Powell v. State of Alaska et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00036 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
94
05/18/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
95
05/24/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
96
05/24/2018
Preliminary Injunction
97
05/25/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
98
05/31/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
99
06/08/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
100
06/08/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
101
06/12/2018
Notice of Change of Address
102
06/12/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
103
06/13/2018
Notice of Change of Address
104
06/13/2018
Notice of Change of Address
105
06/14/2018
Notice (Other)
106
06/22/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
107
06/22/2018
Declaration
108
06/22/2018
Declaration
109
06/26/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
110
06/26/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
111
06/28/2018
Preliminary Injunction
112
07/03/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
113
07/06/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
116
07/20/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
117
07/31/2018
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
118
08/13/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
119
08/27/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
120
08/31/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
122
09/11/2018
Amended Complaint
123
09/11/2018
Certificate of Service
124
09/17/2018
Amended Complaint
125
09/17/2018
Certificate of Service
126
09/21/2018
Notice (Other)
127
10/01/2018
Dismiss
128
10/11/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
129
10/12/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
130
10/22/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
131
10/23/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
132
10/31/2018
Appoint Counsel
133
10/31/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
134
10/31/2018
Affidavit
135
11/15/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
136
11/15/2018
Supplement
138
12/06/2018
Notice of Appearance
139
12/10/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.