Price et al v. Chief, General Litigation Division et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00063 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
50
09/28/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
09/28/2018
Order on Motion to Compel (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
10/05/2018
Reconsideration
53
10/10/2018
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
54
10/12/2018
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
55
10/24/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
56
10/24/2018
Amend/Correct
57
10/24/2018
Notice (Other)
58
11/16/2018
Notice (Other)
59
11/19/2018
Status Report
60
12/10/2018
Status Report
12/17/2018
Order Referring Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
01/22/2019
Notice of Change of Address
63
03/28/2019
Report and Recommendation - Initial (Final R&R to follow)
64
04/23/2019
Report and Recommendation - Final
04/25/2019
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/25/2019
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/25/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
66
04/25/2019
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.