Priscilla Youngblood
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01992 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
43
12/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
45
01/24/2019
Notice of Hearing - Van002
46
01/27/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
47
01/31/2019
Withdrawal of Claim
49
02/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
51
02/23/2019
Transfer of Claim
02/23/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
02/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.