13/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
58
09/19/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
09/21/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
10/05/2018
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
60
10/05/2018
Order
61
10/08/2018
Appear
10/09/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
11/21/2018
Order
65
11/27/2018
Continue
12/10/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.